Barbee et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Plaintiff: Ingrid Barbee, J.Y. 1, V.B., Veeda Chandler, J.C. 2, Carmencita Robinson, J.C. 1, N.H., Nancy Jean Bell, William C Scott, Jr., C.R. 2, Timothy Bardney, Leah Bardney, C.R. 1, J.Q., J.Y. 3, J.Y. 2, V.R., Daven Bell, Davin Bell, William Scott, Nyasha Harris, Chance Robinson, Choice Robinson, Janae Young and Jesse Young
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Hammond Group, Inc., Halstab LLC, The Chemours Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC, Halox LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC and Halox, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00193
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Joshua P Kolar
2 Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #218 Motion to Withdraw. The appearance of Jacqueline R. Sheridan for Defendants Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC, and Halox, LLC is WITHDRAWN. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/25/2023. Text entry order. (tc)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Sheridan, Jacqueline)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on March 14, 2023, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court Reporter Ashley N. Stokes, Telephone 219-852-6557, E-mail ashley_stokes@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 3/29/2023. Redaction Request due 4/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2023. (as)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/14/2023, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by attys Roy Amatore, Colin Flora, Cristina Rodriguez, Eric Pavlack, Rachel Steiner, David Chizewer. Dfts appeared by attys Sean Morris, Tracy Roman, Janelle Kilies, Max Kelln, Krysta Gumbiner. Discussion held as to discovery dispute in case 2:17cv414. Pltf orally moves for extension of time to file amended complaint. The Court, finding good cause shown and noting no objection, GRANTS the request for case 2:17cv414 only. Pltf to file amended complaint in 2:17cv414 accounting for deceased Plaintiffs by 4/28/2023. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/13/2023 11:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar in case no. 2:17cv414. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. Parties for related cases are not mandated to participate. (Held in conjunction w/case nos. 2:17cv414, 2:18cv375, 2:16cv525, 2:17cv429, 2:22cv359) (Court Reporter Ashley Stokes.) (tc)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 215 STATUS REPORT for all parties filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Roman PHV, Tracy)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/14/2023 10:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/7/2023. Text entry order. (tc)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 213 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 01-26-2023, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court Reporter Stacy L. Drohosky, Telephone 219-852-3462, E-mail stacy_drohosky@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/15/2023. Redaction Request due 2/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2023. (sld)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 01-26-2023, before Judge Philip P Simon. Court Reporter Stacy L. Drohosky, Telephone 219-852-3462, E-mail stacy_drohosky@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/15/2023. Redaction Request due 2/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2023. (sld)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/26/2023, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by attys Colin Flora, Eric Pavlack, Stacy Petrek, David Chizewer, Roy Amatore. Dfts appeared by attys Diana Reiter, Sean Morris, Kathleen DeLaney, Honor Costello, Janelle Kilies, Thomas Connor, Harold Abrahamson, Max Kelln. Discussion held as to status of discovery in all cases. Discovery proceeds in 2:17-cv-414; parties indicate written discovery is being exchanged and reviewed; depositions have just begun. Given the procedural posture in the other cases, discovery has not been exchanged, although the parties are sharing potential discovery requests and search terms across cases. To ensure a prompt discovery process, parties in all cases should continue to confer and share discovery requests and documents in advance of the discovery period where feasible. Given the age of the cases, requests for discovery extensions will be disfavored. Several options for sharing documents discussed, including potential production for attorneys' eyes only. Parties to confer and file status report by 2/28/2023. Any presently existing discovery disputes that cannot be resolved between the parties shall be brought to the Court's attention by 3/7/2023. Possibility of settlement discussed. Hearing to be set in March by separate order. (Held in conjunction w/case no. 2:18cv375, 2:16cv525, 2:17cv429, 2:17cv414, 2:22cv359) (Court Reporter Stacy Drohosky.) (tc)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STATUS CONFERENCE in Case Numbers: 2:16CV525, 2:17CV429, 2:17CV414, 2:17CV193, 2:18CV375 and 2:22CV359 held on 1/26/2023 before Judge Philip P Simon. Attorneys present; Max Keller, Thomas Connor, Colin Flora, Eric Pavlack, Stacey Petre, David Chizewer, Diana Reiter, Sean Morris, Kathleen DeLaney, Janelle Kilies, Honor Costello, Harold Abrahamson and Roy Amatore. Court conducts inquiry into each case with counsel. Consolidation of cases briefly discussed. (Court Reporter Stacy Drohosky.) (nac) (Court Reporter Stacy Drohosky.) Modified on 1/27/20 to correct one case number. (nac).
