Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) v. Apex Capital Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Defendant: OTR Capital, LLC, LMX Transport Corp, Lesmeister Transportation Inc, Recon Logistics LLC, Rio Importers USA Inc, Light Logistics Inc, Jason Transport Inc, Delta Carrier Group, Inc., Carrier Management, Inc., Fischer Truck and Bus Service, Inc., BTI, Inc., CJM Financial, Inc., Airline Transportation, Jeff Bryan Transport, PDM Financial, Lozar Inc, MnAlan Trucking Corp, Ecklund Logistics, Inc., Art Logistics, Puma Logistics, Bo Tech Transportation, AMG Freight, Brite Logistics, Inc., IMG Trucking, Inc., MCDA Logistics LLC, CoreLogic, Nedex Express Inc, Direct Service Transport, Inc., Artudianti, Inc., Liv Enterprises Inc, C & I Trucking, Inc., Steelhead Finance, Vero Business Capital LLC, Go To Logistics, Inc., Apex Capital Corp., TAFS Premium Finance, Inc., Riviera Finance, Green Mile, Inc., Quality Refrigerated Transportation, Kommitted Transportation Inc, Crestmark Bank, Kottke Trucking Inc, Integrated Logistics & Associates, Brian, Inc., AG Expedited, Inc., AT Line, Inc., Eagle Capital Corporation, Benjamin Best Freight, IIK Transport, Inc., Cross Express, Co., Road Wolves Inc, NR.1 Transport, J Rayl Transport Inc, Nussbaum, Arnhalt Transportation Brokerage, Inc., North American Transport Services LLC, Pavestone Capital, DMN Transport, Inc., Primium Express Inc, TCI Business Capital, Inc., Advance Business Capital, DF Carrier LLC, Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc., Adex, Inc., Off Ramp Trucking LLC, Rama Transportation LLC, Business Lines Corp., JP Trucking Services Inc, SevenOaks Capital, EMR Express, Kania Inc, Olero Inc, Freight Factoring Specialists, JD Factors LLC, TAFS Premium Finance Inc, Arrow Trans Corp., Lowell Logistics Inc, AMZ Trans, Inc., Heliosphere Inc., JPMKL Inc, Navigation Global LLC, GT Logistics, Inc., Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc, Midwest Express Inc, RD Limited Partnership, Liberty Transit LLC, Jeep Transport Inc, Real Transport Inc, TBS Factoring Service, Transportation Funding Group, Great Wide Truckload Management, Harrington Ridge Coal & Stove, LLC, FirstLine Funding Group, Lintrans Inc, S3 Corp LLC, Insight Technology, Inc., Echo Trucking, Inc., MDS Trucking V Inc, Matrix Inc, Lama Trucking Inc, BFreight, Inc., Navigator Express Inc, JBA Trucking LLC, Bulmaks, Inc., GP Transportation, BM, Corp., Cargo Transit Corp., Advance Business Capital LLC, Thunder Funding, Koned Logistics Inc, Natalie Express, MMJ Transportation Inc, JC Trans Co, Load to Ride Transportation, Liv Transportation, JD Factors, LLC, Compass Funding Solutions, Financial Carrier Services, Central Logistics Group, Inc., Dolche Truckload, Corp., DKL Trucking, Inc., Roadstar Inc, ANG Transportation, Inc., GTS Transportation Corp., CMW Transport Co., Inc., Accutrac Capital, Inc., Flex Transport, Inc., Highboost Corporation, Sam's Trucking Services LLC, Far West Capital Transportation, Oak Hill Capital Group, K-Way Express Inc, Hanjra Trucking, HM Trans, Inc., Blast Transport, Inc., DC Transport, Inc., Good Source Trucking, Inc., Riviera Finance of Texas, Inc., Quality Transport Brokers Corp, TAFS Premium Finance Inc., Fast Loading, Inc., Dosped, Inc., Baxter Bailey & Associates, Great Plains Transportation Services Inc, IBY Transport, 1st Choice Express, Inc., Dilley Zimny Insurance, Picadello Enterprises Inc, Assist Financial Services, Inc., ATD Express, Inc., AMG Logistics, Inc., BR Cargo, LLC, Divine Enterprises, GI Super Service, Inc., Prestige Inc, KForce Express Inc, D & S Factors LLC, Free Style Trucking, Inc., MPK Trucking LLC, Orange Commercial Credit, Amerifreight Systems, LLC, Fleet One Factoring, LLC, CD Consortium Corp., One Nation Trans, Lemberg Group Inc, MGR Freight System, Transam Financial Services, Inc., Security Transport Inc, American Motor Transportation, Inc., Merx Global Inc, CD Consortium Corporation, Phoenix Capital Group, LLC, Quality Freight LLC, Autodina Corp., Innovation Truck Service LLC, RTS Financial Service, Foley Carrier Services, LLC, Marka Transport Inc, Iman Carriers, Inc., Namanagh Inc, AG Lines, Inc., Landliner Inc, Ansonia Credit Data, Giannakis Transportation, Inc., L E G S Transport Inc, Real Trucking Inc, Out Witting The Rest Inc, Credit Express, Inc., Eagle Trucking Company, Insight Technology Inc, G.G. Barnett Transport, Inc., Aladdin Financial Inc, Sedena Trucking Services Inc, Interstate Capital Corporation, Jodi Express, Quick Freight Logistics Inc, CoreFund Capital LLC, Partners Funding, Inc., G & G Logistics, Inc., Conick Logistics, Inc., BL Quality Trans Inc., Black Wolf Transportaion, Multi-Load Transport Inc, MS US Inc, Diamond Freight, Inc., Oneway Logistics Inc, Saint John Capital Corporation, Black Sea Transportation, Freightzone Express, Inc., Bay and Bay Transportation, Goldmax Carrier, Inc., NEPA Distribution LLC, Lucky Way Logistics Inc, MTY Transportation LLC, Delta Transport, Inc., Sunbelt Finance, Primary Transportation Services, Inc., Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Fargo Transport doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Bekteshi Logistics, Inc. doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Central Logistics, LLC doing business as Triumph Business Capital, RD Limited Partnership doing business as Richard Daniels Transportation, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Quality Wheels Inc doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of MMJ Transportation Inc doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of River North Industries Inc doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Kays M Ahmed doing business as Triumph Business Capital, GT Expedited, Ansonia Credit Data as assignee of S & H Trucking doing business as Southwest Credit Management Assoc Inc, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Delta Carrier Group, Inc. doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Overland Trucking LLC doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of MD Freight Inc doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Advance Transport, Inc. doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Primus Logistics Inc doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of M & S Express, Inc. doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Daily Transport, Inc. doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of D & M Logistics, LLC doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of RD Limited Partnership dba Richard Daniels Transportation doing business as Triumph Business Capital, JBA Trucking LLC doing business as JBA Family Trucking, Advance Business Capital as assignee of A & T Trucking, LLC doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Thunder Carrier Services, Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of B & M Express, Inc. doing business as Triumph Business Capital, Sky Transport Inc, Transit Core LLC, State 2 State Trucks Inc, Tower Truck Lines Inc, Ansonia Credit Data doing business as Southwest Credit Management Assoc Inc as assignee of S&H Trucking, Taylor Truck Line, VIP Expedited, Van Dam Transport, Transrapid inc, Victory Transit Inc, T&T Freight, Smart Freight Inc, Varta Inc, West Proline Logistics, SpeedX Transport, LSQ Funding Group LC, DLK Trucking Inc, VIA Logistics Inc, MGR Freight LLC, TAK Trucking Inc, Stoughton Logistics, Strada Logistics LLC, Manning Transfer Inc, TraLo Companies Inc, Thunder Funding/Thunder Carrier Services Inc, Speedway Logistics Inc, Valor Express Inc, Standard Trucking LLC, Shotgun Express Inc, Three Way Logistics Inc, TBS Factoring Service LLC, Tumar Express Inc, South Bay Logistics Inc, Tadz Logistics Inc, Premium Express Inc, SNR Solutions Inc, Black Wolf Transportation, Sonic Trans Inc, FLS Express LLC, Tiger Logistics, Wild Eagle Express, White Star Transport Inc, U Brothers Inc, Quick Pay, Z Top Logistics Inc, Z Transportation Inc, Ultra Trucking Inc, Silvicom Inc, Trucking Experts LLC, Vargas Transportation LLC, TGL Logistics Inc, Baxter Bailey & Associates as assignee of RXG Cargo Corp as assignee of Bluestar Services LLC as assignee of Boost Enterprises as assignee of CDA Delivery Service Inc as assignee of Chris Lines Company as assignee of Coast Connection Inc as assignee, Graval Corporation, Bay View Funding, Smarten Transport, Tombach Corp, Goldcoast Logistics Group, Transfreight Logistics Inc, US Advance Transportation Inc, TVM Express Inc, Spectrum Express Inc, Tac Trans Inc, USA Cargo Inc, Q Carriers Inc, Sky Express Inc, Smith Transportation Service Inc, Advance Business Capital LLC doing business as Triumph Business Capital as assignee of A&T Trucking LLC as assignee of B&M Express Inc as assignee of Bekteshi Logistics Inc as assignee of Central Logistics LLC as assignee of D&M Logistics LLC as assi, Titan Quality Transport, Twin Express Inc, Solid Group Inc, Windy Hill Foliage Inc, Transhield Trucking Inc, S3 Capital LLC and SL Black Fox Transport LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00075
Filed: February 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 292 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (shk)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 OPINION AND ORDER: The Plaintiffs Motion to Modify Entered Order #290 and Stipulation of Dismissal #289 are GRANTED. The Courts prior Order #288 is VACATED. The Plaintiff is DISCHARGED of any duties it may have owed underSurety Bond No. MN 26771, Form BMC-84. Defendant Diamond Freight, Inc. is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to disburse the funds deposited with this Court as follows: Dolche Truckload Corp. $731.22, DSCH Capital Partners, LLC d/b/a Far West Capital Transportation $1,075.32, Go To Logistics, Inc. $64,536.88, and Premium Express, Inc. $8,656.58. After the distributions have been made, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 2/4/2020. cc: Financial (shk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 290 MOTION to Amend/Correct #288 Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds,, by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
January 2, 2020 Filing 289 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Diamond Freight, Inc. by Plaintiffs Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 **VACATED pursuant to #291 ** ORDER GRANTING #287 Motion to Distribute Monies Deposited with the Registry of the Court. The Plaintiff is DISCHARGED of any duties it may have owed under Surety Bond No. MN 26771, Form BMC-84. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to disburse the funds deposited with this Court as follows: Diamond Freight, Inc. $9,191.10, Dolche Truckload Corp. $641.60, DSCH Capital Partners, LLC d/b/a Far West Capital Transportation $943.52 and Go To Logistics, Inc. $56,627.96Premium Express, Inc. $7,595.82. After the distributions have been made, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 12/31/19. cc: SB Financial (kjp) Modified on 2/5/2020 (shk).
