Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co v. 800K LLC et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF REMY EXPRESS LLC, LINK TRANSPORT INC, WEX FLEET ONE AS ASSIGNEE OF ACTION LOGISTICS, TRANSIT CORE LLC, STAR TRANSPORTATION PA INC, CD CONSORTIUM CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE OF PEREZ EXPRESS LLC, ECHO TRUCKING INC, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF GIC LOGISTICS, CARGO SOLUTION EXPRESS, GSH TRUCKING, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BELA TRUCKING INC, BING LOGISTICS INC, TRANSRAPID INC, N TRUCKING LLC, LIBRA TRUCKING LLC, TBS FACTORING SERVICE LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF J&M HAULING CORP, X-SPEED TRANSPORTATION INC, RJ EXPRESS INC, SET TRANS LLC, GREAT PLAINS TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC AS ASSIGNEE OF KUEKER TRUCKING LLC, ALL IN TRUCKING INC, TRIUMPH BUSINESS CAPITAL AS ASSIGNEE OF QUALITY WHEELS, FOLEY BUSINESS CAPITAL, ECHO EXPRESS INC, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF AMG FREIGHT LLC, A2B CARGO INC, JRV LOGISTICS INC, BANTLE TRANSPORT LLC, ZIPSHIP LOGISTICS LLC, GPB LOGISTICS LLC, OTR CAPITAL LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF G&I SOLUTIONS INC, CJM FINANCIAL INC AS ASSIGNEE OF LIDO TRANS INC, MOLDEX INC, MIDWEST EXPRESS INC, GTS TRANSPORTATION CORP, ROAD WOLVES INC, EMMANUEL TRUCK EXPRESS CO, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF J&M PRADO CORP, TRI-B INC, RELIABLE TRUCK LINES INC, KIT LOGISTICS, TBS FACTORING SERVICE LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF EPO AND RPJ TRUCKING, THOMAS EXPRESS TRANSPORT LLC, D&D EXPRESS TRANSPORT CORPORATION, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF GTS TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION, MNS1 EXPRESS INC, GP TRANSPORTATION CO, USA FREIGHT INC, RIVIERA FINANCE AS ASSIGNEE OF KG LOGISTICS INC, BLACK RED WHITE INC, BROWN LOGISTICS INC, ALL STATE ENTERPRISE INC, CASCADE EXPRESS INC, ADVANCE TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS INC, B&B TRANSPORT INC, TRIUMPH BUSINESS CAPITAL AS ASSIGNEE OF JETSET EXPRESS, ASSIST FINANCIAL SERVICES INC, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF SULTAN TRANS INC, LOGISTICIZE LTD, JD FACTORS LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF OVERLOG INC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, IIK TRANSPORT INC, FINANCIAL CARRIER SERVICES INC AS ASSIGNEE OF DUBAI TRUCK LINES INC, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF DMAX LINE INC, DMN TRANSPORT INC, VS EXPRESS INC, SAM HOUSTON TRUCKLINES LLC, TRIPLE M LOGISTICS INC, RIDE STAR TRANSPORT LLC, PARTNERS FUNDING INC AS ASSIGNEE OF GOLD STAR CARRIERS INC, AGX FREIGHT CARRIERS LLC, LMB EXPRESS INC, L&E HAULING INC, NOVA LOGISTICS INC, LG WAY LLC, 800K LLC, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF BLUE STONE EXPRESS, FOUR TOWERS TRANSPORTATION, OTR CAPITAL LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF HINES TRANSPORTATION INC, RELEX LOGISTICS INC, FLAME TRANS INC, GULFSTREAM LOGISTICS INC, OTR CAPITAL LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAD EXPRESS INC, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF ROYAL LOGISTICS LLC, TRITON LOGISTICS INC, MUZZY CORPORATION, AMG FREIGHT LLC, WORLDWIDE CARRIER INC, INK TRANSPORTATION LLC, MB GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC, TBS FACTORING SERVICE LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF ULTRANS LOGISTICS LLC, PIGEON FREIGHT SERVICES, AB LINES INC, ALTEX LOGISTICS INC, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF YUGO INC, WALLACE FACTORING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF R&B TRUCKING INC, RIVIERA FINANCE AS ASSIGNEE OF MIK CARRIER LLC, VOLO GROUP INC, BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BANTLE TRANSPORTATION LLC, WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF US ATLANTIC EXPRESS LLC, UTRANS LOGISTICS LLC, TRADE WINDS TRANSIT INC, FORSAGE INC, TAYLOR TRUCK LINE INC, EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE AS ASSIGNEE OF FENIX EXPRESS LLC, THUNDER FUNDING AS ASSIGNEE OF E&E NATIONWIDE TRUCKING INC, SELLY LOGISTICS LLC, WEX FLEET ONE AS ASSIGNEE OF ALL IN ONE LOGISTICS, PARTNERS FUNDING INC AS ASSIGNEE OF AZE INC, OTR Capital LLCS, OTR Capital LLC, INK Tranportation LLC, Partners Funding Inc, Riviera Finance, Express Freight Finance, JD Factors LLC, CJM Financial Inc, WEX Inc, TBS Factoring Services LLC, Wex Fleet One, Thunder Funding, Sam Houston Truck Lines LLC, Triumph Business Capital, Wallace Factoring LLC, Great Plains Transportation Services Inc, CD Consortium Corporation, BB Transport Inc, Four Towers Tranportation, Financial Carrier Services Inc, AMG Freight, Hurst Logistics Inc, Kot Inc, M&R Carrier Inc, Redas Inc, Succardes LLC, X-Press Freight Logistics LLC, Alexander Miller & Associates LLC and 5 Star Trucking Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00403
