Kokak LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kokak LLC
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00177
Filed: April 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Hammond Office
County: Porter
Presiding Judge: Rudy Lozano
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Designation of Evidence 53 ; the Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement its Appendix 61 ; the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply 62 ; and the Plaintiff's Second Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to the Defendant's Reply in Support of the Defendant's Motion to Strike the Plaintiff's Evidence 70 . The Court also DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the Plaintiff's fi rst Motion to Strike Exhibits and Purported Undisputed Facts 47 ; the Defendant's Motion to Strike Certain Portions of Plaintiff's Designation of Evidence 54 ; the Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Reply in Su pport of Its Motion for Summary Judgment 59 ; the Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Defendant's Replies (Doc 63 and Doc 64 ) to its Motions to Supplement Evidence and Strike the Plaintiff's Evidence 68 . Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/31/2021. (bas)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER The 26 Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiff is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the 32 Motion to StrikePlaintiff's Untimely Response to Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/17/19. (kjp)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION AND ORDER: The Plaintiff to FILE on or before 7/1/2019, a supplemental jurisdictional statement identifying the citizenship on April 27th, 2018, the date the Complaint was filed, as outlined in the Opinion and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/17/2019. (mrm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kokak LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kokak LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Loucks
Represented By: Kevin E Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Audrey Louise Smith
Represented By: David L Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?