November 26, 2019 Filing 287 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
November 18, 2019 Filing 286 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se parties). (nal)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #284 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. The Court ORDERS that JUDGMENT be entered against all defaulted Defendants as listed in Exhibit A, ECF No. [284-1]. The defaulted Defendants as listed in Exhibit A, ECF No. [284-1] are PROHIBITED from instituting or prosecuting any action against Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) on Surety Bond No. MN 26771. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 11/15/19. (Copy mailed to pro se parties). (nal)
October 25, 2019 Filing 284 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cranley, Grace)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #280 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). The Plaintiff may refile the Motion and cite to the applicable authority under which the Motion is brought. The Court requests that the Plaintiff prepare a proposed order regarding the Motion and submit it to chambers' email. The Plaintiff must do so on or before October 25, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/10/19. (ksp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 282 STATEMENT Supplemental Jurisdictional. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file, on or before 09/10/2019, a supplemental jurisdictional statement identifying all of the elements of the citizenship of at least two diverse adverse claimants to demonstrate the minimal diversity of citizenship between the adverse claimants required under 28 U.S.C. 1335. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 08/13/2019. (jat)
July 9, 2019 Filing 280 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cranley, Grace)
June 24, 2019 Filing 279 AMENDED ANSWER to #227 Amended Complaint by Premium Express Inc.(Mahoney, Ryan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 278 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Harrington Ridge Coal & Stove, LLC; Solid Group, Inc.; MS US, Inc.; Blast Transport, Inc.; TGL Logistics, Inc.; Oak Hill Capital Group for US Cross, Inc.; Iman Carriers, Inc.; Fast Loading, Inc.; Free Style Trucking, Inc.* regarding #189 and #206 Motions for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (cc: Pro Se parties) (tlr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 277 NOTICE by Diamond Freight, Inc. Notice of Filing for Answer to Amended Complaint (LaForte PHV, George)
June 12, 2019 Filing 276 ANSWER to #227 Amended Complaint by Diamond Freight, Inc..(LaForte PHV, George)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #84 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 06/12/2019. (jat)
June 11, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Amended Answer to Amended Complaint to be filed by 6/25/2019 by defendants Premium Express Inc and Diamond Freight Inc per 274 Telephonic Status Conference. (jld)
June 10, 2019 Filing 274 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/10/2019, before Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann. Pla appeared by atty Grace Winkler Cranley. Dft appeared by attys George LaForte, Tomasz Koziol and Matthew Barrette. Parties advise as to case status. The Court APPROVES and ACCEPTS the stipulations to dismiss #175 STIPULATION to Dismiss TAFS, Inc. #190 STIPULATION to Dismiss Stoughton Logistics LLC. #202 STIPULATION to Dismiss Transam Financial Services, assignee of VSM Express and DM World Transportation. #203 STIPULATION to Dismiss Off Ramp Trucking, LLC. #212 STIPULATION to Dismiss OTR Capital LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of the following: BRF Enterprises; Carry On Express Logistics; EFS Inc; Guerrero Transportation; Hailey's Logistics LLC; Highland Dallas Freight Inc; Joonam's Trucking LL. #213 STIPULATION to Dismiss Bay View Funding, assignee of White Star Transport Inc. Parties advise as to status of #84 Motion to Dismiss, #189 and #206 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default. The Court GRANTS the oral motion by Premium Express Inc and Diamond Freight, Inc. to file an amended answer to the amended complaint. Answer due by 6/25/2019. Magistrate Judge Martin will continue to monitor case. (FTR) (rs)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER FOR CHIEF JUDGE THERESA L SPRINGMANN. Telephonic Status Conference SET for 6/10/2019 10:30 AM (CENTRAL TIME) in US District Court - Hammond before Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann. Court to initiate the call. (rs)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER finding moot #270 Motion to Reassign Case. (Case reassigned to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2019. Text entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/13/2019. (smb)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Judge Rudy Lozano no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/19. (dk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 270 MOTION to Reassign Case by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
February 11, 2019 Filing 269 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Strada Logistics LLC and Vargas Transportation LLC* regarding #268 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (ksp)
February 8, 2019 Filing 268 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Strada Logistics LLC and Vargas Transportation LLC by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
February 7, 2019 Filing 267 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) as to Vargas Transportation LLC. (Cranley, Grace)
February 7, 2019 Filing 266 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) as to Strada Logistics LLC. (Cranley, Grace)
December 17, 2018 Filing 265 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Goldcoast Logistics Group and US Advance Transportation Inc* regarding #263 and #264 Motions for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). cc: pro se parties (rmc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 264 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to US Advance Transportation Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service)(Cranley, Grace)
December 12, 2018 Filing 263 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Goldcoast Logistics Group by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 30, 2018 Filing 262 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *JPKML, Inc., Graval Corporation, Credit Express, Inc. as assignee of Goldmax Carrier, Inc., RTS Financial Service, Inc. as assignee of HM Trans, Inc., IMG Trucking, Inc., Trucking Experts, LLC, Sam's Trucking Services, LLC, Out Witting the Rest, Inc., Nussbaum, Load to Ride Transportation, Light Logistics, LLC, Jeff Bryan Transport, Inc., Jason Transport, Inc., IBY Transport, Conick Logistics, Inc., GI Super Service, Inc., Foley Carrier Services, LLC, as Assignee of Aplus Express; Foley Carrier Services, LLC, as Assignee of Butter B Trucking; Foley Carrier Services, LLC, as Assignee of Dyer Integrated; and Foley Carrier Services, LLC, as Assignee of Smart Choice* regarding #248 , #249 , #250 , #251 , #252 , #253 , #254 , #255 , #256 , #257 , #258 , #259 , #260 , and #261 , Motions for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (lhc) Modified on 11/30/2018 add cc: Pro Se Parties (lhc).
November 29, 2018 Filing 261 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Foley Carrier Services LLC as assignees of Aplus Express; Butter B Trucking; Dyer Integrated; Smart Choice by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit D-Answer, #5 Exhibit E-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 260 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to GI Super Service Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 259 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Conick Logistics Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 258 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to IBY Transport by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 257 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Jason Transport Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 256 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Jeff Bryan Transport Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 255 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Light Logistics LLC by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 254 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Load to Ride Transportation by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 253 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Nussbaum by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 252 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Out Witting the Rest Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 251 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Sams Trucking Services LLC by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 250 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Trucking Experts LLC by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 249 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Credit Express Inc assignee of Goldmax Carrier Inc; RTS Financial Service Inc assignee of HM Trans Inc; IMG Trucking by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 29, 2018 Filing 248 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to JPKML Inc; Graval Corporation by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 28, 2018 Filing 247 Summons Issued as to Vargas Transportation LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
November 27, 2018 Filing 246 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) as to US Advance Transportation Inc. (Cranley, Grace)
November 27, 2018 Filing 245 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Goldcoast Logistics Group served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
November 27, 2018 Filing 244 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
October 17, 2018 Filing 243 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *FLS Express LLC* regarding #241 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (jld)
October 12, 2018 Filing 242 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Real Transport Inc; Trucking Experts LLC; Manning Transfer Inc; Q Carriers Inc; SpeedX Transport* regarding #241 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (jld)
October 10, 2018 Filing 241 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Real Transport Inc; Trucking Experts LLC; FLS Express LLC; Manning Transfer Inc; Q Carriers Inc; SpeedX Transport by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit D-Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit E-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
October 9, 2018 Filing 240 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). SpeedX Transport served on 6/20/2018, answer due 7/11/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
October 5, 2018 Filing 239 Summons Issued as to Goldcoast Logistics Group. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
October 4, 2018 Filing 238 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
October 4, 2018 Filing 237 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Credit Express, Inc. served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
October 4, 2018 Filing 236 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). FLS Express LLC served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Manning Transfer Inc served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Q Carriers Inc served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
October 4, 2018 Filing 235 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Trucking Experts LLC served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
October 4, 2018 Filing 234 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Real Transport Inc served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
October 4, 2018 Filing 233 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) as to Graval Corporation. (Cranley, Grace)
October 4, 2018 Filing 232 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) as to JPMKL Inc. (Cranley, Grace)
September 21, 2018 Filing 231 ANSWER to #227 Amended Complaint by Dolche Truckload, Corp..(Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
September 13, 2018 Filing 230 Summons Issued as to Credit Express, Inc., FLS Express LLC, Graval Corporation, Manning Transfer Inc, Q Carriers Inc, Trucking Experts LLC, US Advance Transportation Inc, Vargas Transportation LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
September 13, 2018 Filing 229 ANSWER to #227 Amended Complaint by Go To Logistics, Inc..(Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
September 13, 2018 Filing 228 ANSWER to #227 Amended Complaint & Notice of Filing by Diamond Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(LaForte PHV, George)
September 12, 2018 Filing 227 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons)(Cranley, Grace)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #220 Motion to Amend Complaint in Interpleader and ORDERS Plaintiff to file the proposed Amended Complaint, currently on the docket as an attachment to the instant Motion, by September 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/6/18. cc:pro se parties(kjp)
September 4, 2018 Filing 225 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Picadello Enterprises Inc* regarding #224 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (rmc) Modified on 9/4/2018 cc: pro se parties (rmc).
August 31, 2018 Filing 224 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Picadello Enterprises Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
August 28, 2018 Filing 223 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Picadello Enterprises Inc served on 6/25/2018, answer due 7/16/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
August 22, 2018 Filing 222 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Cargo Transit Corp.* regarding #221 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (cc: Pro Se Parties) (lhc)
August 21, 2018 Filing 221 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Cargo Transit Corp by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
August 21, 2018 Filing 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint in Interpleader)(Cranley, Grace)
July 18, 2018 Filing 219 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Bay & Bay Transportation Services, Inc.; DF Carrier LLC; Flex Transport Inc.; EMG Trucking Inc.; MGR Freight LLC* regarding #218 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (ksp)
July 17, 2018 Filing 218 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Bay & Bay Transportation Services Inc; DF Carrier LLC; Flex Transport Inc; EMG Trucking Inc; MGR Freight LLC by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
July 6, 2018 Filing 217 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Cargo Transit Corp. served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
July 6, 2018 Filing 216 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Bay View Funding served on 6/21/2018, answer due 7/12/2018; Bay and Bay Transportation served on 6/21/2018, answer due 7/12/2018; Flex Transport, Inc. served on 6/21/2018, answer due 7/12/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
July 6, 2018 Filing 215 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). DF Carrier LLC served on 6/18/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
July 5, 2018 Filing 214 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Kommitted Transportation Inc* (ksp)
July 3, 2018 Filing 213 STIPULATION to Dismiss Bay View Funding, assignee of White Star Transport Inc by Plaintiffs Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Gumbiner, Krysta)
July 3, 2018 Filing 212 STIPULATION to Dismiss OTR Capital LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of the following: BRF Enterprises; Carry On Express Logistics; EFS Inc; Guerrero Transportation; Hailey's Logistics LLC; Highland Dallas Freight Inc; Joonam's Trucking LLC; Jubo Transportation Inc; Kiin Express LLC; Lathons Inc; Legacy Transportation; Luckie Xpress Logistics; Shears Transportation; Sur Trucks LLC; Tolokeaa Transport; VGK Express Inc by Plaintiffs Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
July 3, 2018 Filing 211 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Kommitted Transportation Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
June 27, 2018 Filing 210 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Baxter Bailey & Associates as assignee of JPMKL, Inc, Eagle Capital Corporation and CJM Financial as assignee of Daily Transportation; DC Transport, Inc; SL Black Fox Transport, LLC; Transhield Trucking Inc; U Brothers Inc; Lemberg Group Inc; Smith Transportation Services Inc; Ultra Trucking Inc; Valor Express Inc; Twin Express Inc; Quick Pay as assignee of West Proline Logistics; Speedway Logistics Inc; Jeep Transport Inc; Z Top Logistics; Tombach Corp; Olero Inc; LSQ Funding Group Inc as assignee of Valor Express Inc; Ansonia Credit Data dba Southwest Credit Management Assoc Inc as assignee of S & H Trucking; Tumar Express Inc; Artudianti Inc; AG Expedited Inc; DMN Transport Inc; ANG Transportation Inc; AMZ Trans Inc; J Rayl Transport Inc; NR 1 Transport; Wild Eagle Express; Innovation Truck Service LLC;* regarding #208 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), #209 Supplement, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (jld)
June 22, 2018 Filing 209 SUPPLEMENT to #208 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to AG Expedited Inc; AMZ Trans Inc; ANG Transportation Inc; Artudianti Inc; CJM Financial Assignee of Daily Transportation; DC Transport Inc; SMN Transport Inc; Eagle Capital Corporation; Innovation Truc filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cranley, Grace)
June 22, 2018 Filing 208 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to AG Expedited Inc; AMZ Trans Inc; ANG Transportation Inc; Artudianti Inc; CJM Financial Assignee of Daily Transportation; DC Transport Inc; SMN Transport Inc; Eagle Capital Corporation; Innovation Truck Service LLC; Jeep Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Associates assignee of JPMKL Inc; J Rayl Transport Inc; Lemberg Group Inc; NR1 Transport; Olero Inc; Ansonia Credit Data dba Southwest Credit Management Assoc assignee of S&H Trucking; SL Black Fox Transport LLC; Smith Transportation Services Inc; Speedway Logistics Inc; Tombach Corp; Transhield Trucking Inc; Tumar Express Inc; Twin Express Inc; U Brothers Inc; Ultra Trucking Inc; Valor Express Inc; LSQ Funding Group Inc assignee of Valor Express Inc; Quick Pay assignee of West Proline Logistics; Wild Eagle Express; Z Top Logistics Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
