Caco v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Thomas D Caco
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Peoples Bank SB
Case Number: 2:2018cv00346
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
2 Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Opposition to #5 People's Bank SB's Motion to Dismiss filed by Thomas D Caco. (rmf)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Pretrial Order by Peoples Bank SB. (Koonce, Aaron)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron A Koonce on behalf of Peoples Bank SB (Koonce, Aaron)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Peoples Bank SB. (Koonce, Aaron)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Peoples Bank SB. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Koonce, Aaron)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Because Mr. Caco has failed to comply with all aspects of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 as it relates to motions for temporary restraining orders, the Court denies his motion. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/19/2018. (copy mailed to pro se party)(jss)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 2017-4 regarding assignment of civil cases, case randomly reassigned to Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen for all further proceedings. Senior Judge James T Moody no longer assigned to case. (rmf) Modified on 9/19/2018 (tlr).
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Peoples Bank SB, U.S. Bank National Association. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Peoples Bank SB, U.S. Bank National Association (Filing fee $ 400.) Receipt #2016899, filed by Thomas D Caco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(rmf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (rmf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caco v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D Caco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples Bank SB
Represented By: Aaron A Koonce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?