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Roman PHV, Tracy)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion re #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Sheridan, Jacqueline)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STATUS REPORT for all parties filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Roman PHV, Tracy)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #205 Motion to Withdraw and ORDERS that the appearance of Attorney Kathleen T. Sooy is WITHDRAWN. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/5/2023. Text entry order. (tc)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 204 RESPONSE to Motion re #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #192 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, Nyasha Harris, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, Chance Robinson, Choice Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R., Janae Young, Jesse Young. (Pavlack, Eric)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER: The parties in Case Nos. 2:16-cv-525, 2:17-cv-193, 2:17-cv-414, 2:17-cv-429, 2:18-cv-375, and 2:22-cv-359 are to appear in-person for a status conference in Courtroom 5, on the third floor of the Hammond courthouse, on January 26, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. (Central Time). The conference may be held earlier, at the parties convenience, if the 10:30 a.m. status hearing before District Judge Philip P. Simon is completed prior to 1:00 p.m. The parties are ORDERED to file a status report in each case by January 12, 2023, with proposed timelines for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 12/19/22.(mlc)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on December 12, 2022, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court Reporter Ashley N. Stokes, Telephone 219-852-6557, E-mail ashley_stokes@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 1/4/2023. Redaction Request due 1/9/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2023. (as)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER: For the reasons discussed at the 12/12/2022 hearing, the Court GRANTS #198 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time for relief different than requested. Responses to motions to dismiss due by 1/3/2023. Replies are due 14 days after the relevant response is filed. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 12/13/2022. Text entry order. (tc) Modified on 12/13/2022 to edit text(tc).
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/12/2022, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by attys Roy Amatore, Colin Flora, Cristina Rodriguez, Rachel Steiner, David Chizewer. Dfts appeared by attys Kathleen DeLaney, Sean Morris, Diana Reiter, Dina Cox, Tracy Roman, Harold Abrahamson, Thomas Connor, Max Kelln. Parties provide status as to discovery. Discussion held as to present status of discovery and pending motions for extension of time; separate orders forthcoming. In Person Status Conference to be set by separate order. (Held in conjunction w/cases 2:18cv375, 2:16cv525, 2:17cv429, 2:17cv414, 2:22cv359) (Court Reporter Ashley Stokes.) (tc)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPORT by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, Nyasha Harris, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, Chance Robinson, Choice Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R., Janae Young, Jesse Young Joint Status Report Regarding Names of Plaintiffs. (Flora, Colin)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #192 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Unopposed) by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, Nyasha Harris, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, Chance Robinson, Choice Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R., Janae Young, Jesse Young. (Flora, Colin)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER: All parties in each case are ORDERED to be present at an in-person status hearing in front of this Court on 01/26/2023, at 10:30 a.m. Hammond/central time. The hearing will be conducted in the ceremonial courtroomon the fourth floor. Requests to appear telephonically will not be entertained. The parties should be prepared to explain the procedural posture of the cases and the bases for jurisdiction, why there are six cases instead of one, articulate the remaining parties, give a short recap of the claims in the amended complaints/complaint, and explain why most of these cases have been pending for such a long time. It is my intention to move these cases along as expeditiously as reasonably possible. As a result, all parties should be prepared to discuss ways to accomplish that. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/02/2022. (sej)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/12/2022 10:00 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 12/2/2022. Text entry order. (tc)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM in Support of #194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Sheridan, Jacqueline)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Sheridan, Jacqueline)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM in Support of #192 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent BlackRock Fund Advisors for The Chemours Company.. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER: This Court has previously determined that this case is related to Holiday, et al., v. Atlantic Richfield Company, et. al., No. 2:16-CV-525. The Court DIRECTS the clerk of court to TRANSFER this case to the Honorable Philip P. Simon. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 11/10/2022. (shk)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Pursuant to ORDER #190 Case Reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon. Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen no longer assigned to the case. (shk)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines per #189 Agreed Notice. Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Halstab LLC, Halox, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, The Chemours Company answer due 11/29/2022. (mrm)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Halstab LLC, Halox, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, The Chemours Company ; answer due by 11/29/2022. (Sheridan, Jacqueline) Modified on 11/3/2022 to correct dft name (mrm).