June 21, 2018 Filing 207 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
June 21, 2018 Filing 206 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Blast Transport Inc; TGL Logistics Inc; Oak Hill Capital Group for US Cross Inc; Iman Carriers Inc; Fast Loading Inc; Free Style Trucking Inc; by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
June 21, 2018 Filing 205 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). MGR Freight System served on 6/15/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
June 21, 2018 Filing 204 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). OTR Capital, LLC served on 6/12/2018, answer due 7/3/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
June 19, 2018 Filing 203 STIPULATION to Dismiss Off Ramp Trucking, LLC by Plaintiffs Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
June 19, 2018 Filing 202 STIPULATION to Dismiss Transam Financial Services, assignee of VSM Express and DM World Transportation by Plaintiffs Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
June 18, 2018 Filing 201 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Bay View Funding, Bay and Bay Transportation, Flex Transport, Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc)
June 15, 2018 Filing 200 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
June 11, 2018 Filing 199 SUMMONS REISSUED as to MGR Freight LLC, OTR Capital, LLC as Assignee. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
June 11, 2018 Filing 198 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). NR.1 Transport served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018; Wild Eagle Express served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
June 8, 2018 Filing 197 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). J Rayl Transport Inc served on 4/23/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
June 8, 2018 Filing 196 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). AG Expedited, Inc. served on 4/21/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
June 8, 2018 Filing 195 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Tumar Express Inc served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
June 8, 2018 Filing 194 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Ansonia Credit Data served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
June 8, 2018 Filing 193 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) as to Blast Transport, Inc., Fast Loading, Inc., Free Style Trucking, Inc., Iman Carriers, Inc., Oak Hill Capital Group, TGL Logistics Inc. (Cranley, Grace)
June 8, 2018 Filing 192 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
June 4, 2018 Filing 191 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *BR Cargo LLC; Hanjra Trucking; HM Trans Inc; Thunder Funding/Thunder Carrier Services assignee of Mak Link Limited Liability Company; MDS Trucking V Inc; TBS Factoring Services assignee of North America Moving Crew LLC and NWC Trucking LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Primus Logistics Inc; TBS Factoring Service assignee of Sanchez Family Trucking LLC and Seagate Freight LLC and Uber Trucking LLC and Werks Trucking LLC; Tac Trans Inc; TVM Express Inc; G&G Logistics Inc; IIK Transport Inc; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc assignee of A&D Carrier and Bluestone Enterprises and Duke Transportation and Freedom Van Lines and Pitts Logistics and Zakpol Trucking; Dilley Zimmy Insurance assignee of NEPA Distribution LLC; C&I Trucking Inc; Sonic Trans Inc; St John Capital Corp assignee of Southbay Logistics Inc; Accutrac Capital Inc assignee of Hanjra Trucking; Delta Carrier Group Inc; Green Mile Inc; Business Lines Corp; Transportation Funding Group assignee of Iman Carriers LLC and Kuehl Trucking LLC; Fleet One Factoring LLC assignee of AT Line Inc; Midwest Express Inc; Real Trucking Inc; 1st Choice Express Inc; Arrow Trans Corp; West Proline Logistics; Transit Core LLC; BFreight Inc* regarding #188 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,,,, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (mlc)
June 1, 2018 Filing 190 STIPULATION to Dismiss Stoughton Logistics LLC by Plaintiffs Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Gumbiner, Krysta)
June 1, 2018 Filing 189 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Harrington Ridge Coal & Stove LLC; Solid Group Inc; MS US Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
June 1, 2018 Filing 188 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to BR Cargo LLC; Hanjra Trucking; HM Trans Inc; Thunder Funding/Thunder Carrier Services assignee of Mak Link Limited Liability Company; MDS Trucking V Inc; TBS Factoring Services assignee of North America Moving Crew LLC and NWC Trucking LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Primus Logistics Inc; TBS Factoring Service assignee of Sanchez Family Trucking LLC and Seagate Freight LLC and Uber Trucking LLC and Werks Trucking LLC; Tac Trans Inc; TVM Express Inc; G&G Logistics Inc; IIK Transport Inc; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc assignee of A&D Carrier and Bluestone Enterprises and Duke Transportation and Freedom Van Lines and Pitts Logistics and Zakpol Trucking; Dilley Zimmy Insurance assignee of NEPA Distribution LLC; C&I Trucking Inc; Sonic Trans Inc; St John Capital Corp assignee of Southbay Logistics Inc; Accutrac Capital Inc assignee of Hanjra Trucking; Delta Carrier Group Inc; Green Mile Inc; Business Lines Corp; Transportation Funding Group assignee of Iman Carriers LLC and Kuehl Trucking LLC; Fleet One Factoring LLC assignee of AT Line Inc; Midwest Express Inc; Real Trucking Inc; 1st Choice Express Inc; Arrow Trans Corp; West Proline Logistics; Transit Core LLC; BFreight Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 31, 2018 Filing 187 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *TransFreight Logistics Inc; Three Way Logistics Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of TS Transportation Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of UAL Express Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of UNI Trans Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of Unico Trans Corp; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Unique Freight Carriers Inc; Seven Oaks Capital assignee of United Transport Logistics; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of Unitrans Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of US Expeditors Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of US Express Inc; Crestmark Bank assignee of US Freightways Logistics Inc; USA Cargo Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of USA Logistics Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Victory Transit Inc; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Vikings Trucking; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Viktor Transportation Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc. assignee of Vilano Incorporated; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Vintage Transport LLC; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of VL Trucking Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of VMB Transportation Inc; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Vodik Transport Inc; Vero Business Capital LLC assignee of Volcano Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of VS Express Inc and West Proline Logistics; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Western Lines Inc; White Star Transport Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Williams Transport; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Windstar Lines; Windy Hill Foliage Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of XXX Logistics Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Yare Express; Financial Carrier Services assignee of YD Trucking Corp; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Yopo Transport; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Yulivan Carriers Inc; Advance Business Capital assignee of Zars Express; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of ZDL Express Inc; Advance Business Capital assignee of Zema Transportation LLC; Ecklund Logistics Inc; Orange Commercial Credit assignee of Freight Solutions Services; Saint John Capital Corp assignee of Lucky Way Logistics Inc; Orange Commercial Credit assignee of Sedena Trucking Services Inc; GT Logistics Inc; CoreFund Capital LLC as assignee of J&Js Leading Transport LLC; Lesmeister Transportation Inc; MTY Transportation LLC; Navigator Express; North American Transport Services LLC; Eagle Capital Corp assignee of Sho Nuff Truckin Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of TNT Express Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of Twin Logistics Express Inc; Orange Commercial Credit assignee of United Trans Group Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of Unlimited Freight Inc; Varta Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assingee of VS Trucklines Inc* regarding #184 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (rmc)
May 31, 2018 Filing 186 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *RTS Financial Service assignee for the following: Adex Inc; American Motor Transportation Inc; Amerifreight Systems LLC; AMG Logistics Inc; Artudianti Inc; BFreight Inc; Black Wolf Transportation; Blast Transport Inc; Bulmaks Inc; DMN Transport Inc; Dolche Truckload Corp; EMR Express; Fast Loading Inc; Green Mile Inc; JM Trans Inc; IBY Transport; KForce Express Inc; Koned Logistics; Lama Trucking Inc; Liberty Transit LLC; Liv Transportation; MCDA Logistics Inc; MnAlan Trucking Corp; MS US Inc; Olero Inc; Oneway Logistics Inc; Out Witting The Rest Inc; Premium Express Inc; Quality Freight LLC; Real Transport Inc; Road Wolves Inc; Sky Transport Inc; Smart Freight Inc; Spectrum Express Inc; Speedway Logistics Inc; Standard Trucking LLC; T&T Freight; TAK Trucking Inc; Tiger Logistics; Transfreight Logistics Inc; Trucking Experts LLC; Varta Inc; Via Logistics Inc; VS Express Inc; Z Transportation Inc* regarding #183 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,,, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (rmc)
May 31, 2018 Filing 185 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *AT Line Inc; Benjamin Best Freight; Pavestone Capital assignee of A&S Trucking LLC; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Above Par Transportation and Amazon Logistics; Credit Express Inc assignee of BL Quality Trans Inc; Carrier Management Inc; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of L&E Hauling; Heliosphere Inc; Tiger Logistics Inc; Lucky Way Logistics Inc; Lozar Inc; NEPA Distribution LLC;Credit Express Inc assignee of Z Top Logistics Inc; Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc; Via Logistics Inc; VIP Expedited; BM Corp; TraLo Companies Inc; Matrix Inc; Cross Express Co; Liv Enterprises Inc; SNR Solutions Inc; LMX Transport; Phoenix Capital Group LLC assignee of A&E First Choice Moving Transportation and Brave Freight and Gava Trucking and K Express and State 2 State Trucks Inc; Z Transportation Inc; Great Wide Truckload Management; American Motor Transportation Inc; Marka Transport Inc; L E G S Transport Inc; Dosped Inc; Q Carriers Inc; Graval Corporation; MMJ Transportation Inc; Recon Logistics* regarding #182 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,,, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (rmc)
May 30, 2018 Filing 184 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to TransFreight Logistics Inc; Three Way Logistics Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of TS Transportation Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of UAL Express Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of UNI Trans Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of Unico Trans Corp; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Unique Freight Carriers Inc; Seven Oaks Capital assignee of United Transport Logistics; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of Unitrans Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of US Expeditors Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of US Express Inc; Crestmark Bank assignee of US Freightways Logistics Inc; USA Cargo Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of USA Logistics Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Victory Transit Inc; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Vikings Trucking; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Viktor Transportation Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc. assignee of Vilano Incorporated; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Vintage Transport LLC; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of VL Trucking Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of VMB Transportation Inc; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Vodik Transport Inc; Vero Business Capital LLC assignee of Volcano Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of VS Express Inc and West Proline Logistics; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Western Lines Inc; White Star Transport Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Williams Transport; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Windstar Lines; Windy Hill Foliage Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of XXX Logistics Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Yare Express; Financial Carrier Services assignee of YD Trucking Corp; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Yopo Transport; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Yulivan Carriers Inc; Advance Business Capital assignee of Zars Express; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of ZDL Express Inc; Advance Business Capital assignee of Zema Transportation LLC; Ecklund Logistics Inc; Orange Commercial Credit assignee of Freight Solutions Services; Saint John Capital Corp assignee of Lucky Way Logistics Inc; Orange Commercial Credit assignee of Sedena Trucking Services Inc; GT Logistics Inc; CoreFund Capital LLC as assignee of J&Js Leading Transport LLC; Lesmeister Transportation Inc; MTY Transportation LLC; Navigator Express; North American Transport Services LLC; Eagle Capital Corp assignee of Sho Nuff Truckin Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of TNT Express Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of Twin Logistics Express Inc; Orange Commercial Credit assignee of United Trans Group Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of Unlimited Freight Inc; Varta Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assingee of VS Trucklines Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 30, 2018 Filing 183 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to RTS Financial Service assignee for the following: Adex Inc; American Motor Transportation Inc; Amerifreight Systems LLC; AMG Logistics Inc; Artudianti Inc; BFreight Inc; Black Wolf Transportation; Blast Transport Inc; Bulmaks Inc; DMN Transport Inc; Dolche Truckload Corp; EMR Express; Fast Loading Inc; Green Mile Inc; JM Trans Inc; IBY Transport; KForce Express Inc; Koned Logistics; Lama Trucking Inc; Liberty Transit LLC; Liv Transportation; MCDA Logistics Inc; MnAlan Trucking Corp; MS US Inc; Olero Inc; Oneway Logistics Inc; Out Witting The Rest Inc; Premium Express Inc; Quality Freight LLC; Real Transport Inc; Road Wolves Inc; Sky Transport Inc; Smart Freight Inc; Spectrum Express Inc; Speedway Logistics Inc; Standard Trucking LLC; T&T Freight; TAK Trucking Inc; Tiger Logistics; Transfreight Logistics Inc; Trucking Experts LLC; Varta Inc; Via Logistics Inc; VS Express Inc; Z Transportation Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 30, 2018 Filing 182 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to AT Line Inc; Benjamin Best Freight; Pavestone Capital assignee of A&S Trucking LLC; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Above Par Transportation and Amazon Logistics; Credit Express Inc assignee of BL Quality Trans Inc; Carrier Management Inc; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of L&E Hauling; Heliosphere Inc; Tiger Logistics Inc; Lucky Way Logistics Inc; Lozar Inc; NEPA Distribution LLC;Credit Express Inc assignee of Z Top Logistics Inc; Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc; Via Logistics Inc; VIP Expedited; BM Corp; TraLo Companies Inc; Matrix Inc; Cross Express Co; Liv Enterprises Inc; SNR Solutions Inc; LMX Transport; Phoenix Capital Group LLC assignee of A&E First Choice Moving Transportation and Brave Freight and Gava Trucking and K Express and State 2 State Trucks Inc; Z Transportation Inc; Great Wide Truckload Management; American Motor Transportation Inc; Marka Transport Inc; L E G S Transport Inc; Dosped Inc; Q Carriers Inc; Graval Corporation; MMJ Transportation Inc; Recon Logistics by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 30, 2018 Filing 181 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Central Logistics Group Inc; Jodi Express; MnAlan Trucking Corp; Multi-Load Transport Inc; One Nation Trans; Primary Transportation Services Inc; Quality Transport Brokers Corp; Rama Transportation LLC; Smarten Transport; South Bay Logistics Inc; T&T Freight; Tadz Logistics Inc; Titan Quality Transport; Van Dam Transport; Vicotry Transit Inc; Namanagh Inc; Natalie Express* regarding #177 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (rmc)
