United States of America v. Jupiter Aluminum Corporation
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jupiter Aluminum Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv00262
Filed: August 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7413(b) Clean Air Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING defendant Jupiter Aluminum Corporation's 119 Motion to Post Bond or Establish Escrow in Lieu of Making Stipulated Penalty Payment. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 5/10/10. (sda)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER that Jupiter's Motion to Modify the Consent Decree and to Abate Penalties DE 21 and its Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction DE 57 are DENIED. This Opinion and Order SUPERCEDES the Court's September 1, 2009 Sealed Opinion and Order DE 98 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to STRIKE that Opinion and Order DE 98 . Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 9/14/09. (sda)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING IN PART 21 Motion to Modify Consent Decree and Abate Penalties filed by Jupiter Aluminum Corporation and the Agencies' Motion to Enforce Judgment and for Contempt Sanctions 26 is DENIED. The Court further SETS this matter for a status hearing on 3/24/09 at 10:00 a.m. in the Courtroom of Judge Philip P. Simon. The Court ORDERS all parties, through counsel, to appear at the hearing. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 2/18/09. (sda) (Modified by adding the word Opinion in text on 2/18/2009) (sda).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jupiter Aluminum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sharon J Johnson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jupiter Aluminum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?