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the interest accrued on the funds deposited in this case (less the amount deducted as the registry fee as authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States) be disbursed to Plaintiff and Defendants on a pro rata basis according to the agreed distribution and refund of the principal amount. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 4/13/2020. (lhc)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: The Court hereby ADVISES the parties that it intends to order that the interest (less the amount deducted as the registry fee as authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States) be disbursed to the parties on a pro rata basis to Plaintiff and Defendants according to the agreed distribution and refund of the principal amount. Any objections to this course of action must be filed on or before 4/10/2020. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 4/2/2020. (bas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 137 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (lhc) Modified on 2/14/2020 to remove cc (lhc).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING #133 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to disburse the funds deposited with the Court in association with this cause of action, as outlined in Order. The Court further DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to refund the remaining $46,040.00 to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. The Court ORDERS that Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is discharged under Surety Bond No. PB11499803994. With no controversy remaining to be resolved, this case is hereby TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 2/14/2020. (lhc)
February 13, 2020 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds No Opposition filed by Triple M Logistics Inc. (LaPorte, David)
February 3, 2020 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Set Trans LLC. (Vegeler, Robert)
January 30, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Companys Motion for Default and Entry of Judgment #131 , STRIKES the Answer 24 , and ORDERS that default judgment be entered against Defendant AgX Freight Carriers LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 1/8/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (shk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 131 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AgX Freight Carriers LLC by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
October 24, 2019 Filing 130 ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint by Echo Trucking Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Claim and Documentation)(Twohy, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Twohy on behalf of Echo Trucking Inc (Twohy, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 128 ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint by Echo Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Claim and Documentation)(Twohy, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Twohy on behalf of Echo Express Inc (Twohy, John)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that if AgX Freight Carriers LLC, Echo Express Inc., and Echo Trucking Inc. wish to pursue claims against the interpleader fund,they must by 10/24/2019, enter an appearance or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint BY A LICENSED ATTORNEY who is authorized to practice in the Northern District of Indiana. The defendants are WARNED that failure to act by this deadline will result in the striking of their answers. They are further WARNED that failure to appear by an attorney result in default and default judgment being entered against them. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/25/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(jss)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER: The defaults entered by the Clerk of Court #123 against the following defendants are SET ASIDE: 1. AgX Freight Carriers LLC2. Echo Express Inc.3. Echo Trucking Inc. The Court WILL NOT ENTER judgment by default against IIK Transport Inc. as that company ceased to be a party. The Court WILL NOT default judgment against the following parties: 1. Alexander Miller & Associates as assignee of Kot Inc.2. Alexander Miller & Associates as assignee of Redas Inc.3. Kot Inc.4. Redas Inc. Default Judgments are GRANTED against the following interpleader defendants: 1. 