May 29, 2018 Filing 180 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Millennium Transport Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of MMJ Transportation Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Namanagh Inc and Narvatrans LLC; Crestmark Bank assignee of National Freight Carriers Inc; BAxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Navigation Global LLC and NC Trucking Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Nevada Express; Crestmark Bank assignee of Noel Transportation Corp; Partners Funding Inc assignee of Onate Logistics; JD Factors LLC assignee of Orest Express Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Overland Trucking LLC; JD Factors LLC assignee of PM Global Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of PMB Transcargo Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Prestige Freight; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Primus Logistics Inc; Crestmark assignee of Puma Logistics; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Quality Wheels Inc; Aladdin Financial Inc assignee of Quickex Transit Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of RD Limited Partnership; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Rely Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of RGX Cargo Corp; Insight Technology Inc assignee of Rhino Transportation LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of River North Industries Inc; Road Wolves Inc; Roadstar Inc; Sunbelt Finance assignee of Route One LLC; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Rush Inc and RXG Cargo Corp; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of A&T Trucking LLC and Advance Transport; Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of ATD Express Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of B&M Express Inc; TBS Factoring Service LLC assignee of B.W.R. Transportation Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Bekteshi Logistics Inc; TBS Factoring Service assignee of Burton Transportation Services LLC; TBS Factoring Service assignee of D and L Trucking and D E O Transport Inc; Orange Commercial Credit assignee of Delta Logistics Inc; Insight Technology assignee of EFreight, Inc; TBS Factoring Service assignee of Geeman LLC and H&L Delivery LLC; Landliner Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Lemberg Group Inc; TCI Business Capital Inc assignee of Lemberg Group; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Lithco 1 LLC; Liv Transportation; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of LJ Express Trucking CO of CA LLC and Logic Logistics Inc; Lowell Logistics Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of LT United Logistics Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of M&S Express Inc; Great Plains Transportation Services Inc assignee of Mangat Group Inc; Firstline Funding Group assigne of Maranatha Express; Great Plains Transportation Services Inc assignee of MBA Transport of Columbus LLC; Financial Carrier Services assignee of MBP Transport LLC; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of MCC Freight Inc; MCDA Logistics LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of MD Freight Inc; Crestmark Bank assignee of Mega Express Inc* regarding #176 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (lhc)
May 25, 2018 Filing 179 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *MPK Trucking LLC; Quality Freight LLC; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Onyx Transport Inc; PDM Financial for Muradi Logistics LLC; Prestige Inc; Puma Logistics; Quality Refrigerated Transportation; Quick Freight Logistics Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of R2 Transportation Inc; RD Limited Partnership dba Richard Daniels Transportation; CD Consortium assignee of Red Line Transit Inc; Rio Importers USA Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Roma Logistics Inc and RVS Express Inc; Security Transport Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of SGS Express Inc; Silvicom Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Silwady Trucking Inc and Sirus Corp; Sky Express Inc; Smart Freight Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of SouthWay Carriers Inc; Taylor Truck Line; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Tempo Carrier Inc and Titan Freight Lines Inc and TLT Logistics Inc; S3 Capital LLC; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of SA Express Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Seattle Professional Moving; Sedena Trucking Services Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Sedena Trucking Services Inc; SevenOaks Capital assignee of Selam Trans Inc; Shotgun Express Inc; Sky Transport Inc; Spectrum Express Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Sprint Express Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of St Mark of Orlando LLC; Standard Trucking LLC; State 2 State Trucks Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of StreamX LLC; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Sunrise Logistics; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Superior Overnight Services Inc; TAK Trucking Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Tan Elegant Inc; Crestmark TPG LLC assignee to TGL Logistics Inc; Sunbelt Finance assignee of The B Brother's Transportation Corporation; JD Factors LLC assignee of Thunder Logistics Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of Tochitos Trucking 1 Inc; Tower Truck Lines Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Trafic Trucking LLC; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Transfreight Logistics Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of Transinfinity Logistics Inc; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Transrapid Inc; Transrapid Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Trivium Trans Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Trucks LLC by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company* regarding #173 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (nae)
May 25, 2018 Filing 178 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Chris Lines Co; Firstline Funding group assignee of Freight Dealers; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Furex Inc; G.G. Barnett Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Gables Transport Inc; Financial Carrier Services assignee of Gama Trade Inc; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Gamtrans Freight; Giannakis Transportation Inc; CJM assignee of Globus Transport Inc and Goga Trucking Inc; Partners Funding assignee of Gold Star Carriers; CJM Financial Inc assignee of Gold Star Express LLC; Goldmax Carrier Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Good Choice Carrier Inc; Sunbelt Finance LLC assignee of Good Source Trucking Inc; GP Transportation; Crestmark Bank assignee of Graval Corporation; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Green Freight Inc; Vero Business Capital LLC assignee of GT Logistics Inc; GTS Transportation Corp; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of GTS Transportation; Firstline Funding Group asignee of Hared Trucking; Partners Funding Inc assignee of Heartland Expressway; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Heavy Lane Transport; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Heavy Lane Transport; Crestmark Bank assignee of Heliosphere Inc; Financial Carrier Services assignee of Homer Express LLC; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of Hot Transportation and House Springs Trucking Inc; JD Factors assignee of Infinitive Transportation; Kania Inc; TBS Factoring Service LLC assignee of Kepy Transportation Inc; JD Factors assignee of Kings Eagle Inc and Klym Spirit Corporation; Lama Trucking; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Lenti Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of LHB Trucking Inc; Liberty Transit LLC; Lintrans Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Lizama Transport Inc and Lupus 7 Inc and Main Trucking Company; Merx Global Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Millennium Group Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of MMM Transportation Ltd; Financial Carrier Services Inc assignee of MPK Trucking LLC; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Navi Inc; Navigation Global LLC; Nedex Express Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Northland Refrigerated Services Inc and Omega Freight Systems Inc; CJM Financial Inc assignee of On Time Trucking LLC; Oneway Logistics Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company* regarding #172 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (nae)
May 25, 2018 Filing 177 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Central Logistics Group Inc; Jodi Express; MnAlan Trucking Corp; Multi-Load Transport Inc; One Nation Trans; Primary Transportation Services Inc; Quality Transport Brokers Corp; Rama Transportation LLC; Smarten Transport; South Bay Logistics Inc; T&T Freight; Tadz Logistics Inc; Titan Quality Transport; Van Dam Transport; Vicotry Transit Inc; Namanagh Inc; Natalie Express by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 25, 2018 Filing 176 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Millennium Transport Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of MMJ Transportation Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Namanagh Inc and Narvatrans LLC; Crestmark Bank assignee of National Freight Carriers Inc; BAxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Navigation Global LLC and NC Trucking Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Nevada Express; Crestmark Bank assignee of Noel Transportation Corp; Partners Funding Inc assignee of Onate Logistics; JD Factors LLC assignee of Orest Express Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Overland Trucking LLC; JD Factors LLC assignee of PM Global Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of PMB Transcargo Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Prestige Freight; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Primus Logistics Inc; Crestmark assignee of Puma Logistics; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Quality Wheels Inc; Aladdin Financial Inc assignee of Quickex Transit Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of RD Limited Partnership; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Rely Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of RGX Cargo Corp; Insight Technology Inc assignee of Rhino Transportation LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of River North Industries Inc; Road Wolves Inc; Roadstar Inc; Sunbelt Finance assignee of Route One LLC; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Rush Inc and RXG Cargo Corp; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of A&T Trucking LLC and Advance Transport; Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of ATD Express Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of B&M Express Inc; TBS Factoring Service LLC assignee of B.W.R. Transportation Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Bekteshi Logistics Inc; TBS Factoring Service assignee of Burton Transportation Services LLC; TBS Factoring Service assignee of D and L Trucking and D E O Transport Inc; Orange Commercial Credit assignee of Delta Logistics Inc; Insight Technology assignee of EFreight, Inc; TBS Factoring Service assignee of Geeman LLC and H&L Delivery LLC; Landliner Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Lemberg Group Inc; TCI Business Capital Inc assignee of Lemberg Group; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Lithco 1 LLC; Liv Transportation; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of LJ Express Trucking CO of CA LLC and Logic Logistics Inc; Lowell Logistics Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of LT United Logistics Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of M&S Express Inc; Great Plains Transportation Services Inc assignee of Mangat Group Inc; Firstline Funding Group assigne of Maranatha Express; Great Plains Transportation Services Inc assignee of MBA Transport of Columbus LLC; Financial Carrier Services assignee of MBP Transport LLC; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of MCC Freight Inc; MCDA Logistics LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of MD Freight Inc; Crestmark Bank assignee of Mega Express Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 25, 2018 Filing 175 STIPULATION to Dismiss TAFS, Inc. by Defendants TAFS Premium Finance Inc, TAFS Premium Finance Inc. (Zoccola, James)
May 25, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by James E Zoccola on behalf of TAFS Premium Finance Inc (Zoccola, James)
May 24, 2018 Filing 173 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to MPK Trucking LLC; Quality Freight LLC; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Onyx Transport Inc; PDM Financial for Muradi Logistics LLC; Prestige Inc; Puma Logistics; Quality Refrigerated Transportation; Quick Freight Logistics Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of R2 Transportation Inc; RD Limited Partnership dba Richard Daniels Transportation; CD Consortium assignee of Red Line Transit Inc; Rio Importers USA Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Roma Logistics Inc and RVS Express Inc; Security Transport Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of SGS Express Inc; Silvicom Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Silwady Trucking Inc and Sirus Corp; Sky Express Inc; Smart Freight Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of SouthWay Carriers Inc; Taylor Truck Line; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Tempo Carrier Inc and Titan Freight Lines Inc and TLT Logistics Inc; S3 Capital LLC; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of SA Express Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Seattle Professional Moving; Sedena Trucking Services Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Sedena Trucking Services Inc; SevenOaks Capital assignee of Selam Trans Inc; Shotgun Express Inc; Sky Transport Inc; Spectrum Express Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Sprint Express Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of St Mark of Orlando LLC; Standard Trucking LLC; State 2 State Trucks Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of StreamX LLC; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Sunrise Logistics; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Superior Overnight Services Inc; TAK Trucking Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Tan Elegant Inc; Crestmark TPG LLC assignee to TGL Logistics Inc; Sunbelt Finance assignee of The B Brother's Transportation Corporation; JD Factors LLC assignee of Thunder Logistics Inc; Riviera Finance assignee of Tochitos Trucking 1 Inc; Tower Truck Lines Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Trafic Trucking LLC; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Transfreight Logistics Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of Transinfinity Logistics Inc; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Transrapid Inc; Transrapid Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Trivium Trans Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Trucks LLC by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 24, 2018 Filing 172 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Chris Lines Co; Firstline Funding group assignee of Freight Dealers; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Furex Inc; G.G. Barnett Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Gables Transport Inc; Financial Carrier Services assignee of Gama Trade Inc; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Gamtrans Freight; Giannakis Transportation Inc; CJM assignee of Globus Transport Inc and Goga Trucking Inc; Partners Funding assignee of Gold Star Carriers; CJM Financial Inc assignee of Gold Star Express LLC; Goldmax Carrier Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Good Choice Carrier Inc; Sunbelt Finance LLC assignee of Good Source Trucking Inc; GP Transportation; Crestmark Bank assignee of Graval Corporation; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Green Freight Inc; Vero Business Capital LLC assignee of GT Logistics Inc; GTS Transportation Corp; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of GTS Transportation; Firstline Funding Group asignee of Hared Trucking; Partners Funding Inc assignee of Heartland Expressway; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Heavy Lane Transport; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Heavy Lane Transport; Crestmark Bank assignee of Heliosphere Inc; Financial Carrier Services assignee of Homer Express LLC; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of Hot Transportation and House Springs Trucking Inc; JD Factors assignee of Infinitive Transportation; Kania Inc; TBS Factoring Service LLC assignee of Kepy Transportation Inc; JD Factors assignee of Kings Eagle Inc and Klym Spirit Corporation; Lama Trucking; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Lenti Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of LHB Trucking Inc; Liberty Transit LLC; Lintrans Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Lizama Transport Inc and Lupus 7 Inc and Main Trucking Company; Merx Global Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Millennium Group Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of MMM Transportation Ltd; Financial Carrier Services Inc assignee of MPK Trucking LLC; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Navi Inc; Navigation Global LLC; Nedex Express Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Northland Refrigerated Services Inc and Omega Freight Systems Inc; CJM Financial Inc assignee of On Time Trucking LLC; Oneway Logistics Inc by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 24, 2018 Filing 171 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Sunbelt Finance assignee of 2K Transportation Inc; Seven Oaks Capital assignee of A Family Towing & Transport; AG Lines Inc; CD Consortium Corp assignee of AMZ Trans Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of AP Trucking LLC; Art Logistics; First Funding Group assignee of Atlantic Coast Logistics; Freight Factoring Specialists assignee of Avail Transport Inc; Sunbelt Finance assignee of Bandera Transportation Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Bluestar Services, LLC; Bo Tech Transportation; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Boost Enterprises; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Boost Enterprises Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of BR Cargo; Brite Logistics Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Bulls Eye Expedition; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Business Lines Corp; CMW Transport Co Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Corb Inc and Davis Cargo LLC; DLK Trucking Inc; Eagle Trucking Company; Echo Trucking Inc; Fischer Truck and Bus Service Inc; Freightzone Express Inc; Good Source Trucking Inc; Highboost Corporation; Crestmark Bank assignee of Inland Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Inland Transport Inc; Integrated Logistics & Associates; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Intersped Inc and Jag Trucking; JBA Trucking LLC; Riviera Finance assignee of JMB Trucking Services Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of JML Logistics; Crestmark Bank assignee of Jordan & K; JP Trucking Services Inc; JPMKL Inc; Assist Financial Services assignee of JTT Logistics Inc; Crestmark Bank assignee of Kania Inc; Kottke Trucking; Eagle Capital Corp assignee of K M Trucking; K-Way Express Inc; Airline Transportation Specialists; AMG Freight; CJM Financial Inc assignee of A-Plus Trucking LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Kays M Ahmed* regarding #169 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (cc: Pro Se Parties) (ksp)