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Amended pleadings deadline terminated. (shk)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 AMENDED COMPLAINT pursuant to Opinion and Order #187 against E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., The Chemours Company, filed by Nancy Jean Bell, J.Y. 2, N.H., C.R. 1, Ingrid Barbee, C.R. 2, Carmencita Robinson, J.Q., J.Y. 1, V.R., Timothy Bardney, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Y. 3, V.B., William C Scott, Jr, Daven Bell, Leah Bardney.(Pavlack, Eric)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #175 , as outlined in Order. Plaintiffs are granted until 10/24/2022 to file an amended complaint consistent with this opinion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/23/2022. (ash)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Hearing held on April 28, 2022, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court Reporter Ashley N. Stokes, Telephone 219-852-6557, E-mail ashley_stokes@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/11/2022. Redaction Request due 5/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022. (as)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION HEARING re #175 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint held on 4/28/2022, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by attys Colin Flora, Eric Pavlack, Cristina Rodriguez. Dfts appeared by attys Diane Reiter, Kathleen DeLaney, Sean Morris, Dina Cox, Tracy Roman, Andrew Dettmer, Harold Abrahamson, Thomas Connor. Court hears argument on the motion. The matter is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Held in conjunction w/case numbers 2:16cv525, 2:17cv429) (Court Reporter Ashley Stokes.) (tc)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #183 Plaintiff's Request for Oral Argument on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2022 01:45 PM (Central time) via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/8/2022. Text entry order. (tc)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION for Hearing re #175 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint, by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Flora, Colin)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTE ORDER: The Court VACATES the 3/10/22 status conference, and GRANTS the request for oral argument #170 in case number 2:18cv375. The Court SETS a hearing for oral argument on the motion to amend complaint in 2:18cv375 for 4/28/2022 01:00 PM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. The parties in case numbers 2:16cv525, 2:17cv193, and 2:17cv429 are DIRECTED to confer regarding the need for oral argument in those cases. If oral argument is requested, the requesting party must file a notice with the Court by 4/1/22. Any oral argument in those cases will be heard on 4/28/2022, immediately following the hearing in 2:18cv375. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/7/2022. Text entry order. (tc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE to Motion re #175 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint, RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Connor, Thomas)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference (held in conjunction with Cases 2:17-cv-414, 2:16-cv-525, 2:17-cv-429, and 2:18-cv-375 held on 11/18/2021, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court Reporter Angela Phipps, Telephone 219-852-3616, E-mail angela_phipps@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 12/1/2021. Redaction Request due 12/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2022. (ap)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (held in conjunction w/cases 2:16cv525, 2:17cv414, 2:17cv429, 2:18cv375) held on 11/18/2021, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by attys Margaret O'Connor, David Chizewer, Eric Pavlack, Colin Flora, Roy Amatore. Dfts appeared by attys Kathleen DeLaney, Sean Morris, Dina Cox, Tracy Roman, Kevin Toner, Harold Abrahamson, Thomas Connor. Discussion held as to discovery schedule. Parties are encouraged to prepare and serve written discovery requests by 12/20/2021. The Court ORDERS the following limitations on written discovery: maximum 40 requests for production by Plaintiffs jointly to each Defendant; 30 requests for production by Defendants jointly to each Plaintiff; and 10 requests for production by each Defendant to each Plaintiff; maximum of 30 interrogatories by Plaintiffs jointly to each Defendant, 25 interrogatories by Defendants jointly to each Plaintiff, and 10 interrogatories by each Defendant to each Plaintiff; maximum 30 requests for admission by Plaintiffs jointly to each Defendant, 25 requests for admission by Defendants jointly to each Plaintiff, and 10 requests for admission by each Defendant to each Plaintiff. Any limits on depositions, and further discovery deadlines, to be discussed at a future conference. The Court adopts all other agreements regarding the scope of written discovery in 176 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/10/2022 11:00 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. The Court clarifies that, given the procedural posture in the Holiday, Baker and Barbee cases, those plaintiffs are not entitled to receive discovery, but the plaintiffs in all cases are directed to confer in an effort to avoid the potential for future duplicative discovery in these cases. Discussion held as to potential Lone Pine motion. Parties are advised that any such motion should include argument on whether any denial would be with prejudice. (Court Reporter Angela Phipps.) (tc)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: The Court SETS a Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 11/18/2021 11:00 AM (Central Time) in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar and ORDERS the parties in Case Nos. 2:16-cv-525, 2:17-cv-193, 2:17-cv-429, 2:17-cv-414, and 2:18-cv-375 to meet and confer jointly, with the goal of reducing any potential duplicative discovery to the extent possible. The Court further ORDERS the parties in all five cases to attend the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference in Alvarez, set for November 18, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. (Central Time). The parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/2/2021. (lhc)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re #175 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint, filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Flora, Colin)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 RESPONSE to Motion re #175 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint, filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 State Court Complaint, by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Flora, Colin)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #109 ; DENIES the Request for Oral Argument in Support of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC's Motion to Dismiss #111 ; GRANTS Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC, and Halox, LLC's Motion to Dismiss #112 ; GRANTS the Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC's Motion to Dismiss #114 ; GRANTS Motion to Dismiss of the DuPont Company and the Chemours Company #115 ; and GRANTS the Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss of the DuPont Company and the Chemours Company #117 . The Court DISMISSES the Complaint. The Court SETS the deadline to file any motion to amend the pleadings for 11/15/2021. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/16/2021. (bas)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #167 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul J Napoli PHV for all Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/2/2021. (ace)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #166 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Veronica N Vazquez PHV for all Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/3/2021. (ace)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #168 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Cristina M Rodriguez PHV for all Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/3/2021. (ace)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) pursuant to #159 , #160 by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flora, Colin)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #165 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Coral M Odiot PHV for Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., and V.R.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/30/2021. (ace)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Application for Attorney Cristina M. Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Barbee et al. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4644430(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Application for Attorney Paul J. Napoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Barbee et al. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4644133(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Application for Attorney Veronica Natalia Vazquez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Barbee et al. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4644005(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Application for Attorney Coral M. Odiot to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ingrid Barbee, et al.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4643977(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 165 replaced on 7/30/2021 to correct first and last name entries) (ace). Modified on 7/30/2021 (ace).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING 209 Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 2:16-cv-00525-JVB-JPK; GRANTING #163 Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 2:17-cv-00193-JVB-JPK; GRANTING #158 Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 2:17-cv-00414-JVB-JPK; GRANTING #153 Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 2:17-cv-00429-JVB-JPK; GRANTING #154 Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 2:18-cv-00375-JVB-JPK. Parties shall have up to and including 8/2/2021 to file the Joint Status Report required by the Court's May 26, 2021 Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/27/2021. (lhc)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report per #159 , #160 by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Flora, Colin)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Kilies, Janelle)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Cox, Dina)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING without prejudice #132 MOTION TO SET A FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Plaintiffs, filed in 2:17cv414. The Court further ORDERS the parties in Case Nos. 2:17-cv-414, 2:16-cv-525, 2:17-cv-193, 2:17-cv-429, and 2:18-cv-375 to meet and confer jointly regarding the issues enumerated above within sixty days of this Order, and to file a Joint Status Report on those issues within sixty days of this Order. The Court also notes that, going forward, the Court intends to hold hearings at the same time and handle Nos. 2:16-cv-525, 2:17-cv-193, 2:17-cv-429, 2:17-cv-414, and 2:18-cv-375 in a coordinated fashion. Any party may seek leave to hold hearings separately, or to not participate in any hearings held jointly with those cases having a separate cause number. Any party may seek leave to hold hearings separately, or to not participate in any hearings held jointly with those cases having a separate cause number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/26/2021. (lhc)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER DENYING without prejudice 176 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Holiday, Barbee and Baker by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs and 180 Cross MOTION to Sever by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. DENYING as moot 184 MOTION for Hearing re 176 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Holiday, Barbee and Baker, 180 Cross MOTION to Sever, 181 Response to Motion, by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC, filed in 2:16cv525. The Court further ORDERS the parties in Case Nos. 2:16-cv-525, 2:17-cv-193, 2:17-cv-429, 2:17-cv-414, and 2:18-cv-375 to meet and confer jointly regarding the issues enumerated above within sixty days of this Order, and to file a Joint Status Report on those issues within sixty days of this Order. The Court also notes that, going forward, the Court intends to hold hearings in these five cases at the same time and handle them in a coordinated fashion. Any party may seek leave to hold hearings separately, or to not participate in any hearings held jointly with those cases having a separate cause number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/26/2021. (lhc)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on 04/28/2021, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court Reporter Ashley N. Stokes, Telephone 219-852-6557, E-mail ashley_stokes@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/12/2021. Redaction Request due 5/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2021. (sld)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/28/2021, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by attys Eric Pavlack, Colin Flora, David Chizewer, Alex Mendoza. Dfts appeared by attys Diana Reiter, Dina Cox, Tracy Roman, Harold Abrahamson, Thomas Connor, Kevin Toner. Arguments heard as to pending Motion to Consolidate, Cross-Motion to Sever, Request for a Rule 16 Conference. The requests are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Held in conjunction w/case no. 2:16-cv-525, 2:17-cv-429, 2:17-cv-414, 2:18-cv-375). (Tape #ATT HOST.) (tc)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #155 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule April 15, 2021 Telephonic Status Conference. The Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/15/2021 is RESET to 4/28/2021 at 11:00 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/12/2021. Text entry order. (tc)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION to Continue April 15, 2021 Telephonic Status Conference 149 (Unopposed) by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Flora, Colin)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STATUS REPORT by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STATUS REPORT by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Suite Number) (Pavlack, Eric)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Suite Number) (Flora, Colin)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE: Due to the backlog of criminal cases caused by the pandemic, it is unlikely that the assigned district judge will schedule a trial date for this Hammond civil case until 2022 at the earliest. One or more parties previously declined to consent to the magistrate judge who was assigned this case for scheduling purposes before the close of discovery. The parties now have a second opportunity to consent to a Hammond magistrate judge for trial purposes. Rather than the previous random assignment of a magistrate judge, the parties can select which magistrate judge (Magistrate Judges John Martin, Joshua Kolar or Andrew Rodovich) they prefer to hear this case. All parties must agree on which magistrate judge will hear the case and file an Agreed Notice. Only one Agreed Notice should be filed for all parties in this case. Absent an agreement, the case will remain on the docket of the district judge. (ksc)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/15/2021 01:00 PM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. The Court notes that the outstanding motion regarding setting a Rule 16 conference in Cause 2:17-cv-00414 will be discussed. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/31/2021. Text entry order. (tc)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B. Notice of Reply to Hammond Defendants' Opp. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Reply to Hammond Defendants' Opp to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate)(Caro, Louise)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R. re #144 Memorandum of Law (Other) Notice of Reply to DuPont Co. and The Chemours Co. Opp to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Reply to DuPont Co. and The Chemours Co. Opp. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate)(Caro, Louise)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B. re #145 Notice (Other), Notice of Reply to Atlantic Richfield's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Reply to Atlantic Richfield's Opp to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate)(Caro, Louise)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC re #140 Notice (Other), Notice of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLCs Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLCs Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate in Holiday)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #140 Notice (Other), Opposition of The DuPont Company and The Chemours Company to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R. of Motion to Consolidate Holiday, Barbee and Baker cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Holiday Motion to Consolidate)(Caro, Louise)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE to Motion re #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Refiled filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Caro, Louise)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RESPONSE to Motion re #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties Refiled filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Caro, Louise)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE to Motion re #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Refiled filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Caro, Louise)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #131 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance. The appearance of Attorney Jesse M. Feitel on behalf of Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products, LLC is WITHDRAWN. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/9/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R. re #134 Response to Motion, #132 Response to Motion, #133 Response to Motion, Corrected Response (Caro, Louise)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Caro, Louise)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RESPONSE to Motion re #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Caro, Louise)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE to Motion re #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Caro, Louise)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Feitel PHV, Jesse)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: The Court, noting the agreement of the parties, GRANTS #129 Stipulations of Parties. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to [DE 109] Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, [DE 112] Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC, and Halox, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, and [DE 115] Motion to Dismiss of the Dupont Company and the Chemours Company is EXTENDED to 10/8/2020. Defendants' deadline to reply to these motions is SET for 21 days after the filing of any response. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/28/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Parties' Briefing STIPULATION re #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties, #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Pavlack, Eric)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on 09/24/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court Reporter Angela Phipps, Telephone 219-852-3616, E-mail angela_phipps@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/6/2020. Redaction Request due 10/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2020. (ap)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE (held in conjunction w/case 2:16-cv-525) held on 9/24/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Plaintiffs appeared by attorneys Eric Pavlack, Louise Caro, and Colin Flora. Defendants appeared by attorneys Diana Reiter, Sean Morris, Jesse Feitel, Honor Costello, Harold Abrahamson, and Thomas Connor. Discussion held as to Plaintiffs' [DE 124] Motion to Clarify Order. The Court DENIES the [DE 124] Motion to Clarify Order and ORDERS the parties to meet and confer regarding Plaintiffs' requested extension of time. (Tape #ATT HOST - Kolar.) (tc)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/24/2020 11:45 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar re #124 Motion to Clarify Order or in the Alternative Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motions to Dismiss. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/24/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 BRIEF in Opposition to #124 MOTION to Clarify Order re 122 Status Conference,,,, Set Deadlines,,, OR Alternatively MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties, #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FO filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Barbee - Oppn to Mot to Clarify Order or to Extend Deadline to Respond to Mots. to Dismiss - Ex. A,, #2 Barbee - Oppn to Mot to Clarify Order or to Extend Deadline to Respond to Mots. to Dismiss - Ex. B)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Clarify Order re 122 Status Conference,,,, Set Deadlines,,, OR Alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties, #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Pavlack, Eric)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Hearing held on 09/17/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Court Reporter Stacy L. Drohosky, Telephone 219-852-3462, E-mail stacy_drohosky@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/1/2020. Redaction Request due 10/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020. (sld)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE (held in conjunction w/case 2:16-cv-525) held on 9/17/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by attys Eric Pavlack, Louise Caro, Colin Flora. Dfts appeared by attys Diana Reiter, Jesse Feitel, Sean Morris, Kathleen DeLaney, Honor Costello, Janelle Kilies, Harold Abrahamson, Thomas Connor. Parties advise as to their position on the need for a Rule 16b pretrial conference. Parties agree that a R16b conference would not be beneficial at this time. Plaintiffs intend to file a motion to consolidate cases. Any motion to consolidate to be filed by 10/19/2020. Pltfs request an extension on the deadline to file an amended complaint - Granted w/o objection. Pltfs time period within which to file an amended complaint extended to 15 days after a ruling on the Motion to Consolidate, or 15 days after the Pltfs deadline to file a motion to consolidate (Tape #ATT Host - Kolar.) (tc)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle P Kilies on behalf of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company (Kilies, Janelle)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER: The Court sua sponte CONVERTS the Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 09:00 AM to a Telephonic Status Conference. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/4/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Louise R Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Finding the terms proper pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the Court GRANTS the relief requested in Plaintiff's #84 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company and DISMISSES all claims against Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company. The Court ORDERS that the objecting parties have reserved their rights under Indiana Code 34-51-2-14 to name Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company as a non-party. Party Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/4/20. (kjp)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Judicial Notice re #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D). (Sooy PHV, Kathleen) Modified on 9/4/2020 to edit text (mlc). Modified on 9/8/2020 to edit docket text. Document is a motion. (nal)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Support of #115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Join Required Parties by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Judicial Notice by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Evidence, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Reiter PHV, Diana) Modified on 9/4/2020 to edit text (mlc). Modified on 9/8/2020 to edit docket text. Document is a motion. (nal)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Support of #112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for Hearing re #110 Brief in Support, #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 BRIEF in Support of #109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Reiter PHV, Diana)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2020 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/24/2020. (tc)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #106 Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Motion for Remand. Plaintiffs' #33 Motion for Remand is WITHDRAWN. Per the Court's order at Docket Entry 104, Defendants' deadline to refile any responsive pleadings is SET for 9/3/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/4/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION to Withdraw #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Pavlack, Eric)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Mail Returned from Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso as Undeliverable - #103 Order. (lhc)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE on or before July 31, 2020, a supplement to the Motion to Remand discussing how, if at all, the Seventh Circuit decision in Baker affects Plaintiffs' position in the Motion to Remand #33 . Defendants will have 14 days in which to file a response to the supplement, and Plaintiffs will have 7 days in which to file a reply. Alternatively, if Plaintiffs conclude that their position in the Motion to Remand is not supportable in light of Baker, Plaintiffs may file a motion to withdraw the Motion to Remand instead of a supplement. The Court SETS the deadline for Defendants to file answers to the complaint to 30 days after resolution of the Motion to Remand #33 . The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reinstate the Motion to Remand #33 as pending on the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/17/20. (ksp)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: The Court hereby LIFTS the stay entered in this case. The parties' other requests will be addressed by Judge Van Bokkelen by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/10/2020. (cc: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso) (bas) Modified on 7/10/2020 to add cc (bas).