800K LLC2. 5 Star Trucking Inc.3. AB Lines Inc.4. A2B Cargo Inc.5. Advance Transportation System6. All in Trucking Inc.7. All State Enterprise Inc.8. Altex Logistics Inc.9. AMG Freight LLC10. Assist Financial Services Inc. as assignee of SA Express, Inc.11. B&B Transport Inc.12. Bantle Transport LLC13. Baxter Bailey & Associates14. Baxter Bailey & Associates as assignee of Bantle Transportation LLC15. Baxter Bailey & Associates as assignee of Bela Trucking Inc.16. Baxter Bailey & Associates as assignee of GTS Transportation Corporation17. Bing Logistics Inc.18. Brown Logistics Inc.19. Cargo Solutions Express20. Cascade Express Inc.21. CD Consortium Corporation, as assignee of KG Line Inc.22. CD Consortium Corporation, as assignee of Perez Express LLC23. D&D Express Transport Corporation24. DMN Transport Inc.25. Emmanuel Truck Express Co.26. Express Freight Finance as assignee of Fenix Express LLC27. Financial Carrier Services, Inc. as assignee of Dubai Truck Lines Inc.28. Flame Trans Inc.29. Foley Business Capital30. Forsage Inc.31. Four Towers Transportation32. GP Transportation Co.33. GPB Logistics LLC34. Great Plains Transportation Services Inc. as assignee of Kueker Trucking LLC35. GSH Trucking36. GTS Transportation Corp.37. Gulfstream Logistics Inc.38. Hurst Logistics Inc.39. Ink Transportation LLC40. JD Factors LLC as assignee of Overlog Inc.41. JRV Logistics Inc.42. Kit Logistics43. L&E Hauling44. LG Way LLC45. CJM Financial, Inc. as assignee of Lido Trans Inc.46. Link Transport Inc.47. LMB Express, Inc.48. Logisticize Ltd.49. MB Global Logistics, Inc.50. Midwest Express Inc.51. MNS1 Express Inc.52. Moldex Inc.53. M&R Carrier Inc.54. Muzzy Corporation55. N Trucking LLC56. Nova Logistics Inc.57. OTR Capital LLC, as assignee for Hines Transportation, Inc.58. OTR Capital LLC, as assignee for Mad Express, Inc.59. OTR Capital LLC as assignee for G&I Solutions, Inc.60. Partners Funding Inc. as assignee of AZE, Inc.61. Partners Funding Inc. as assignee of Gold Star Carriers, Inc.62. Pigeon Freight Services63. Wallace Factoring LLC as assignee of R&B Trucking, Inc.64. Relex Logistics Inc.65. Reliable Truck Lines Inc.66. Ride Star Transport LLC67. Riviera Finance as assignee of KG Logistics Inc.68. Riviera Finance as assignee of MIK Carrier LLC69. RJ Express Inc.70. Road Wolves Inc.71. Sam Houston Trucklines LLC72. Selly Logistics LLC73. Star Transportation PA Inc.74. Succardes LLC75. Taylor Truck Line76. TBS Factoring Service as assignee of EPO and RPJ Trucking77. TBS Factoring Service as assignee of J&M Hauling Corp.78. TBS Factoring Service as assignee of Ultrans Logistics LLC79. Thomas Express Transport LLC80. Thunder Funding as assignee of E&E Nationwide Trucking Inc.81. Trade Winds Transit Inc.82. Transit Core LLC83. Transrapid Inc.84. Tri-B Inc.85. Triton Logistics Inc.86. Triumph Business Capital as assignee of Jetset Express87. Triumph Business Capital as assignee of Quality Wheels88. USA Freight Inc.89. Utrans Logistics LLC90. Volo Group Inc.91. VS Express Inc.92. WEX Fleet One as Assignee of Action Logistics93. WEX Fleet One as Assignee of All in One Logistics94. WEX Fleet One as Assignee of AMG Freight LLC95. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of Blue Stone Express96. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of DMAX Line, Inc.97. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of GIC Logistics98. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of J&M Prado Corp.99. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of Remy Express, LLC100. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of Royal Logistics, LLC101. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of Sultan Trans, Inc.102. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of US Atlantic Express, LLC103. WEX, Inc. as Assignee of Yugo, Inc.104. Worldwide Carrier Inc.105. X-Press Freight Logistics LLC106. X-Speed Transportation Inc.107. Zipship Logistics LLCThis action CONTINUES as to the following Defendants:1. Black Red White Inc.2. Libra Trucking LLC3. Set Trans LLC4. Triple M Logistics5. AgX Freight Carriers LLC6. Echo Express Inc.7. Echo Trucking Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 9/24/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(jss)
August 6, 2019 Filing 124 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Status of Service)(Cranley, Grace)
August 6, 2019 Filing 123 *SET ASIDE per #125 * CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *AgX Freight Carriers, LLC, Echo Express, Inc. and Echo Trucking, Inc.* regarding #122 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (nal) Modified on 9/25/2019 (jss).