May 24, 2018 Filing 170 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Crestmark Bank assignee of Cannon LLC; Steelhead Finance assignee of Car Transport Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of 4 Way Trans LLC and A 1 Freight Inc; Adex Inc; Amerifreight Systems LLC; AMG Logistics Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Arch Transport LLC; Riviera Finance of Texas Inc assignee of Art Logistics; Autodina Corp; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of BB Wolf Inc and BH92 Trucking Inc; BL Quality Trans Inc; Black Sea Transportation; Black Wolf Transportation; Bulmaks Inc; BTI Inc; JC Trans Co; KForce Express Inc; Koned Logistics; Vero Business Capital LLC assignee of AC Express Inc; Crestmark Bank assignee of Airtime Express Inc; Vero Business Capital LLC assignee of Amerigo Inc; Arnhalt Transportation Brokerage Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of BBS Trucking Inc; Brian Inc; RTS Financial Service assignee of Carrier Management Inc; CD Corsortium Corp; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of CDA Delivery Service Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Central Logistics LLC; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Coast Connection Inc; Pavestone Capital assignee of Cowboy Logistics LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of D&M Logistics LLC; D&S Factors LLC; Assist Financial Serivces assignee of DAB Trucking Services; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Daily Transportation Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Daily Transportation Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Delta Carrier Group Inc; Delta Transport Inc; TCI Business Capital Inc assignee of Delta Transport Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of D-Evine Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of DF Carrier LLC; Compass Funding Solutions assigneee of DIJ Corp; Direct Service Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Distribution Solutions Inc; Divine Enterprises; Firstline Funding Group assignee of East Bound Express; Crestmark Bank assignee of Ecklund Logistics Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of EMJB; EMR Express; Firstline Funding Group assignee of ENS Trucking; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of ES Express Lines Inc; Partners Funding Inc assignee of ESA Transportation Inc; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Excell Trucking; Financial Carrier Services assignee of EZY Transportation LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Fargo Transport; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Flash Logistics Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of FM Logistics LLC* regarding #168 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (cc: Pro Se Parties) (ksp)
May 23, 2018 Filing 169 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Sunbelt Finance assignee of 2K Transportation Inc; Seven Oaks Capital assignee of A Family Towing & Transport; AG Lines Inc; CD Consortium Corp assignee of AMZ Trans Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc assignee of AP Trucking LLC; Art Logistics; First Funding Group assignee of Atlantic Coast Logistics; Freight Factoring Specialists assignee of Avail Transport Inc; Sunbelt Finance assignee of Bandera Transportation Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Bluestar Services, LLC; Bo Tech Transportation; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Boost Enterprises; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Boost Enterprises Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of BR Cargo; Brite Logistics Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of Bulls Eye Expedition; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Business Lines Corp; CMW Transport Co Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Corb Inc and Davis Cargo LLC; DLK Trucking Inc; Eagle Trucking Company; Echo Trucking Inc; Fischer Truck and Bus Service Inc; Freightzone Express Inc; Good Source Trucking Inc; Highboost Corporation; Crestmark Bank assignee of Inland Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Inland Transport Inc; Integrated Logistics & Associates; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Intersped Inc and Jag Trucking; JBA Trucking LLC; Riviera Finance assignee of JMB Trucking Services Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of JML Logistics; Crestmark Bank assignee of Jordan & K; JP Trucking Services Inc; JPMKL Inc; Assist Financial Services assignee of JTT Logistics Inc; Crestmark Bank assignee of Kania Inc; Kottke Trucking; Eagle Capital Corp assignee of K M Trucking; K-Way Express Inc; Airline Transportation Specialists; AMG Freight; CJM Financial Inc assignee of A-Plus Trucking LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Kays M Ahmed by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 23, 2018 Filing 168 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Crestmark Bank assignee of Cannon LLC; Steelhead Finance assignee of Car Transport Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of 4 Way Trans LLC and A 1 Freight Inc; Adex Inc; Amerifreight Systems LLC; AMG Logistics Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of Arch Transport LLC; Riviera Finance of Texas Inc assignee of Art Logistics; Autodina Corp; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of BB Wolf Inc and BH92 Trucking Inc; BL Quality Trans Inc; Black Sea Transportation; Black Wolf Transportation; Bulmaks Inc; BTI Inc; JC Trans Co; KForce Express Inc; Koned Logistics; Vero Business Capital LLC assignee of AC Express Inc; Crestmark Bank assignee of Airtime Express Inc; Vero Business Capital LLC assignee of Amerigo Inc; Arnhalt Transportation Brokerage Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of BBS Trucking Inc; Brian Inc; RTS Financial Service assignee of Carrier Management Inc; CD Corsortium Corp; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of CDA Delivery Service Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Central Logistics LLC; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Coast Connection Inc; Pavestone Capital assignee of Cowboy Logistics LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of D&M Logistics LLC; D&S Factors LLC; Assist Financial Serivces assignee of DAB Trucking Services; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Daily Transportation Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Daily Transportation Inc; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Delta Carrier Group Inc; Delta Transport Inc; TCI Business Capital Inc assignee of Delta Transport Inc; Compass Funding Solutions assignee of D-Evine Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of DF Carrier LLC; Compass Funding Solutions assigneee of DIJ Corp; Direct Service Transport Inc; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of Distribution Solutions Inc; Divine Enterprises; Firstline Funding Group assignee of East Bound Express; Crestmark Bank assignee of Ecklund Logistics Inc; Firstline Funding Group assignee of EMJB; EMR Express; Firstline Funding Group assignee of ENS Trucking; Baxter Bailey & Assoc assignee of ES Express Lines Inc; Partners Funding Inc assignee of ESA Transportation Inc; Interstate Capital Corp assignee of Excell Trucking; Financial Carrier Services assignee of EZY Transportation LLC; Advance Business Capital LLC assignee of Fargo Transport; CD Consortium Corp assignee of Flash Logistics Inc; JD Factors LLC assignee of FM Logistics LLC by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Grace Cranley)(Cranley, Grace)
May 21, 2018 Filing 167 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Innovation Truck Service LLC served on 5/12/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
May 21, 2018 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Off Ramp Trucking LLC served on 5/9/2018, answer due 5/30/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
May 21, 2018 Filing 165 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). West Proline Logistics served on 5/1/2018, answer due 5/22/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
May 21, 2018 Filing 164 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). BFreight, Inc. served on 4/30/2018, answer due 5/21/2018; Transit Core LLC served on 4/30/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
May 21, 2018 Filing 163 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Apex Capital Corp., as assignee of 10-4 Alliance, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of A & L Transit, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of A D A Logistics Corp; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of A G & B Logistics; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of A N Enterprise, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of A N M Transport, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Akal Trucking, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Arm Lines, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of B & K Group, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Best Way Logistics, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Black Sea Transportation, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of C R N A; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Capitol Trucking, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Cargal Transport, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Cargomax Incorporated; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Cargox, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of D F H Transportation, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of D M Express, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of D V S Transportation, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of E M H Services, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Foka Logistics, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Hawk Logistics, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of I G H Trucking, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Imperial Express, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Issa Logistics, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of K L M B Transportation, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of K M V Transportation, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of LEGS Transport, Inc.; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of L G A Logistics, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Lama Express, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Lucky World, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of M D Transport; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of M N E Freight, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of M O B Carriers, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Majestic, Inc.; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Max Trucking, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Melody Logistics, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Milan Express, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of N T O Express, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Nathan Trucking, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Nationwide Enterprises Corp; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of One 2 One Transport, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Overnight Express, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Pack Logistics, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Perfect Signature, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of R F S Group, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Red Line Logistics, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Rey M Appliances; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Roadstar Logistics, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of S & J Carriers Corp; Apex Capital Corp. asassignee of Scarpita Cartage, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Shabdan Brothers, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Stronghaul, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Sunrise Highway LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Tac Trans, Inc.; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Tacan Transport, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Top Transit, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Truckland, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Twin Cities Carrier, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of USKO Express, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of VBS Express, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Vito LLC; Apex Capital Inc. as assignee of VKP Line, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Voyager Nation, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of West Coast Express; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Western Transport, LLC; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Yugo Express, Inc; Apex Capital Corp. as assignee of Zeromax Motors, Inc.* regarding #162 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)(cc: Pro Se Parties) (lhc)
May 18, 2018 Filing 162 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Apex Capital Corp. by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sheila A Ramacci WITHDRAWN on behalf of Diamond Freight, Inc., Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/15/2018. (smb)
May 14, 2018 Filing 160 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trucking Experts LLC. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nal)
May 10, 2018 Filing 159 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Diamond Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramacci, Sheila)
May 9, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaForte on behalf of Diamond Freight, Inc..(LaForte PHV, George) Modified on 5/11/2018 to correctly identify document (lns).
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying with leave to refile #155 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/9/18. cc: pro se parties(kjp)
May 4, 2018 Filing 156 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Conick Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kjp)
May 3, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Diamond Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(LaForte PHV, George)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #153 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney George F LaForte PHV for Diamond Freight, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/2/2018. (mtr)
May 1, 2018 Filing 153 Application for Attorney George F. LaForte, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Diamond Freight, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3555449(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
April 27, 2018 Filing 152 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Kommitted Transportation Inc served on 3/27/2018, answer due 4/17/2018; 1st Choice Express, Inc. served on 3/27/2018, answer due 4/17/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 26, 2018 Filing 151 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Recon Logistics LLC served on 4/23/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 26, 2018 Filing 150 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). AMZ Trans, Inc. served on 4/22/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 26, 2018 Filing 149 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Conick Logistics, Inc. served on 4/21/2018, answer due 5/14/2018; DMN Transport, Inc. served on 4/21/2018, answer due 5/14/2018; ANG Transportation, Inc. served on 4/21/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2018 Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Artudianti, Inc. served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018; MMJ Transportation Inc served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2018 Filing 147 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2018 Filing 146 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Dosped, Inc. served on 4/5/2018, answer due 4/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2018 Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). L E G S Transport Inc served on 4/4/2018, answer due 4/25/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2018 Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Bay and Bay Transportation served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2018 Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Real Trucking Inc served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2018 Filing 142 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Marka Transport Inc served on 3/28/2018, answer due 4/18/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2018 Filing 141 Summons Issued as to BFreight, Inc., Conick Logistics, Inc., DF Carrier LLC, DMN Transport, Inc., Free Style Trucking, Inc., Iman Carriers, Inc., Innovation Truck Service LLC, J Rayl Transport Inc, Off Ramp Trucking LLC, Picadello Enterprises Inc, Recon Logistics LLC, Strada Logistics LLC, Transit Core LLC, West Proline Logistics, AMZ Trans, Inc., ANG Transportation, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #138 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Teresa Ruiz Schober PHV for Far West Capital Transportation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/17/18. (mtr)
April 16, 2018 Filing 139 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
April 16, 2018 Filing 138 Application for Attorney Teresa Ruiz Schober to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of DSCH Capital Partners, LLC d/b/a Far West Capital. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3540365(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 138 replaced (to correct attorney's proper name on 4/16/2018) (mtr). Modified on 4/16/2018 (mtr).
