Amazzalorso v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Nicholas A Amazzalorso
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Undetermined: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2018cv00400
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Mansfield on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Mansfield, David)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (nae)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Summons filed by Nicholas A Amazzalorso. (Thacker PHV, Stephen)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, (Regional Chief Counsel). NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (nae) Modified on 10/30/2018 (Attorney did not provide proposed summons for Attorney General)(nae).
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons filed by Nicholas A Amazzalorso. (Thacker PHV, Stephen)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Nicholas A Amazzalorso. (Thacker PHV, Stephen)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. *Attorney to provide summons for US Attorney General and Social Security Administration* (lhc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Nicholas A Amazzalorso. (Thacker PHV, Stephen)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 No Proposed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service received. (lns)
October 25, 2018 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann added. (New Case) (lns)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Nicholas A Amazzalorso re #1 Complaint (Thacker PHV, Stephen)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT at Law against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3715613.), filed by Nicholas A Amazzalorso.(Thacker PHV, Stephen) Modified on 10/29/2018 to correct docket text (nae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazzalorso v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Represented By: David M Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas A Amazzalorso
Represented By: Stephen M Thacker PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?