March 8, 2017 |
Filing
406
OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Opinion and Order, the Court hereby DENIES the 381 Motion to Vacate Final Judgment, the 386 Request for Sanctions Against Defendants for Their Obdurate Behavior During the Litigation, the 387 Notice to Judge DeGuilio, and the 389 Verified Motion for Sanctions, Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses Due to the Defendants' Obdurate Behavior in Litigation, and DENIES as moot the 390 Verified Request for Final Judgment on the Merits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 3/8/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing
374
OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 368 Request for De Novo Review of the case by the District Court Judge Prior to Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/6/2014. cc: Holland (tc)
|
April 24, 2014 |
Filing
364
OPINION AND ORDER denying Motion to Set Aside 357 and the motions contained within the Notice to the Court, and Request for Ruling or Status Conference 363 . The Court WARNS Plaintiff that any further frivolous filings may result in the Court holding him in contempt of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/24/2014. (cc: Holland) (rmn)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
355
OPINION AND ORDER denying 346 Request for Amendment of the Findings of the Court in it March 5, 2013 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/23/2013. (cc: Holland) (rmn)
|
March 5, 2013 |
Filing
345
OPINION AND ORDER The Court DENIES the Motion to Correct Errors and to SetAside the Orders of December 27, 2011 and December 6, 2012" DE 321 , and the Motion to Correct Errors and to Set Aside the Orders of December 27, 2011, December 6, 2012 and January 8, 2013" DE 326 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 3/5/13. cc:pltf(kjp)
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing
322
OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant Lake County Board of Comissioners' 297 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 299 Motion for Summary Judgment by Sheriff Dominguez and Warden of the Lake County Jail and denying the motion contained wit hin 302 Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion and the Second Motion for Summary Judgment by All Gary Defendants 244 . This terminates all of Plaintiff Hollands claims against Defendants Lake County Board of Commissioners, L ake County Sheriff Dominguez, and Warden of the Lake County Jail. The Bench Trial setting, the Final Pre-Trial Conference setting, and all other previously established dates and deadlines in this case are hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 1/8/2013. (cc: Holland) (rmn)
|
April 16, 2012 |
Filing
263
ORDER denying 207 Renewal of the Request for Discovery Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule 37; denying 221 Holland's Request for an Order of the Court Compelling a Trial Rule 31 Deposition of a Witness Upon Written Questions; denying 223 Re quest for Oral Argument Before the Court Regarding Discovery; denying 224 Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions against Lake County Sheriff and the Warden of the Lake County Jail for Failure to Cooperate in Discovery; denying 225 Motion to C ompel and Request for Sanctions Against the City of Gary Defendants for Failure to Cooperate in Discovery and ORDER Defendants are relieved of the need to respond to additional discovery requests in 213 ; grants in part and denies in part 246 Requ est for an Extension of the Discovery Deadline and ORDERS that the discovery ddl is hereby extended to 5/28/2012 for limited purposes as set forth in order; granting in part and denying in part 247 Motion to Compel and ORDERS that the motion is den ied as to the Gary Defendants; and dft Dominguez must respond to pla Holland's 4th Request for Production by 4/27/2012; denying 249 Motion to Strike the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Gary Defendants to the extend that it is inte nded either a Motion to Strike or a Motion to Defer or Deny under FedRCivP 56(d) and ORDERS that the document be construed as a Statement of Genuine Disputes for the purposes of the pending Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 250 Request for Oral Argument; denying 251 Gary Defendant's Motion to Strike; and ORDERS that the Response to Strike filed by City of Gary Defendants 266 beginning with Paragraph 6, be construed as Plaintiff Holland's Response to Gary Defts 2nd Mtn for Summary Judgment and that the Gary Defts must file a reply in support of their 2nd Mtn for Summary Judgment on or before 5/3/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/16/2010. (cc: Holland) (rmn)
|
April 4, 2012 |
Filing
262
OPINION AND ORDER denying 206 Motion to Correct Errors and Relief from the Order of the Court ; denying 208 Plaintiff's Third Request for Monetary Sanctions Against the City of Gary Defendants for the Frivolous Filing of the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/4/2012. (cc: Holland) (rmn)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
259
OPINION AND ORDER, DENYING 252 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Robert Holland. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay a fine in the amount of $200.00 to the Clerk of Court within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 3/29/12. cc: pltf(kjp)
|
December 27, 2011 |
Filing
203
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 12/27/11. cc:pltf (kjp)
|
July 29, 2011 |
Filing
120
OPINION AND ORDER denying 75 Request for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint; denying 80 Amended Request for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint and denying 92 Request for the Court to Issue Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Pursuant to FedRCivP 52. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 7/29/2011. (cc: Holland) (rmn)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
69
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES the Request for Leave to AmendComplaint 56 ; GRANTS the Motion to Strike 52 ; GRANTS Defendant Lake CountyBoard of Commissioners Motion to Strike Amended Complaint 55 ; and DENIES as moot Plaintiffs Reque st for the Court to Issue an Order for the Clerk to Make Necessary Copies of the Complaint 53 . The Court STRIKES from the Record Plaintiffs proposed Amended Complaint, currently docketed at 51 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/20/2011. (cc: Holland, Severtson) (rmn)
|