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC re #48 Response to Motion,,,,, #50 Response to Motion, #63 Response/Reply (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reiter PHV, Diana)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta K Gumbiner on behalf of Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline R Sheridan on behalf of Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc. (Sheridan, Jacqueline)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Connor on behalf of Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc. (Connor, Thomas)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE DE #94 . The Court notes that [DE 94] the motion for substitution of counsel lists "Hammond, LLC" as a party to this action. As no such party exists, the Court is unable grant the motion. The Court further notes that, pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 83-8(a), Attorney Jacqueline R. Sheridan must file a notice of appearance. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/1/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: The Court CONSTRUES DE #93 as a motion to withdraw and the request is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Hogan on behalf of Defendants Halox, LLC, Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., and Halstab, LLC is WITHDRAWN. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 83-8 (a), Attorney Krysta K. Gumbiner must file a notice of appearance. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/1/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: The Court CONSTRUES #92 as a motion to withdraw and the request is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The appearance of Attorney George James Tzanetopoulos on behalf of Defendants Halox, LLC, Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., and Halstab, LLC is WITHDRAWN. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 83-8(a), Attorney Thomas M. Connor must file a notice of appearance. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/1/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jacqueline R. Sheridan for Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Connor, Thomas)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Krysta K. Gumbiner for Thomas E. Hogan by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Connor, Thomas)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thomas M. Connor for George James Tzanetopoulos by Defendants Halox LLC, Halstab LLC, Hammon Lead Products LLC, Hammond Group, Inc.. (Connor, Thomas)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER TO STAY ACTION PENDING APPEAL: It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties' #90 Joint Stipulation Regarding Stay of Proceedings is ACCEPTED; IT IS ORDERED that this action is STAYED, pending outcome of the appeal now pending in the Seventh Circuit; and ORDERED that the Parties shall file a joint status report in this action advising the Court of the ruling within 14 days of any such ruling. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 11/15/2019. (jss)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Stay of Proceedings by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Milburn PHV, Nancy)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent Corteva, Inc. for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company.. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STATUS REPORT by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Stay Execution of any Remand Order this Court May Issue by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OBJECTION by Hammond Group, Inc. to to Voluntary Dismissal of Def "Tesoro". (Abrahamson, Harold)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Tesoro Refining and Markeeting Company by All Plaintiffs (Flora, Colin) Modified dkt text on 3/26/2019 (kjp).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Court GRANTS #82 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Kathryn W. Hutchinson. The Court ORDERS that the appearance of Attorney Kathryn W. Hutchinson on behalf of Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC is hereby withdrawn. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/7/2019. Text entry order. (tc)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kathryn W. Hutchinson by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Milburn PHV, Nancy)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added pursuant to General Order 2019-1. Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry no longer assigned to case. (tc)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #79 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Diana E Reiter PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/28/2018. (mtr)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #78 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jesse M Feitel PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/28/2018. (mtr)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Application for Attorney Diana E. Reiter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3736007(Reiter PHV, Diana)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Application for Attorney Jesse M. Feitel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3735971(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Pavlack, Eric)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Honor R Costello PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 7/10/2018. (mtr)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Application for Attorney Honor Rose Costello to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3609695 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing)(Costello PHV, Honor)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Pavlack, Eric)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin E Flora on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Flora, Colin)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance. The appearance of Attorney Shreya A. Fadia on behalf of Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products, LLC is hereby withdrawn. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 2/6/2018. (mr)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Fadia PHV, Shreya)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 .
