Soo Line Railroad Company v. Consolidated Rail Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Soo Line Railroad Company
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation, CSX Transportation, Inc., Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00106
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rudy Lozano
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 OPINION AND ORDER: DISMISSING 108 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 77 Motion To Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim And To Dismiss Or Strike The Amended Complaint's Requests For Relief filed by Soo Line Railroad Company and GRANTING 77 MOTIO N To Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim And To Dismiss Or Strike The Amended Complaint's Requests For Relief by Defendants CSX Transportation, Inc., Consolidated Rail Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/24/2018. (lhc)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 77 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and to Dismiss or Strike the Amended Complaint's Requests for Relief. The parties' supplemental briefs discussing the issue of O&M Expenses are due 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/29/2018. (tc)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION AND ORDER : For the reasons set forth in the Opinion and Order, the 37 and 39 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 6/22/17. (jss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soo Line Railroad Company v. Consolidated Rail Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soo Line Railroad Company
Represented By: Thomas C Burman PHV
Represented By: David C Jensen
Represented By: John P Twohy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By: Chad M Clamage PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: A Richard M Blaiklock
Represented By: Aaron D Grant
Represented By: Charles R Whybrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company
Represented By: Arthur C Johnson, II
Represented By: Steven A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Theodore Boehm
Represented By: Kenneth J Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?