Miller v. Rosado et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Miller
Defendant: Debra G Rosado and Joseph Moser
Case Number: 2:2015cv00291
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Referring Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's 73 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and DENIES Plaintiff's 53 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Debra Rosado and Dr. John J. Wernert and against Plaintiff Kevin Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 8/4/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss)
October 12, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses and Further Discovery (DE 51), denying all bases for the Motion to Compel except the request in Paragraph 29. The Court denies the request for sanctions. The Court ORDERS that the parties resolve the request in Paragraph 29 on or before 10/25/2016. The Court RESETS the dispositive motion deadline for 11/18/2016. On or Before 10/28/2016, Plaintiff is ORDERED to FILE either (1) a Notice i ndicating that Plaintiff intends to rely upon his Second Motion for Summary Judgment filed on September 9, 2016, at docket entry 53, or (2) a Motion to Withdraw his Second Motion for Summary Judgment that represents that Plaintiff intends to file a Third Motion for Summary Judgment by the November 18, 2016 deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/12/16. (cc: Plaintiff)(ksp)
April 4, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Joseph Moser, Debra G Rosado and DISMISSING, without prejudice, Plaintiff's ADA and RehabilitationAct claims. The briefing on the Motion for Summary Judgment 25 remains STAYED. Court SETS Telephonic Status Conference for 4/28/2016 09:45 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry, with the Court to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/4/2016. (lhc) Modified on 4/4/2016 to (cc: Plaintiff) (lhc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Rosado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra G Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?