Gazzillo v. Bank of America NA
Plaintiff: Aldo Gazzillo
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00397
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (Copy mailed to pro se party). Magistrate Consent forms due by 1/8/2019. (tc)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 09:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 12/18/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(tc)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/15/2018. cc: Gazzillo(tc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Bank of America NA of Automatic Initial Extension of Time (Bailen, Neal)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal F Bailen on behalf of Bank of America NA (Bailen, Neal)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bank of America NA. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT and with Jury Demand against Bank of America NA (Filing fee $ 400.) Receipt #2017129, filed by Aldo Gazzillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-B)(rmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gazzillo v. Bank of America NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Neal F Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldo Gazzillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?