August 5, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to AgX Freight Carriers LLC; Echo Express Inc; Echo Trucking Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AgX Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - AgX Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Echo Express and Echo Trucking Proofs of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Echo Express Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Echo Trucking Answer, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
July 30, 2019 Filing 121 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Emmanuel Truck Express Corporation, GPB Logistics LLC and Volo Group Inc* regarding #119 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (nal)
July 3, 2019 Filing 120 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Cargo Solutions Express* regarding #118 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (rmc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Emmanuel Truck Express Corporation; GPB Logistics LLC; Volo Group Inc. by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
July 2, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Cargo Solutions Express by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
June 28, 2019 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Cargo Solution Express served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
June 28, 2019 Filing 116 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company as to Volo Group Inc. (Cranley, Grace)
June 28, 2019 Filing 115 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company as to GPB Logistics LLC. (Cranley, Grace)
June 28, 2019 Filing 114 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company as to Emmanuel Truck Express Co. (Cranley, Grace)
June 4, 2019 Filing 113 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Bantle Transport LLC* regarding #112 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (copy mailed to pro se parties (jss) Modified on 6/4/2019 (jss).
May 30, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Bantle Transport LLC by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 28, 2019 Filing 111 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *A2B Cargo Inc; CD Consortium Corporation assignee of KG Line Inc; Muzzy Corporation* regarding #110 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (rmc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to A2B Cargo Inc; CD Consortium Corporation assignee of KG Line Inc; Muzzy Corp by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 24, 2019 Filing 109 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company as to Bantle Transport LLC. (Cranley, Grace)
May 16, 2019 Filing 108 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. CD Consortium Corporation served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019; A2B Cargo Inc served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
May 16, 2019 Filing 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Muzzy Corporation served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Additional Time to Serve Certain Interpleader Defendants and ORDERS that service of all Interpleader Defendants be completed by July 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/6/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(kjp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 105 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Four Towers Transportation Inc, Sam Houston Trucklines LLC and VS Express Inc* regarding #103 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (kjp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 104 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *M&R Carrier Inc* regarding #102 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (kjp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2019: #1 Corrected Document) (kjp).
May 3, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Four Towers Transportation Inc; Sam Houston Trucklines LLC; VS Express Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 3, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to M&R Carrier, Inc. by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
May 2, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION for Additional Time to Serve Certain Interpleader Defendants by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2019 Filing 100 Summons Issued as to CD Consortium Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
April 19, 2019 Filing 99 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cargo Solution Express, GPB Logistics LLC, A2B Cargo Inc, Volo Group Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
April 19, 2019 Filing 98 ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint by Black Red White Inc.(Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
April 19, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Tomasz Koziol PHV on behalf of Black Red White Inc (Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
April 19, 2019 Filing 96 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company as to Four Towers Tranportation, Muzzy Corporation, Sam Houston Truck Lines LLC, VS Express Inc. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2019 Filing 95 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Black Red White Inc served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
April 19, 2019 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. M&R Carrier Inc served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
April 18, 2019 Filing 93 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
April 18, 2019 Filing 92 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tomasz Koziol PHV for Black Red White Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/18/2019. (mtr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 90 Application for Attorney Tomasz Koziol to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Black Red White, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3864793(Koziol PHV, Tomasz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 89 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Zipship Logistics LLC* regarding #88 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (ksp)
April 9, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Zipship Logistics LLC by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
April 4, 2019 Filing 87 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bantle Transport LLC. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #1 Corrected Summons) (jld).
April 3, 2019 Filing 86 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Zipship Logistics LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
April 3, 2019 Filing 85 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Stipulation to Dismiss. Defendants (1) Alexander as assignee or Kot Inc., (2) Alexander as assignee of Redas Inc., (3) Kot Inc., and (4) Redas Inc. are DISMISSED from this action WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 3/27/19. (ksp)
March 8, 2019 Filing 83 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Foley Business Capital LLC, DMN Transport, Inc., Taylor Truck Lines, Inc., Hurst Logistics, Inc., Moldex, Inc., Succardes, LLC, XPress Freight Logistics LLC, 5 Star Trucking, Inc.* (jss)
March 7, 2019 Filing 82 STIPULATION to Dismiss Alexander Miller & Associates LLC as assignee of Kot Inc; Alexander Miller & Associates LLC as assignee of Redas Inc; Kot Inc; and Redas Inc by Plaintiffs Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
March 7, 2019 Filing 81 *FILING ERROR _ REFILED AT #83 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Foley Business Capital LLC, DMN Transport, Inc., Taylor Truck Lines, Inc., Hurst Logistics, Inc., Moldex, Inc., Succardes, LLC, X-Press Freight Logistics LLC, Star Trucking, Inc.* regarding #80 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (jss) (cc pro se parties) Modified on 3/8/2019 (jss).