April 9, 2018 Filing 137 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Diamond Freight, Inc..(Ramacci, Sheila)
April 9, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila A Ramacci on behalf of Diamond Freight, Inc. (Ramacci, Sheila)
April 9, 2018 Filing 135 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Artudianti, Inc.. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
April 9, 2018 Filing 134 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to MMJ Transportation Inc, NR.1 Transport. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Alias Summons Issued)(nae)
April 6, 2018 Filing 133 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2018: #1 Corrected Proposed Alias Summons (Artudianti)) (nae).
April 4, 2018 Filing 132 Summons Issued as to FLS Express, Graval Corporation, Manning Transfer, Inc., Q Carriers, Inc., Vargas Transportation LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
April 3, 2018 Filing 131 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Gumbiner, Krysta)
April 2, 2018 Filing 130 RESPONSE to Motion re #84 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gumbiner, Krysta)
April 2, 2018 Filing 129 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) as to MS US Inc. (Cranley, Grace)
April 2, 2018 Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). American Motor Transportation, Inc. served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Great Wide Truckload Management served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Z Transportation Inc served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 2, 2018 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). LMX Transport Corp served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 2, 2018 Filing 126 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). SNR Solutions Inc served on 3/22/2018, answer due 4/12/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
April 2, 2018 Filing 125 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Cross Express, Co. served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 30, 2018 Filing 124 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Load to Ride Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
March 30, 2018 Filing 123 Summons Issued as to Dosped, Inc., L E G S Transport Inc, TGL Logistics Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
March 29, 2018 Filing 122 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Foley Carrier Services, LLC (Aplus Express,Butter B Trucking, Dyer Integrated, Smart Choice Courier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
March 29, 2018 Filing 121 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Far West Capital Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(jss)
March 29, 2018 Filing 120 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2018 Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Phoenix Capital Group, LLC served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Apex Capital Corp as Assignee of Magestic Inc served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Apex Capital Corp as Assignee of USKO Express Inc served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as Assignee of A & E First Choice Moving served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as Assignee of Brave Freight served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as Assignee of Gava Trucking served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as Assignee of K Express served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as Assignee of State 2 State Trucks Inc served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/30/2018 to add additional parties to docket entry. (jld).
March 27, 2018 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Liv Enterprises Inc served on 3/21/2018, answer due 4/11/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2018 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). BM, Corp. served on 3/12/2018, answer due 4/2/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2018 Filing 116 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). VIA Logistics Inc served on 3/9/2018, answer due 3/30/2018; VIP Expedited served on 3/9/2018, answer due 3/30/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2018 Filing 115 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; Tombach Corp served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2018 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). NEPA Distribution LLC served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; Z Top Logistics Inc served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2018 Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Load to Ride Transportation served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Lozar Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Lucky Way Logistics Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Transam Financial Services Inc as assignee of VSM Express served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/30/2018 to add additional party to docket entry (jld).
March 27, 2018 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). DC Transport, Inc. served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Namanagh Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Natalie Express served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2018 Filing 111 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Stoughton Logistics served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2018 Filing 110 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Carrier Management, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Pavestone Capital as Assignee for A&S Trucking LLC served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Interstate Capital Corporation, as Assignee of Above Par Transportation served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Interstate Capital Corp, as Assignee of Amazon Logistics served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Credit Express Inc as Assignee of BL Quality Trans Inc served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Interstate Capital Corp as Assignee of L & E Hauling served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/30/2018 to add parties to docket text (jld).
March 27, 2018 Filing 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Benjamin Best Freight served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; AT Line, Inc. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 26, 2018 Filing 108 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Ansonia Credit Data, Marka Transport Inc, Tumar Express Inc, AG Expedited, Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
March 26, 2018 Filing 107 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dolche Truckload, Corp..(Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
March 26, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Tomasz Koziol PHV on behalf of Dolche Truckload, Corp. (Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
March 23, 2018 Filing 105 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) as to Harrington Ridge Coal & Stove, LLC, Solid Group Inc. (Cranley, Grace)
March 23, 2018 Filing 104 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
March 23, 2018 Filing 103 SUMMONS REISSUED as to American Motor Transportation, Inc., Apex Capital Corp., Artudianti, Inc., Great Wide Truckload Management, Oak Hill Capital Group, Phoenix Capital Group, LLC, Z Transportation Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
March 22, 2018 Filing 102 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
March 22, 2018 Filing 101 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Apex Capital Corp. served on 3/20/2018, answer due 4/10/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 22, 2018 Filing 100 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
March 21, 2018 Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Matrix Inc served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 21, 2018 Filing 98 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). TraLo Companies Inc served on 3/13/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 21, 2018 Filing 97 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Arrow Trans Corp. served on 3/9/2018, answer due 3/30/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 21, 2018 Filing 96 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Speedway Logistics Inc served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 21, 2018 Filing 95 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Smith Transportation Service Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Tiger Logistics served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 21, 2018 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Heliosphere Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 21, 2018 Filing 93 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Premium Express Inc.(Mahoney, Ryan)
March 21, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A Mahoney on behalf of Premium Express Inc (Mahoney, Ryan)
March 21, 2018 Filing 91 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Go To Logistics, Inc..(Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
March 21, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Tomasz Koziol PHV on behalf of Go To Logistics, Inc. (Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #78 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tomasz Koziol PHV for Go To Logistics, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/20/2018. (mtr)
March 20, 2018 Filing 88 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nussbaum. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nal)
March 19, 2018 Filing 87 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jeff Bryan Transport. (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). (nal)
March 19, 2018 Filing 86 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Light Logistics Inc. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nal)
March 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Eagle Capital answer due date 3/23, Orange Commercial Credit answer due date 3/26, St John Capital Corp answer due date 3/26. (nae)
March 19, 2018 Filing 85 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GI Super Service, Inc. (Attachments #1 Envelope). (nal)
March 19, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss This "Frivolous" Civil Action and Order an Immediate Prorated Payout of the $75.000.00 Bond Proceeds to Defendants AND The Defendant's Answer to the Complaint by Defendant Jason Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
March 19, 2018 Filing 83 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). G & G Logistics, Inc. served on 3/12/2018, answer due 4/2/2018; IIK Transport, Inc. served on 3/12/2018, answer due 4/2/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 19, 2018 Filing 82 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). TVM Express Inc served on 3/10/2018, answer due 4/2/2018; Tac Trans Inc served on 3/10/2018, answer due 4/2/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 19, 2018 Filing 81 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). TBS Factoring Service, LLC, as Assignee of Uber Trucking, LLC served on 3/8/18, answer due 3/29/18; LSQ Funding Group LC, as Assignee of Valor Express, Inc. served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018; TBS Factoring Service, LLC, as Assignee of Werk's Truckin LLC served on 3/8/2018, answer due 3/29/2018. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/21/2018 to add parties to docket text. (tlr).
March 19, 2018 Filing 80 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). BR Cargo, LLC served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; Transam Financial Services, Inc. as Assignee of DM World Transportation served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; Hanjra Trucking served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; HM Trans, Inc. served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; MDS Trucking V Inc served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; Olero Inc served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; Thunder Funding/Thunder Carrier Services, Inc., as Assignee of Mak Link Limited Liability Co. served on 3/7/2018, answer due 3/28/2018; TBS Factoring Service, LLC, as Assignee of North America Moving Crew, LLC, served on 3/7/18, answer due 3/28/18; TBS Factoring Service, as Assignee of NWC Trucking, LLC served on 3/7/18, answer due 3/28/18; Olero, Inc. served on 3/7/18, answer due 3/28/18; Advance Business Capital LLC dba Triumph Business Capital, as Assignee of Primus Logistics, Inc. served on 3/7/18, answer due 3/28/18; TBS Factoring Service, as Assignee of Sanchez Family Trucking, LLC served on 3/7/18, answer due 3/28/18; TBS Factoring Service, as Assignee of Seagate Freight LLC served on 3/7/18, answer due 3/28/18; TAFS Premium Finance, Inc., as Assignee of VSM Express served on 3/7/18, answer due 3/28/18. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/21/2018 to add parties to docket text. (tlr).
March 19, 2018 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). CoreFund Capital LLC as Assigneee of J & J's Leading Transport, LLC served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; GT Logistics, Inc. served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; Jeep Transport Inc served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; Lesmeister Transportation Inc served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; TAFS Premium Finance, Inc., as Assignee of Manta Freight LLC served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; MTY Transportation LLC served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; Navigator Express Inc served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc., as Assignee of Pitts Logistics served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; TAFS Premium Finance, Inc., as Assignee of Prime Transportation, LLC served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; TAFS Premium Finance, Inc., as Assignee of RP Super Trucking served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; Eagle Capital Corporation, as Assignee of Sho Nuff Truckin, Inc. served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; Advance Business Capital LLC dba Triumph Business Capital, as Assignee of TNT Express, Inc. served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; Riviera Finance, as Assignee of Twin Logistics Express, Inc. served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; Orange Commercial Credit, as Assignee of United Trans Group, Inc. served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; JD Factors, LLC, as Assignee of Unlimited Freight Inc. served on 3/6/18, answer due 3/27/18; North American Transport Services LLC served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; Varta Inc served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018; Compass Funding Solutions, as Assignee of VS Trucklines, Inc. served on 3/9/2018, answer due 3/30/2018, Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc., as Assignee of Zakpol Trucking served on 3/6/2018, answer due 3/27/2018. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/21/2018 to add parties to docket text. (tlr).
March 19, 2018 Filing 78 Application for Attorney Tomasz Koziol to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Go To Logistics, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3515864(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
March 19, 2018 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Orange Commercial Credit as assignee of Freight Solutions Services served on 3/5, answer due 3/26. St John Capital Corp as assignee of Lucky Way Logistics, Inc served on 3/5, answer due 3/26. Orange Commercial Credit as assignee of Sedena Trucking Services Inc served on 3/5, answer due 3/26 (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/20/2018 to correct text (nae).
March 19, 2018 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Eagle Capital c/o Albert Delgadillo served on 3/2, answer due 3/23 (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/20/2018 to correct docket text(nae).
March 19, 2018 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Ecklund Logistics, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 16, 2018 Filing 74 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by IBY Transport. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2018: #2 More legible copy) (jss).
