United States of America et al v. Wagoner et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and State of Indiana
Defendant: Don J. Wagoner, Marilyn L. Wagoner, Wagoner Medical Center, L.L.C., Wagoner Medical Center, P.C. and Don J. Wagoner, M.D. and Marilyn L. Wagoner, M.D., P.C.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00478
Filed: December 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Presiding Judge: Rudy Lozano
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 OPINION and ORDER: Defendants Rule 72(a) Objection to Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration 61 is OVERRULED, and the Third Amended Complaint 83 is ACCEPTED. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 03/31/2021. (edb)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 51 MOTION for Reconsideration re 46 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, filed by Marilyn L. Wagoner, Wagoner Medical Center, L.L.C., Don J. Wagoner, Don J. Wagoner, M.D. and Marilyn L. Wagoner, M.D., P.C., Wagoner Medical Center, P.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/22/19. (ksp)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 11 Defendants Marilyn L. Wagoner, Wagoner Medical Center, P.C., Don J. Wagoner, M.D. and Marilyn L. Wagoner, M.D., P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/20/18. (ksp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Wagoner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Wayne T Ault - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: Steven A Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don J. Wagoner
Represented By: Christopher A Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn L. Wagoner
Represented By: Christopher A Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner Medical Center, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher A Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagoner Medical Center, P.C.
Represented By: Christopher A Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don J. Wagoner, M.D. and Marilyn L. Wagoner, M.D., P.C.
Represented By: Christopher A Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?