March 6, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Foley Business Capital LLC; DMN Transport Inc; Taylor Truck Lines Inc; Hurst Logistics Inc; Moldex Inc; Succardes LLC; XPress Freight Logistics LLC; and 5 Star Trucking Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
February 26, 2019 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Redas Inc served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
February 26, 2019 Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. 5 Star Trucking Inc served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019; X-Press Freight Logistics LLC served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
February 26, 2019 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Succardes LLC served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
February 26, 2019 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Hurst Logistics Inc served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019; Moldex Inc served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
February 15, 2019 Filing 75 ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint by Set Trans LLC.(Vegeler, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER striking #69 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Set Trans LLC with leave to refile for failure to comply with Local Rule 10-1(a), requiring responsive pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7(a) to: (1) restate verbatim the paragraphs from the pleading they respond to; and (2) immediately following each restated paragraph, state the response to that paragraph. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/13/2019. (smb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint by Triple M Logistics Inc.(LaPorte, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Taylor Truck Line Inc served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
February 7, 2019 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. DMN Transport Inc served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
February 7, 2019 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Foley Business Capital served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
February 6, 2019 Filing 69 (Stricken 2/13/2019) ANSWER to #65 Amended Complaint by Set Trans LLC.(Vegeler, Robert) Modified on 2/13/2019 to show stricken (smb).
February 6, 2019 Filing 68 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
February 6, 2019 Filing 67 No Proposed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service received for CD Consortium Corporation as assignee of KG Line. (cc: Pro se parties)(sct) Modified on 2/6/2019 to add routing (sct).
February 6, 2019 Filing 66 Summons Issued as to Hurst Logistics Inc, Kot Inc, M&R Carrier Inc, Redas Inc, Succardes LLC, 5 Star Trucking Inc, Alexander Miller & Associates LLC, X-Press Freight Logistics LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: Pro se parties) (sct) Modified on 2/6/2019 to add routing(sct).
February 5, 2019 Filing 65 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons)(Cranley, Grace)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTS #56 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint in Interpleader by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co and ORDERS Plaintiff to file the proposed Amended Complaint, currently on the docket as an attachment to the instant Motion by 2/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/4/2019. (cc: pro se parties) (lhc)
January 29, 2019 Filing 63 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc Assignee of Bantle Transport LLC; Thunder Funding Assignee of E&E Nationwide Trucking Inc; Pigeon Freight Services; 800K LLC* regarding #62 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (cc: pro se parties) (rmc)
January 28, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc Assignee of Bantle Transport LLC; Thunder Funding Assignee of E&E Nationwide Trucking Inc; Pigeon Freight Services; 800K LLC by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
January 25, 2019 Filing 61 Summons Issued as to Zipship Logistics LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
January 24, 2019 Filing 60 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Cranley, Grace)
January 24, 2019 Filing 59 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Black Red White Inc, Emmanuel Truck Express Co, Moldex Inc, Volo Group Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 58 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Cranley, Grace)
January 14, 2019 Filing 57 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to A2B Cargo Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
January 11, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint in Interpleader by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint in Interpleader)(Cranley, Grace)
January 11, 2019 Filing 55 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Foley Business Capital. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
January 10, 2019 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. 800K LLC served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
January 10, 2019 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Pigeon Freight Services served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
January 10, 2019 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Thunder Funding served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
January 10, 2019 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Baxter Bailey & Associates served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Cranley, Grace)
January 10, 2019 Filing 50 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Cranley, Grace)
January 8, 2019 Filing 49 Mail Returned from Cogency Global Inc - Cogency Global Inc is not the registered agent for Foley Business Capital in Nebraska re #38 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Foley Business Capital. (sct)
December 28, 2018 Filing 48 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *D&D Express Transport Corp; Reliable Truck Lines Inc; MNS1 Express Inc; Worldwide Carrier Inc; Gulfstream Logistics Inc; L&E Hauling Inc; Wallace Factoring LLC Assignee of R&B Trucking Inc; Utrans Logistics LLC; Bing Logistics Inc; Transit Core LLC; Relex Logistics Inc* regarding #43 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co (cc: pro se parties) (jss)
