Kras v. Dick's R U Crazy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Nathan Kras |
Defendant: |
Dick's R U Crazy, Inc., R U Crazy, Ltd., Richard E Wurtzbacher and Robert Wayne Nelson |
Garnishee: |
Conifer Insurance Company |
Counter_claimant: |
Conifer Insurance Company |
Counter_defendant: |
Nathan Kras |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00224 |
Filed: |
June 13, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Hammond Office |
County: |
Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Presiding Judge: |
John E Martin |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 4, 2020 |
Filing
141
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 135 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct 130 Opinion and Order, 131 Clerks Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration re 130 Opinion and Order, filed by Nathan Kras. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/4/20. (ksp)
|
March 16, 2020 |
Filing
130
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the Garnishee-Defendants Motion to Exclude the Proffered Affidavit Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert David Demik 106 and the Garnishee-Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 108 . The Court DENIES Plainti ffs Motion for Summary Judgment on Conifer Insurance Companys Duty to Defendant, Coverage and Indemnification 111 and Plaintiffs Motion and Memorandum in Support to Strike Affidavit of Detective Sgt. Stephen Guernsey 118 . The Court hereby DIREC TS the Clerk of Court toenter judgment in favor of Conifer Insurance Company and against Nathan Kras and the other Counterclaim Defendants on all claims and counterclaims in this case. Because the case is now fully resolved, the Court hereby DENIES as moot the Motion to Set Status Conference 129 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/16/2020. (shk)
|
October 3, 2018 |
Filing
79
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 77 MOTION for Hearing Status Conference, and will set this matter for a status conference after the judgment debtors have been added to this case. The Court also GRANTS Conifer's request to amend its cou nterclaim and ORDERS Conifer Insurance Company to file its Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment currently on the docket as an attachment to its briefing on or before 10/12/2018 and to properly serve it on all counterclaim defendants as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/3/18. (ksp)
|
January 29, 2018 |
Filing
71
OPINION AND ORDER: DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Join Additional Parties and for Remand 47 and ORDERS both parties to file briefs, as outlined, on or before 2/16/2018, with responses to be filed on or before 3/2/2018. The Court DENIES Garnish ee-Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 55 , Counter Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Conifer Insurance Company's Declaratory Judgment Counter Claim 57 , and Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum in Support to Strike Affidavit of Detective Sgt. Stephen Guernsey 60 , with leave to refile after the Court has ruled on the question of joinder. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/29/2018. (lhc)
|
January 6, 2017 |
Filing
37
OPINION AND ORDER denying 35 Motion to Reconsider and Alternative Motion to Certify Question to the Indiana Supreme Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/6/17. (nal)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
34
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Kras's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses (DE 21). The Court STRIKES Conifer's Affirmative Defenses #5, #7, and #8. The Court declines to strike Conifer's Affirmative Defenses #11 and #12. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/30/16. (ksp)
|
November 23, 2016 |
Filing
33
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and ORDERS that Conifer's deadline for responding to Kras's Motion for Summary Judgment 17 is STAYED until 30 days after the close of discovery or the resolution of any discovery disputes, whichever comes later. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/23/2016. (jss)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?