March 15, 2018 Filing 73 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Quick Pay served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Twin Express Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; USA Cargo Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Ultra Trucking Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Valor Express Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Vargas Transportation LLC served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; White Star Transport Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Windy Hill Foliage Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 15, 2018 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). S3 Capital LLC served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Sedena Trucking Services Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Shotgun Express Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Sky Transport Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Spectrum Express Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Standard Trucking LLC served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; State 2 State Trucks Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; TAK Trucking Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Three Way Logistics Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Tower Truck Lines Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Transfreight Logistics Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Transrapid inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 15, 2018 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Aladdin Financial Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Dilley Zimny Insurance served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; MGR Freight System served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Road Wolves Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Roadstar Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 15, 2018 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). C & I Trucking, Inc. served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Great Plains Transportation Services Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Insight Technology Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Landliner Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Lemberg Group Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Liv Transportation served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Lowell Logistics Inc served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; MCDA Logistics LLC served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Orange Commercial Credit served on 3/5/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 15, 2018 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Central Logistics Group, Inc. served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Go To Logistics, Inc. served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; IBY Transport served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Jodi Express served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Light Logistics Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; MnAlan Trucking Corp served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Multi-Load Transport Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; One Nation Trans served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Out Witting The Rest Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Primary Transportation Services, Inc. served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Quality Transport Brokers Corp served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Rama Transportation LLC served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; SL Black Fox Transport LLC served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Sam's Trucking Services LLC served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Smarten Transport served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; South Bay Logistics Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; T&T Freight served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Tadz Logistics Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Titan Quality Transport served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Transhield Trucking Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; U Brothers Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Van Dam Transport served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018; Victory Transit Inc served on 3/3/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 15, 2018 Filing 68 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Apex Capital Corp. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
March 14, 2018 Filing 67 RECEIPT of Check in the amount of $75,000 from Merchants Bonding Company, receipt# INN2015881. (jss)
March 14, 2018 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Liberty Transit LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Lintrans Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Merx Global Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Midwest Express Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Navigation Global LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Nedex Express Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Nussbaum served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Oneway Logistics Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; PDM Financial served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Premium Express Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Prestige Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Puma Logistics served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Quality Freight LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Quality Refrigerated Transportation served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Quick Freight Logistics Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; RD Limited Partnership served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Rio Importers USA Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Saint John Capital Corporation served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Security Transport Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Silvicom Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Sky Express Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Smart Freight Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Sonic Trans Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Taylor Truck Line served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Riviera Finance served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; CD Consortium Corp served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; CJM Financial Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; RTS Financial Service Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Baxter Bailey & Associates served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Compass Funding Solutions served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/16/2018 add answer deadlines for Riviera Finance, CD Consortium Corp, CJM Financial Inc, RTS Financial Service Inc, Baxter Bailey & Associates and Compass Funding Solutions. (nal)
March 14, 2018 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Credit Express, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Fleet One Factoring, LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; G.G. Barnett Transport, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; GP Transportation served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; GTS Transportation Corp. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Giannakis Transportation, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Goldmax Carrier, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Jason Transport Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Jeff Bryan Transport served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Kania Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Lama Trucking Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; TBS Factoring Service served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Accutrac Capital, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Baxter Bailey & Associates served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; FirstLine Funding Group served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Financial Carrier Service LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Interstate Capital Corp served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Partners Funding Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; CJM Financial Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Compass Funding Solutions served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Sunbelt Finance LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Crestmark Bank served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Graval Corporation served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; RTS Financial Service served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Vero Business Captial LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; OTR Capital LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Partners Funding Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Assist Financial Services served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; TAFS Premium Finance Inc served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; JD Factors LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; CD Consortium Corp served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/15/2018 to add answer deadlines for Baxter Bailey & Associates, FirstLine Funding Group, Financial Carrier Service LLC, Interstate Capital Corp Partners, Funding Inc, CJM Financial Inc, Compass Funding Solutions Sunbelt Finance LLC, Crestmark Bank Graval Corporation, RTS Financial Service Vero Business Captial LLC, OTR Capital LLC Partners Funding Inc, Assist Financial Services, TAFS Premium Finance Inc, JD Factors LLC and CD Consortium Corp. (nal)
March 14, 2018 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Airline Transportation served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; AMG Freight served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; CIM Financial Inc served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Advance Business Capital LLC served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018. (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/15/2018 to add answer deadlines for CIM Financial Inc and Advance Business Capital LLC. (nal)
March 13, 2018 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sam's Trucking Services LLC. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (nal)
March 13, 2018 Filing 62 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Cranley, Grace)
March 13, 2018 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Advance Business Capital LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Arnhalt Transportation Brokerage, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Brian, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; CJM Financial, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; D & S Factors LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Delta Transport, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Direct Service Transport, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Divine Enterprises served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Dolche Truckload, Corp. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; EMR Express served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Far West Capital Transportation served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Financial Carrier Services served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Flex Transport, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Interstate Capital Corporation served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; JD Factors LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Partners Funding, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Pavestone Capital served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; TCI Business Capital, Inc. served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018; Vero Business Capital LLC served on 3/2/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 12, 2018 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). DLK Trucking Inc served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Delta Carrier Group, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Eagle Capital Corporation served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Eagle Trucking Company served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Echo Trucking, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Fischer Truck and Bus Service, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Freightzone Express, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; GI Super Service, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Good Source Trucking, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Green Mile, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Highboost Corporation served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Integrated Logistics & Associates served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; JBA Trucking LLC served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; JP Trucking Services Inc served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; K-Way Express Inc served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Kottke Trucking Inc served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; MMJ Transportation Inc served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; MPK Trucking LLC served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Riviera Finance served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Transportation Funding Group served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; RTS Financial Service served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Crestmark Bank served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Baxter Bailey & Associates served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; FirstLine Funding Group served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; OTR Capital, LLC served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018; Assist Financial Services, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018.(Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/13/2018 to add answer deadlines for RTS Financial Service, Crestmark Bank, Baxter Bailey & Associates, FirstLine Funding Group, OTR Capital LLC and Assist Financial Services Inc (mlc).
March 12, 2018 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Art Logistics served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Assist Financial Services, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Baxter Bailey & Associates served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Bo Tech Transportation served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Brite Logistics, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Business Lines Corp. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; CD Consortium Corporation served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; CMW Transport Co., Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; CoreLogic served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; FirstLine Funding Group served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Foley Carrier Services, LLC served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Freight Factoring Specialists served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; RTS Financial Service served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; SevenOaks Capital served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Sunbelt Finance served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; AG Lines, Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018. ORT Capital, LLC served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018; Compass Funding Solutions served on 3/1/18, answer due 3/22/18 (Cranley, Grace) Modified on 3/13/2018 to add answer deadlines for Compass Funding Solutions and ORT Capital LLC (mlc).
March 9, 2018 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Out Witting The Rest Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
March 9, 2018 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Adex, Inc. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; Amerifreight Systems, LLC served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; Autodina Corp. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; BL Quality Trans Inc. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; BTI, Inc. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; Black Sea Transportation served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; Black Wolf Transportation served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; Bulmaks, Inc. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; Compass Funding Solutions served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; IMG Trucking, Inc. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; JC Trans Co served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; KForce Express Inc served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; Koned Logistics Inc served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; Riviera Finance of Texas, Inc. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018; AMG Logistics, Inc. served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 9, 2018 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). OTR Capital, LLC served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018; TAFS Premium Finance Inc served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 9, 2018 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). Crestmark Bank served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; Steelhead Finance served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67 to Deposit Funds into the Registry of the Court #3 and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to accept and deposit into the Registry of the Court the tender of funds from Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) in the amount of $75,000.00 (cc: financial). Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/8/2018. (jss)
March 7, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace W Cranley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cranley, Grace)
March 5, 2018 Filing 52 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Compass Funding Solutions as Assignee of VS Trucklines Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
March 2, 2018 Filing 51 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Gumbiner, Krysta)
February 23, 2018 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Baxter Bailey & Associates, CD Consortium Corporation, Compass Funding Solutions, Interstate Capital Corporation, K-Way Express Inc, L E G S Transport Inc, LMX Transport Corp, Lama Trucking Inc, Landliner Inc, Lemberg Group Inc, Lesmeister Transportation Inc, Liberty Transit LLC, Light Logistics Inc, Lintrans Inc, Liv Enterprises Inc, Liv Transportation, Load to Ride Transportation, Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc, Lowell Logistics Inc, Lozar Inc, Lucky Way Logistics Inc, OTR Capital, LLC, RTS Financial Service, Saint John Capital Corporation, TCI Business Capital, Inc., Transportation Funding Group. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
February 23, 2018 Filing 49 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Assist Financial Services, Inc., Baxter Bailey & Associates, CoreFund Capital LLC, Crestmark Bank, Eagle Capital Corporation, FirstLine Funding Group, Innovation Truck Service LLC, Integrated Logistics & Associates, J Rayl Transport Inc, JBA Trucking LLC, JC Trans Co, JD Factors LLC, JP Trucking Services Inc, JPMKL Inc, Jason Transport Inc, Jeep Transport Inc, Jeff Bryan Transport, Jodi Express, KForce Express Inc, Kania Inc, Kommitted Transportation Inc, Koned Logistics Inc, Kottke Trucking Inc, OTR Capital, LLC, Phoenix Capital Group, LLC, RTS Financial Service, Riviera Finance, TAFS Premium Finance Inc, TBS Factoring Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
February 23, 2018 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to BR Cargo, LLC, BTI, Inc., Baxter Bailey & Associates, Brian, Inc., Brite Logistics, Inc., Bulmaks, Inc., Business Lines Corp., CD Consortium Corporation, FirstLine Funding Group, Foley Carrier Services, LLC, OTR Capital, LLC, Phoenix Capital Group, LLC, RTS Financial Service, TBS Factoring Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to Adex, Inc., BM, Corp., Baxter Bailey & Associates, Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc., Black Sea Transportation, Black Wolf Transportaion, Blast Transport, Inc., Bo Tech Transportation, RTS Financial Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., BFreight, Inc., BL Quality Trans Inc., Benjamin Best Freight, Compass Funding Solutions, Credit Express, Inc., JD Factors LLC, RTS Financial Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 45 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Autodina Corp., Bay and Bay Transportation, FirstLine Funding Group, Fleet One Factoring, LLC, Freight Factoring Specialists, Sunbelt Finance, TBS Factoring Service, ATD Express, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Windy Hill Foliage Inc, Apex Capital Corp., Baxter Bailey & Associates, Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc., Compass Funding Solutions, Credit Express, Inc., Financial Carrier Services(as assignee of Homer Express, LLC), RTS Financial Service, Riviera Finance(as assignee of TS Transportation Inc). NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
February 23, 2018 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to JD Factors, LLC, as Assignee of Unlimited Freight Inc.; JD Factors, LLC, as Assignee of US Expeditors, Inc.; Assist Financial Services, Inc., as Assignee of US Express Inc.; Crestmark Bank, as Assignee of US Freightways Logistics, Inc.; USA Cargo, Inc.; Compass Funding Solutions, as Assignee of USA Logistics, Inc.; Apex Capital Corp., as Assignee of USKO Express Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (tlr)
February 23, 2018 Filing 42 Summons Issued as to TVM Express, Inc.; Apex Capital Corp., as Assignee of Twin Cities Carrier, Inc.; Twin Express, Inc.; CoreLogic, as Assignee of Twin Express, Inc.; Riviera Finance, as Assignee of Twin Logistics Express, Inc.; U Brothers Inc.; Compass Funding Solutions, as Assignee of UAL Express, Inc.; TBS Factoring Service, LLC, as Assignee of Uber Trucking, LLC; Ultra Trucking, Inc.; Baxter Bailey & Associates, as Assignee of UNI Trans, Inc.; JD Factors, LLC, as Assignee of Unico Trans Corp; Compass Funding Solutions, as Assignee of Unique Freight Carriers, Inc.; Orange Commercial Credit, as Assignee of United Trans Group, Inc.; SevenOaks Capital, as Assignee of United Trasport Logistics; Assist Financial Services, Inc. of Unitrans Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (tlr)
February 23, 2018 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Baxter Bailey & Associates, Quick Pay, West Proline Logistics, White Star Transport Inc, FirstLine Funding Group, Bay View Funding, Wild Eagle Express NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
February 23, 2018 Filing 40 Summons Issued as to TransFreight Logistics, Inc.; Baxter Bailey & Associates, as Assignee of TransFreight Logistics, Inc.; RTS Financial Service, Inc., as Assignee of TransFreight Logistics, Inc.; Transhield Trucking, Inc., JD Factors, LLC, as Assignee of Transfinity Logistics, Inc.; Transit Core, LLC; Transrapid, Inc.; CD Consortium Corp., as Assignee of Transrapid, Inc.; Baxter Bailey & Associates, as Assignee of Trivium Trans, Inc.; Trucking Experts, LLC; RTS Financial Services, Inc., as Assignee of Trucking Experts, LLC; Apex Capital Corp., as Assignee of Truckland, Inc.; Compass Funding Solutions, as Assignee of Trucks LLC; Riviera Finance, as Assignee of TS Transportation, Inc.; Tumar Express, Inc.; NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (tlr)