December 28, 2018 Filing 47 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *AB Lines Inc; All in Trucking Inc; Triton Logistics Inc* regarding #42 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co (cc: pro se parties) (jss)
December 28, 2018 Filing 46 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Assist Financial Services Inc Assignee of SA Express Inc; Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc; Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc Assignee of Bela Trucking Inc; Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc Assignee of GTS Transportation Corp; Forsage Inc; IIK Transport Inc; JRV Logistics Inc; MB Global Logistics Inc; Ride Star Transport LLC* regarding #41 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co (cc: pro se parties) (jss)
December 28, 2018 Filing 45 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against * Brown Logistics Inc; Cascade Express Inc; GSH Trucking Inc; Ink Transportation LLC; LMB Express Inc; Midwest Express Inc; Selly Logistics LLC; Star Transportation PA Inc* regarding #40 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co (jss) (cc: pro se parties)
December 28, 2018 Filing 44 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Advance Transportation Systems Inc; All State Enterprises Inc; AMG Freight LLC; B&B Transport Inc; CD Consortium Corporation Assignee of Perez Express LLC; Express Freight Finance Assignee of Fenix Express LLC; Financial Carrier Services Inc Assignee of Dubai Truck Lines Inc; Flame Trans Inc; GP Transportation Co; Great Plains Transportation Services Inc Assignee of Kueker Trucking LLC; LG Way LLC; CJM Financial Inc Assignee of Lido Trans Inc; Link Transport Inc; Logisticize Ltd; Nova Logistics Inc; OTR Capital LLC Assignee of G&I Solutions Inc; OTR Capital LLC Assignee of Hines Transportation Inc; OTR Capital LLC Assignee of Mad Express Inc; Partners Funding Inc Assignee of AZE Inc; Partners Funding Inc Assignee of Gold Star Carriers Inc; RJ Express Inc; Riviera Finance Assignee of KG Logistics Inc; Riviera Finance Assignee of MIK Carrier LLC; TBS Factoring Service Inc Assignee of EPO and RPJ Trucking; TBS Factoring Service Inc Assignee of J&M Hauling Corp; TBS Factoring Service Inc Assignee of Ultrans Logistics LLC; Thomas Express Transportation LLC; Trade Winds Transit Inc; Transrapid Inc; Tri-B Inc; Triumph Business Capital Assignee of Jetset Express; Triumph Business Capital Assignee of Quality Wheels; USA Freight Inc; WEX Fleet One Assignee of All in One Logistics; X-Speed Transportation Inc* regarding #39 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co (cc: pro se parties) (jss)
December 21, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to D&D Express Transport Corp; Reliable Truck Lines Inc; MNS1 Express Inc; Worldwide Carrier Inc; Gulfstream Logistics Inc; L&E Hauling Inc; Wallace Factoring LLC Assignee of R&B Trucking Inc; Utrans Logistics LLC; Bing Logistics Inc; Transit Core LLC; Relex Logistics Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
December 21, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to AB Lines Inc; All in Trucking Inc; Triton Logistics Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
December 21, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Assist Financial Services Inc Assignee of SA Express Inc; Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc; Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc Assignee of Bela Trucking Inc; Baxter Bailey & Associates Inc Assignee of GTS Transportation Corp; Forsage Inc; IIK Transport Inc; JRV Logistics Inc; MB Global Logistics Inc; Ride Star Transport LLC by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
December 21, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Brown Logistics Inc; Cascade Express Inc; GSH Trucking Inc; Ink Transportation LLC; LMB Express Inc; Midwest Express Inc; Selly Logistics LLC; Star Transportation PA Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
December 21, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Advance Transportation Systems Inc; All State Enterprises Inc; AMG Freight LLC; B&B Transport Inc; CD Consortium Corporation Assignee of Perez Express LLC; Express Freight Finance Assignee of Fenix Express LLC; Financial Carrier Services Inc Assignee of Dubai Truck Lines Inc; Flame Trans Inc; GP Transportation Co; Great Plains Transportation Services Inc Assignee of Kueker Trucking LLC; LG Way LLC; CJM Financial Inc Assignee of Lido Trans Inc; Link Transport Inc; Logisticize Ltd; Nova Logistics Inc; OTR Capital LLC Assignee of G&I Solutions Inc; OTR Capital LLC Assignee of Hines Transportation Inc; OTR Capital LLC Assignee of Mad Express Inc; Partners Funding Inc Assignee of AZE Inc; Partners Funding Inc Assignee of Gold Star Carriers Inc; RJ Express Inc; Riviera Finance Assignee of KG Logistics Inc; Riviera Finance Assignee of MIK Carrier LLC; TBS Factoring Service Inc Assignee of EPO and RPJ Trucking; TBS Factoring Service Inc Assignee of J&M Hauling Corp; TBS Factoring Service Inc Assignee of Ultrans Logistics LLC; Thomas Express Transportation LLC; Trade Winds Transit Inc; Transrapid Inc; Tri-B Inc; Triumph Business Capital Assignee of Jetset Express; Triumph Business Capital Assignee of Quality Wheels; USA Freight Inc; WEX Fleet One Assignee of All in One Logistics; X-Speed Transportation Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
December 21, 2018 Filing 38 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Foley Business Capital; JD Factors LLC Assignee of Overlog Inc; N Trucking LLC; WEX Fleet One Assignee of Action Logistics; WEX Inc Assignee of AMG Freight LLC; WEX Inc Assignee of Blue Stone Express; WEX Inc Assignee of DMAX Line Inc; WEX Inc Assignee of GIC Logistics; WEX Inc Assignee of J&M Prado Corp; WEX Inc Assignee of Remy Express LLC; WEX Inc Assignee of Royal Logistics LLC; WEX Inc Assignee of Sultan Trans Inc; WEX Inc Assignee of US Atlantic Express LLC; WEX Inc Assignee of Yugo Inc* regarding #36 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co (cc: pro se parties)(sct)
December 21, 2018 Filing 37 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Altex Logistics Inc; GTS Transportation Corporation; Kit Logistics Inc and Road Wolves Inc* regarding #35 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co (cc: dfts and pro se parties)(sct) Modified on 12/21/2018 to add pro se parties (sct).
