M.G. v. M.F. et al
Plaintiff: |
MG |
Defendant: |
MF, Frederick Frego and Stephen Kil |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00084 |
Filed: |
March 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Hammond Office |
County: |
Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul R Cherry |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
180
ORDER ADOPTS 175 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTS in part and DENIES in part 160 Agreed Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Defendants, as is set forth more fully in the Report and Recommendation; DENIES AS MOOT 167 MOTION for Expedited Hearing Date For Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Defendants; DENIES AS MOOT 169 Supplemental MOTION to Expedite Hearing Date for Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Defendants; DECLARES that the settlement agreement of August 8, 2 017, was entered into knowingly and voluntarily, is fully enforceable, and, in particular, does not include a mutual release of claims; ORDERS Plaintiff to execute the document found at Exhibit A of Defendant's Motion 160 , which memorializes the already enforceable settlement agreement; DENIES Defendants' request for an award of attorney fees; and ORDERS the parties to file dismissal paperwork with the Court by 12/12/2017. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 11/28/2017. (lhc)
|
September 20, 2016 |
Filing
134
OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 105 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; GRANTS IN PART 62 Frego, Kil, Turturillo and the Town's Motion to dismiss/strike as to Counts II, VIII and IX, but DENIES as to count V; GRANTS Frego and Turturillo& #039;s 86 Motion to Dismiss count VI; GRANTS 88 Defendant Fryzel's motion to dismiss counts I (as arising under the Fourth Amendment) and VI WITH PREJUDICE and STRIKES count VIII. The remaining counts are: count III (substantive Title VII violation against the Town), count IV (Title VII retaliation against the Town), count V (negligent retention against the Town), count VII (battery and false imprisonment against Fryzel) and the § 1983 Fourteenth Amendment claim derived from the allegations of count I against Fryzel. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 9/20/2016. (tc)
|
June 14, 2016 |
Filing
125
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 81 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Entry of Protective Order by Miscellaneous Party Elizabeth Hernandez; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 83 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Entry of Pr otective Order by Miscellaneous Party Cliff Wroe; and DENYING 102 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Movant Hernandez Docs 97, 99, 101 by Plaintiffs Joan Gorcos, MG. The Court ORDERS that the April 9, 2016 subpoena served by Gorcos on Hernandez and the April 11, 2016 subpoena served by Gorcos on Wroe are hereby QUASHED. Hernandez and Wroe do not need to respond to these subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/14/2016. (lhc)(cc: Matthew S. Clark)
|
October 13, 2015 |
Filing
36
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING 16 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant MF and ORDERING Plaintiff to file by 10/26/2015, a more definite statement identifying Plaintiff M.G. and Defendant M.F. by their legal names. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/13/2015. (lhc) Modified on 10/14/2015 to correct order title(lhc).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?