Otten et al v. Buncich et al
Plaintiff: |
David Otten and Renee Otten |
Defendant: |
John Buncich, Lake County Sheriff Department, Sergeant Bosse, B Zabrecky and Lake Conty Indiana |
Counter_claimant: |
Lake Conty Indiana |
Counter_defendant: |
David Otten and Renee Otten |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00082 |
Filed: |
March 9, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Hammond Office |
County: |
Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul R Cherry |
Presiding Judge: |
Theresa L Springmann |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 12, 2017 |
Filing
39
OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 35 Motion to Bifurcate § 1983 Monell Claims and Stay Discovery and Trial on Those Claims. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b), the Monell claims against the Sheriff's Department are bifurcated from the &# 167; 1983 claims against the individually-named Defendants and the state law claims. All discovery on the Monell claims against the Sheriff's Department is STAYED until resolution of the claims against the individual officer Defendants. The C ourt ORDERS that there be separate trials, with the § 1983 claims against the individually-named Defendants and the state law claims taking place first. The trial on the Monell claims against the Sheriff's Department is STAYED until resolution of the claims against the individual officer Defendants. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's right to a jury trial on the Monell claims is preserved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 1/12/2017. (tc)
|
November 29, 2016 |
Filing
32
OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 26 Motion to Dismiss. Court DISMISSES without prejudice Counts III and IV as to Defendants Sheriff John Buncich and the Lake County Sheriff's Department and the § 1983 Monell claimsbut not any state law claimsagainst the Lake County Sheriff's Department contained in Counts V, VI, VII, and VIII. The Court DISMISSES with prejudice all claims for punitive damages against the Lake County Sheriff's Department. The case REMAINS PENDING on Plaintiff's Amended Complaint as to all other claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/29/2016. (tc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?