December 20, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Foley Business Capital; JD Factors LLC Assignee of Overlog Inc; N Trucking LLC; WEX Fleet One Assignee of Action Logistics; WEX Inc Assignee of AMG Freight LLC; WEX Inc Assignee of Blue Stone Express; WEX Inc Assignee of DMAX Line Inc; WEX Inc Assignee of GIC Logistics; WEX Inc Assignee of J&M Prado Corp; WEX Inc Assignee of Remy Express LLC; WEX Inc Assignee of Royal Logistics LLC; WEX Inc Assignee of Sultan Trans Inc; WEX Inc Assignee of US Atlantic Express LLC; WEX Inc Assignee of Yugo Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
December 20, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Altex Logistics Inc; GTS Transportation Corporation; Kit Logistics Inc; Road Wolves Inc by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
December 19, 2018 RECEIPT of $75,000 per DE #21 order. Receipt No. 2017484. (nal)
December 13, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS REISSUED as to A2B Cargo Inc, Pigeon Freight Services and Thunder Funding. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
December 12, 2018 Filing 33 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Cranley, Grace)
December 12, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Relex Logistics Inc served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
December 12, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Transit Core LLC served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
December 12, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Bing Logistics Inc served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
December 12, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Utrans Logistics LLC served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018; Wallace Factoring LLC served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
December 12, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. L&E Hauling Inc served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
December 12, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Gulfstream Logistics Inc served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
December 11, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Libra Trucking LLC.(Friedman PHV, Eugene)
December 11, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Friedman PHV on behalf of Libra Trucking LLC (Friedman PHV, Eugene)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eugene Friedman PHV for Libra Trucking LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/11/2018. (mtr)
December 11, 2018 Filing 22 Application for Attorney Eugene Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Libra Trucking LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3756273(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Interpleader by AGX Freight Carriers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmf)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Deposit Funds. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to accept and deposit into the Registry of the Court the tender of funds from Plaintiff in the amount of $75,000.00. The Clerk of the Court shall invest the monies properly and promptly, and without further order of the Court may deduct the registry fee as authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States from the income earned while funds are held in Registry. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice with this Court when the deposit hasbeen made. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/30/18. (cc: Financial) (ksp)
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Echo Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmf)
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Echo Trucking Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmf)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint in Interpleader by Triple M Logistics Inc.(LaPorte, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David L LaPorte on behalf of Triple M Logistics Inc (LaPorte, David)
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. MNS1 Express Inc served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018; Worldwide Carrier Inc served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. D&D Express Transport Corporation served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018; Reliable Truck Lines Inc served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. GTS Transportation Corp served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018; Kit Logistics served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018; Altex Logistics Inc served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018; Road Wolves Inc served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018; Set Trans LLC served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Foley Business Capital served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018; JD Factors LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018; AGX Freight Carriers LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018; N Trucking LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018; WEX Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/27/2018; Wex Fleet One served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. BB Transport Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; CD Consortium Corporation served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; CJM Financial Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Express Freight Finance served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Financial Carrier Services Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Flame Trans Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; GP Transportation Co served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Great Plains Transportation Services Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; LG Way LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Link Transport Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; AMG Freight LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Advance Transportation Systems Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; All State Enterprise Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Logisticize LTD served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Nova Logistics Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; OTR Capital LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Partners Funding Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; RJ Express Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Riviera Finance served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; TBS Factoring Services LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Thomas Express Transport LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Trade Winds Transit Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Transrapid Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Tri-B Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Triple M Logistics Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Triumph Business Capital served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; USA Freight Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; WEX Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; X-Speed Transportation Inc served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Set Trans LLC.