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 *DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE* ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(e),the Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this case to Judge Van Bokkelen. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 12/4/2017. (jss) Modified on 12/4/2017 (jss).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER granting #65 Motion to Withdraw Name from Docket. The appearance of Attorney Colin Flora on behalf of Plaintiffs is hereby withdrawn. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/13/2017. (mr)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Colin Flora (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(jss)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SURRESPONSE by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R. to #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D -- Beamis v. Buffalo Pumps, Inc.)(Pavlack, Eric)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Deadline to file sur-reply terminated. (mlc)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SUR-REPLY by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC to #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Milburn PHV, Nancy)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Dft's #60 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, finding good cause shown. The Court ORDERS Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC to FILE the surreply upon receipt of this Order. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff up to and including 7/14/2017 to file a surresponse, if any. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 7/7/2017. (lns)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Pavlack, Eric)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Milburn PHV, Nancy)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION Judicial Notice re #58 Reply to Response to Motion,, Exhibits A, B & C by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Pavlack, Eric)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #34 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Sathya V. Yalvigi re #9 Notice (Other), Pursuant to Inherent Power of the Court to Control Its Docket filed by Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--ARCO Response Brief in Sherwin-Williams, #2 Exhibit B--Kerr Affidavit in Sherwin-Williams, #3 Exhibit C--Ohio Reply in Sherwin-Williams)(Pavlack, Eric)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #52 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Shreya A Fadia PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/27/17. (mtr)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #46 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas E Hogan PHV for Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., and Hammond Lead Products, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/20/17. (mtr)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER granting #54 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline, finding good cause shown. The deadline for Plas to file a reply in support of the Motion for Remand #33 and the Motion to Strike #34 is extended to 6/30/2017. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/15/2017. (mr)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #34 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Sathya V. Yalvigi re #9 Notice (Other), Pursuant to Inherent Power of the Court to Control Its Docket from June 14 to June 30, (Unopposed) by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend)(Pavlack, Eric)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #45 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Suzanne M Alton de Eraso PHV for Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., and Hammond Lead Products, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/12/17. (mtr)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Application for Attorney Shreya A. Fadia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3272880(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION Judicial Notice re #50 Response to Motion, for Remand and Motion to Strike by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit of Sathya Yalvigi (Ex. 1-10))(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting #47 Unopposed Plas' Motion to Stay Briefing on Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC and Halox, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, finding good cause shown. The Court hereby STAYS the briefing on the Motion to Dismiss #41 pending a ruling on the Motion to Remand #33 . Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/9/2017. (mr)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of K. Austin Kerr, Ph.D., #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54)(Milburn PHV, Nancy)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Stay re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Unopposed) by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Pavlack, Eric)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Application for Attorney Thomas Edward Hogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of HAMMOND GROUP, INC.; HAMMOND LEAD PRODUCTS LLC; HALSTAB, LLC; HALOX, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3267689(Hogan PHV, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2017: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - New York) (ksc).
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Application for Attorney Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of HAMMOND GROUP, INC.; HAMMOND LEAD PRODUCTS LLC; HALSTAB, LLC; HALOX, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3267137(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 45 replaced on 6/9/2017) (mtr).
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting #36 Unopposed Motion of the DuPont Company and the Chemours Company for Extension on Responsive Pleadings, finding good cause shown. The deadline for Dfts E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company to respond to the Complaint is extended to fourteen days after the Court rules on the Motion to Remand. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/1/2017. (mr)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting #40 Atlantic Richfield Company's and BP West Coast Products LLC's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plas' Complaint, finding good cause shown. The deadline for Dfts Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC to respond to the Complaint is extended to 14 days after the Court rules on the Motion to Remand. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/1/2017. (mr)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support of #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., Hammond Lead Products, LLC. (Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathryn W Hutchinson PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/30/17. (mtr)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nancy G Milburn PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/30/17. (mtr)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #30 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean O Morris PHV for Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/30/17. (mtr)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 State Court Complaint, by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 BRIEF in Support of #33 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #34 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Sathya V. Yalvigi re #9 Notice (Other), Pursuant to Inherent Power of the Court to Control Its Docket filed by Nancy Jean Bell, J.Y. 2, N.H., C.R. 1, Ingrid Barbee, C.R. 2, Carmencita Robinson, J.Q., J.Y. 1, V.R., Timothy Bardney, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Y. 3, V.B., William C Scott, Jr, Daven Bell, Leah Bardney. (Pavlack, Eric)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Sathya V. Yalvigi re #9 Notice (Other), Pursuant to Inherent Power of the Court to Control Its Docket by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Pavlack, Eric)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Ingrid Barbee, Leah Bardney, Timothy Bardney, Daven Bell, Nancy Jean Bell, C.R. 1, C.R. 2, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Q., J.Y. 1, J.Y. 2, J.Y. 3, N.H., Carmencita Robinson, William C Scott, Jr, V.B., V.R.. (Pavlack, Eric)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Application for Attorney Kathryn W. Hutchinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3259180(Hutchinson PHV, Kathryn)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Application for Attorney Nancy G. Milburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3259165(Milburn PHV, Nancy)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Application for Attorney Sean O. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company and BP West Coast Products LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3259137(Morris PHV, Sean)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #26 Notice of Related Action filed by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. Pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(e), the Clerk is directed to reassign the referral judge in this case to Magistrate Judge Paul R. Cherry. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 6/22/2017 @11:30 before Magistrate Judge John E. Martin, and the related ddl within which to file a joint discovery plan are VACATED. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/18/2017. (smb)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. Magistrate Judge John E Martin no longer assigned to case. (smb)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: As noted by the defendants, this case arises out of the same transaction or occurrence as the previously filed case Holiday, et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company, et al, No. 2:16-cv-525, which is currently pending before the Honorable Joseph S. Van Bokkelen. Pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(e), the Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this case to Judge Van Bokkelen.. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 5/17/17. (jss)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company of Related Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen added. Judge Rudy Lozano no longer assigned to case. (jss)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney George James Tzanetopoulos PHV for Halox, LLC, Halstab, LLC, Hammond Group, Inc., and Hammond Lead Products, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/16/17. (mtr)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Application for Attorney George James Tzanetopoulos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hammond Group, Inc.; Hammond Lead Products LLC; Halstab LLC; Halox, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3250538(Tzanetopoulos PHV, George)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2017 11:30 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 6/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/15/2017. (smb)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tracy A Roman PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/11/17. (mtr)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/11/17. (mtr)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Application for Attorney Tracy A. Roman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3245952(Roman PHV, Tracy)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Application for Attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of E. I. duPont de Nemours and Company and the Chemours Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3245726(Sooy PHV, Kathleen)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DISCLOSURE of Corporate Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rulles of Civil Procedure 7.1 filed by Hammond Group, Inc..(Abrahamson, Harold)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Abrahamson on behalf of Hammond Group, Inc. (Abrahamson, Harold)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Answers for Defendants Hammond Group, Inc.; Hammond Lead Products, LLC; Halstab, LLC; and Halox, LLC due by 6/1/2017. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/8/2017. No PDF attached. (jp)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED (docket sheet). State Court Case No. 45D04-1702-CT-00025. (nal)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Hammond Lead Products, LLC, Halstab, LLC Halox, LLC and by Defendant Hammond Group, Inc.. (Abrahamson, Harold)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The Court GRANTS but for relief different than requested the Unopposed Motion of the Dupont Company and the Chemours Company for Extension on Responsive Pleadings DE #10 and Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC and Atlantic Richfield Companys Unopposed Motion for Extension on Responsive Pleadings DE #11 . The Court ORDERS that the deadline for Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company; BP West Coast Products, LLC; E.I. Du Pont De Nemoursand Company; and The Chemours Company to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended through June 1, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/4/17. (kjp)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/3/2017. (smb)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 State Court Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, Unopposed by Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 State Court Complaint, by Defendants E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cox, Dina)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Notice In Support of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons to Du Pont, #3 Exhibit C - Summons to The Chemours Co, #4 Exhibit D - Yalvigi Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Records)(Cox, Dina)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc for The Chemours Company.. (Cox, Dina)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company. (Cox, Dina)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina M Cox on behalf of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company (Cox, Dina)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 2 - War Supply Contracts filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Judge Rudy Lozano and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. *NEW CASE* (jss)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent BP Products North America, Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP West Coast Products LLC; Corporate Parent BP America Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for Atlantic Richfield Company.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A DeLaney on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP West Coast Products LLC (DeLaney, Kathleen)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3233233.) from Lake County Superior Court 4, Cause No. 45D04-1702-CT-00025, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Nancy Jean Bell, J.Y. 2, N.H., C.R. 1, Ingrid Barbee, C.R. 2, Carmencita Robinson, J.Q., J.Y. 1, V.R., Timothy Bardney, Veeda Chandler, J.C. 1, J.C. 2, J.Y. 3, V.B., William C Scott, Jr, Daven Bell, Leah Bardney.(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbee et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Barbee
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.Y. 1
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.B.
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veeda Chandler
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C. 2
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmencita Robinson
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C. 1
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.H.
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Jean Bell
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.R. 2
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bardney
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Bardney
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.R. 1
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.Q.
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.Y. 3
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.Y. 2
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.R.
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daven Bell
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davin Bell
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Scott
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyasha Harris
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chance Robinson
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choice Robinson
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janae Young
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Young
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Represented By: Colin E Flora
Represented By: Coral M Odiot PHV
Represented By: Cristina M Rodriguez PHV
Represented By: Eric S Pavlack
Represented By: Louise R Caro
Represented By: Paul J Napoli PHV
Represented By: Steven Alvarez
Represented By: Veronica N Vazquez PHV
Represented By: Walter J Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: Honor R Costello PHV
Represented By: Tracy A Roman PHV
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV
Represented By: Janelle P Kilies
Represented By: Kathleen T Sooy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond Group, Inc.
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halstab LLC
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: Honor R Costello PHV
Represented By: Tracy A Roman PHV
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy PHV
Represented By: Janelle P Kilies
Represented By: Kathleen T Sooy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Diana E Reiter PHV
Represented By: Sean O Morris PHV
Represented By: Kathryn W Hutchinson PHV
Represented By: Jesse M Feitel PHV
Represented By: Shreya A Fadia PHV
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn PHV
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Represented By: Diana E Reiter PHV
Represented By: Sean O Morris PHV
Represented By: Kathryn W Hutchinson PHV
Represented By: Jesse M Feitel PHV
Represented By: Shreya A Fadia PHV
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn PHV
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halox LLC
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammon Lead Products LLC
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: George James Tzanetopoulos PHV
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond Lead Products, LLC
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halstab, LLC
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halox, LLC
Represented By: Harold Abrahamson
Represented By: Jacqueline R Sheridan
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Represented By: Thomas M Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?