February 23, 2018 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Assist Financial Services, Inc., Baxter Bailey & Associates, CD Consortium Corporation, RTS Financial Service, TAFS Premium Finance Inc(as assignee of RP Super Trucking), TBS Factoring Service, Transam Financial Services, Inc., Vero Business Capital LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
February 23, 2018 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to Three Way Logistics, Inc.; JD Factors, LLC, as Assignee of Thunder Logistics, Inc.; Tiger Logistics; RTS Financial Service, Inc., as Assignee of Tiger Logistics; Compass Funding Solutions, as Assignee of Titan Freight Lines, Inc.; Titan Quality Transport; Compass Funding Solutions, as Assignee of TLT Logistics, Inc.; Advance Business Capital LLC dba Triumph Business Capital, as Assignee of TNT Express, Inc.; Riviera Finance, as Assignee of Tochitos Trucking 1 Inc.; OTR Capital, LLC, as Assignee of Tolokeaa Transport; Tombach Corp.; Apez Capital Corp., as Assignee of Top Transit, LLC; Tower Truck Lines, Inc.; Advance Business Capital LLC dba Triumph Business Capital, as Assignee of Trafic Trucking, LLC; TraLo Companies, Inc.; NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (tlr)
February 23, 2018 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Compass Funding Solutions, Baxter Bailey & Associates, FirstLine Funding Group, Interstate Capital Corporation, VIP Expedited. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
February 23, 2018 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to GT Logistics, Inc., GTS Transportation Corp., OTR Capital, LLC, Vero Business Capital LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to T&T Freight; RTS Financial Service, In.c, as Assignee of T&T Freight; Tac Trans, Inc.; Apex Capital corp., as Assignee of Tac Trans, Inc.; Apex Capital Corp., as Assignee of Tacan Transport, Inc.; Tadz Logistics Inc.; TAK Trucking, Inc.; RTS Financial Services, Inc. as Assignee of TAK Trucking, Inc.; Advance Business Capital LLC dba Triumph Business Capital, as Assignee of Tan Elegant, Inc.; Taylor Truck Line; Compass Funding Solutions, as Assignee of Tempo Carrier, Inc.; TGL Logistics, Inc.; Crestmark TPG LLC, as Assigneee of TGL Logistics, Inc.; Sunbelt Finance, as Assignee of The B Brother's Transportation Corporation; TAFS Premium Finance, Inc., as Assignee of Three Brothers Trucking LLC; NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (tlr)
February 23, 2018 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Compass Funding Solutions, CoreLogic, Credit Express, Inc., Crestmark Bank, GP Transportation, Goldmax Carrier, Inc., Good Source Trucking, Inc., Great Wide Truckload Management, Green Mile, Inc., RTS Financial Service, Sunbelt Finance. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Valor Express, Inc., LSQ Funding Group LC, Van Dam Transport, Vargas Transportation LLC by CoreLogic, Varta Inc, Apex Capital Corp., OTR Capital, LLC, RTS Financial Service as assignee of Varta Inc, Via Logistics Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
February 23, 2018 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to CJM Financial, Inc., Financial Carrier Services, GI Super Service, Inc., Giannakis Transportation, Inc., Go To Logistics, Inc., Interstate Capital Corporation, Partners Funding, Inc., Phoenix Capital Group, LLC, TBS Factoring Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Baxter Bailey & Associates, Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc., CoreLogic, FirstLine Funding Group, Flex Transport, Inc., Free Style Trucking, Inc., Freightzone Express, Inc., G & G Logistics, Inc., G.G. Barnett Transport, Inc., JD Factors LLC, Orange Commercial Credit. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Arnhalt Transportation Brokerage, Inc., Arrow Trans Corp., Art Logistics, Artudianti, Inc., Compass Funding Solutions, CoreLogic, RTS Financial Service, Riviera Finance of Texas, Inc., AT Line, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Baxter Bailey & Associates, CD Consortium Corporation, Far West Capital Transportation, Fast Loading, Inc., Financial Carrier Services, FirstLine Funding Group, Fischer Truck and Bus Service, Inc., Interstate Capital Corporation, Partners Funding, Inc., RTS Financial Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Crestmark Bank, EMR Express, Eagle Capital Corporation, Eagle Trucking Company, Echo Trucking, Inc., Ecklund Logistics, Inc., FirstLine Funding Group, Foley Carrier Services, LLC, Insight Technology Inc, OTR Capital, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Assist Financial Services, Inc., CD Consortium Corporation, CJM Financial, Inc., Foley Carrier Services, LLC, RTS Financial Service, Vero Business Capital LLC, AMG Freight, AMG Logistics, Inc., AMZ Trans, Inc., ANG Transportation, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc., DKL Trucking, Inc., DMN Transport, Inc., Direct Service Transport, Inc., Divine Enterprises, Dolche Truckload, Corp., Dosped, Inc., RTS Financial Service, TAFS Premium Finance Inc., Transam Financial Services, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Airline Transportation, American Motor Transportation, Inc., Amerifreight Systems, LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Crestmark Bank, Interstate Capital Corporation, RTS Financial Service, AG Expedited, Inc., AG Lines, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Compass Funding Solutions, DC Transport, Inc., DF Carrier LLC, Delta Carrier Group, Inc., Delta Transport, Inc., Diamond Freight, Inc., FirstLine Funding Group, Orange Commercial Credit, TCI Business Capital, Inc. b>NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Assist Financial Services, Inc., Baxter Bailey & Associates, CJM Financial, Inc., Cross Express, Co., D & S Factors LLC, TBS Factoring Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Ansonia Credit Data, Apex Capital Corp., Assist Financial Services, Inc., Baxter Bailey & Associates, CD Consortium Corporation, Compass Funding Solutions, Eagle Capital Corporation, FirstLine Funding Group, Foley Carrier Services, LLC, Insight Technology Inc, OTR Capital, LLC, Orange Commercial Credit, RD Limited Partnership, RTS Financial Service, Rama Transportation LLC, Real Transport Inc, Real Trucking Inc, Recon Logistics LLC, Rio Importers USA Inc, Riviera Finance, Road Wolves Inc, Roadstar Inc, S3 Corp LLC, Saint John Capital Corporation, Sam's Trucking Services LLC, Sedena Trucking Services Inc, SevenOaks Capital, Sunbelt Finance, TAFS Premium Finance Inc, TBS Factoring Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Baxter Bailey & Associates(as assignee of Heavy Lane Transport), CD Consortium Corporation, CMW Transport Co., Inc., Central Logistics Group, Inc., Compass Funding Solutions, Conick Logistics, Inc., OTR Capital, LLC(as assignee of Legacy Transportation), Pavestone Capital(as assignee of Cowboy Logistics, LLC), TAFS Premium Finance Inc(as assignee of RP Super Trucking). NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., C & I Trucking, Inc., Cargo Transit Corp., Carrier Management, Inc., Crestmark Bank, RTS Financial Service, Steelhead Finance, TAFS Premium Finance Inc(as assignee of RP Super Trucking). NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Adex, Inc., Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Compass Funding Solutions, Interstate Capital Corporation, RTS Financial Service, SevenOaks Capital, Vero Business Capital LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp, Crestmark Bank, IBY Transport, IIK Transport, Inc, IMG Trucking, Inc, Iman Carriers, Inc, JD Factors, LLC, RTS Financial Service, Transportation Funding Group. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
February 23, 2018 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Aladdin Financial Inc, CoreLogic, Crestmark Bank, FirstLine Funding Group, Prestige Inc, Primary Transportation Services, Inc., Primium Express Inc, Puma Logistics, Quality Freight LLC, Quality Refrigerated Transportation, Quality Transport Brokers Corp, TAFS Premium Finance, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Assist Financial Services, Inc., Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc., JD Factors LLC, PDM Financial, Picadello Enterprises Inc, Primium Express Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc, Compass Funding Solutions, Pavestone Capital, Phoenix Capital Group, LLC, Sunbelt Finance, 1st Choice Express, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2018: #1 Summons w/Court Seal) (kjp).
February 23, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Compass Funding Solutions, JD Factors LLC, OTR Capital, LLC, One Nation Trans, Oneway Logistics Inc, Out Witting The Rest Inc, Partners Funding, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to CJM Financial, Inc., Compass Funding Solutions, NR.1 Transport, Nussbaum, Oak Hill Capital Group, Off Ramp Trucking LLC, Olero Inc, RTS Financial Service, TBS Factoring Service). NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Baxter Bailey & Associates, Crestmark Bank, Dilley Zimny Insurance, FirstLine Funding Group, NEPA Distribution LLC, Navigation Global LLC, Navigator Express Inc, Nedex Express Inc, North American Transport Services LLC, TBS Factoring Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Baxter Bailey & Associates, CD Consortium Corporation, Crestmark Bank, Namanagh Inc, Natalie Express. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Assist Financial Services, Inc, Crestmark Bank, Financial Carrier Services, HM Trans, Inc, Heliosphere Inc, Highboost Corporation, OTR Capital, LLC RTS Financial Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
February 23, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Financial Carrier Services(as, MPK Trucking LLC, MS US Inc, MTY Transportation LLC, MnAlan Trucking Corp, RTS Financial Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp., Compass Funding Solutions, Crestmark Bank, MDS Trucking V Inc, MGR Freight System, MMJ Transportation Inc, Merx Global Inc, Midwest Express Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Assist Financial Services, Inc., Financial Carrier Services(as assignee of Homer Express, LLC), FirstLine Funding Group, Great Plains Transportation Services Inc(as assignee of MBA Transport of Columbus LLC), MCDA Logistics LLC, Marka Transport Inc, Matrix Inc, RTS Financial Service. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Advance Business Capital LLC, Apex Capital Corp., Compass Funding Solutions, CoreLogic, Great Plains Transportation Services Inc(as assignee of MBA Transport of Columbus LLC), TAFS Premium Finance Inc(as assignee of RP Super Trucking), Thunder Funding. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
February 23, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apex Capital Corp, Baxter Bailey & Associates, FirstLine Funding Group, Hanjra Trucking, Harrington Ridge Coal & Stove, LLC, Interstate Capital Corporation, OTR Capital, LLC, Partners Funding, Inc, TBS Factoring Service, Accutrac Capital, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
February 22, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons C through G, #2 Proposed Summons H through L, #3 Proposed Summons M through Q, #4 Proposed Summons R through S, #5 Proposed Summons T through U, #6 Proposed Summons V through Z)(Gumbiner, Krysta)
February 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Gumbiner, Krysta)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service were not submitted with case. (sct)
February 22, 2018 Judge Rudy Lozano and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct)
February 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3491215.), filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gumbiner, Krysta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) v. Apex Capital Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMX Transport Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesmeister Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recon Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Importers USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Light Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Carrier Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fischer Truck and Bus Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJM Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airline Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bryan Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDM Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lozar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MnAlan Trucking Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecklund Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puma Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Tech Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brite Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMG Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCDA Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nedex Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Service Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artudianti, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liv Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & I Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steelhead Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vero Business Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go To Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Tomasz Koziol PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Capital Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS Premium Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riviera Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Mile, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Refrigerated Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kommitted Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestmark Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kottke Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Logistics & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Expedited, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Best Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IIK Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Express, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Wolves Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NR.1 Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Rayl Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnhalt Transportation Brokerage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Transport Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavestone Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMN Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primium Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCI Business Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DF Carrier LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibby Transportation Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Off Ramp Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rama Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Lines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Trucking Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SevenOaks Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMR Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kania Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olero Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freight Factoring Specialists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Factors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS Premium Finance Inc
Represented By: James E Zoccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Trans Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMZ Trans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heliosphere Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMKL Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigation Global LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GT Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Transit LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeep Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS Factoring Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Funding Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Wide Truckload Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrington Ridge Coal & Stove, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstLine Funding Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lintrans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S3 Corp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDS Trucking V Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lama Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFreight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigator Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBA Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulmaks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BM, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargo Transit Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Business Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koned Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMJ Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Trans Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Load to Ride Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liv Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Factors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Funding Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Carrier Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Logistics Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolche Truckload, Corp.
Represented By: Tomasz Koziol PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DKL Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadstar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANG Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTS Transportation Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMW Transport Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accutrac Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flex Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highboost Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Trucking Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Far West Capital Transportation
Represented By: Teresa Ruiz Schober PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Hill Capital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Way Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanjra Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HM Trans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blast Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Source Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riviera Finance of Texas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Transport Brokers Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS Premium Finance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Loading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dosped, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Bailey & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Transportation Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBY Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Choice Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dilley Zimny Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Picadello Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assist Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATD Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BR Cargo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divine Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GI Super Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KForce Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & S Factors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free Style Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPK Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Commercial Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerifreight Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet One Factoring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Consortium Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Nation Trans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lemberg Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGR Freight System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transam Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Motor Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merx Global Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Consortium Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Capital Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Freight LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autodina Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovation Truck Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTS Financial Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foley Carrier Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marka Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iman Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namanagh Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landliner Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansonia Credit Data
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giannakis Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L E G S Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Out Witting The Rest Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Trucking Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.G. Barnett Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aladdin Financial Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedena Trucking Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Freight Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreFund Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & G Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conick Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BL Quality Trans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Wolf Transportaion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multi-Load Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Freight, Inc.
Represented By: George F LaForte PHV, Jr
Represented By: Sheila A Ramacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneway Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint John Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Sea Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightzone Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay and Bay Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldmax Carrier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEPA Distribution LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Way Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTY Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Transportation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Fargo Transport doing business as Triumph Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Bekteshi Logistics, Inc. doing business as Triumph Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Central Logistics, LLC doing business as Triumph Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD Limited Partnership doing business as Richard Daniels Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of Quality Wheels Inc doing business as Triumph Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of MMJ Transportation Inc doing business as Triumph Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Business Capital LLC as assignee of River North Industries Inc doing business as Triumph Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]