(Vegeler, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Owen Vegeler on behalf of Set Trans LLC (Vegeler, Robert)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Brown Logistics Inc served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Cascade Express Inc served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; GSH Trucking served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; INK Tranportation LLC served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; LMB Express Inc served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Libra Trucking LLC served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Midwest Express Inc served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Selly Logistics LLC served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Star Transportation PA Inc served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. Baxter Bailey & Associates served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Baxter Bailey & Associates served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Echo Express Inc served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Echo Trucking Inc served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Forsage Inc served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; IIK Transport Inc served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; JRV Logistics Inc served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Assist Financial Services Inc served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; MB Global Logistics Inc served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Ride Star Transport LLC served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. AB Lines Inc served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; All In Trucking Inc served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018; Triton Logistics Inc served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Cranley, Grace)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Cranley, Grace)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BB Transport Inc, Bantle Transport LLC, Baxter Bailey & Associates, Baxter Bailey & Associates, Bing Logistics Inc, Black Red White Inc, Brown Logistics Inc, CD Consortium Corporation, CJM Financial Inc, Cargo Solution Express, Cascade Express Inc, D&D Express Transport Corporation, DMN Transport Inc, Echo Express Inc, Echo Trucking Inc, Emmanuel Truck Express Co, Express Freight Finance, Financial Carrier Services Inc, Flame Trans Inc, Foley Business Capital, Forsage Inc, Four Towers Tranportation, GP Transportation Co, GPB Logistics LLC, GSH Trucking, GTS Transportation Corp, Great Plains Transporation Services Inc, Gulfstream Logistics Inc, IIK Transport Inc, INK Tranportation LLC, JD Factors LLC, JRV Logistics Inc, Kit Logistics, L&E Hauling Inc, LG Way LLC, LMB Express Inc, Libra Trucking LLC, Link Transport Inc, 800K LLC, A2B Cargo Inc, AB Lines Inc, AGX Freight Carriers LLC, AMG Freight LLC, Advance Transportation Systems Inc, All In Trucking Incorporated Inc, All State Enterprise Inc, Altex Logistics Inc, Assist Financial Services Inc, Logisticize LTD, MB Global Logistics Inc, MNS1 Epress Inc, Midwest Express Inc, Moldex Inc, Muzzy Corporation, N Trucking LLC, Nova Logistics Inc, OTR Capital LLC, OTR Capital LLCS, Partners Funding Inc, Pigeon Freight Services, RJ Express Inc, Relex Logistics Inc, Reliable Truck Lines Inc, Ride Star Transport LLC, Riveria Finance, Road Wolves Inc, Sam Houston Truck Lines LLC, Selly Logistics LLC, Set Trans LLC, Star Transportation PA Inc, TBS Factoring Services LLC, Taylor Truck Line Inc, Thomas Express Transport LLC, Thunder Funding, Trade Winds Transit Inc, Transit Core LLC, Transrapid Inc, Tri-B Inc, Triple M Logistics Inc, Triton Logistics Inc, Triumph Business Capital, USA Freight Inc, Utrans Logistics LLC, VS Express Inc, Volo Group Inc, WEX Inc, Wallace Factoring LLC, Wex Fleet One, Worldwide Carrier Inc, X-Speed Transportation Inc, Zipship Logistics LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
October 30, 2018 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jay Weber on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co (Weber, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Cranley, Grace)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Cranley, Grace)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3718377.), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cranley, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co v. 800K LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF REMY EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINK TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX FLEET ONE AS ASSIGNEE OF ACTION LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSIT CORE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAR TRANSPORTATION PA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD CONSORTIUM CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE OF PEREZ EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECHO TRUCKING INC
Represented By: John P Twohy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF GIC LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARGO SOLUTION EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSH TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BELA TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BING LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSRAPID INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBRA TRUCKING LLC
Represented By: Eugene Friedman PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS FACTORING SERVICE LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF J&M HAULING CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X-SPEED TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJ EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SET TRANS LLC
Represented By: Robert Owen Vegeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT PLAINS TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC AS ASSIGNEE OF KUEKER TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL IN TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIUMPH BUSINESS CAPITAL AS ASSIGNEE OF QUALITY WHEELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOLEY BUSINESS CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECHO EXPRESS INC
Represented By: John P Twohy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF AMG FREIGHT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A2B CARGO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRV LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANTLE TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIPSHIP LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR CAPITAL LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF G&I SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJM FINANCIAL INC AS ASSIGNEE OF LIDO TRANS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOLDEX INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTS TRANSPORTATION CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROAD WOLVES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMMANUEL TRUCK EXPRESS CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF J&M PRADO CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRI-B INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIABLE TRUCK LINES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIT LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS FACTORING SERVICE LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF EPO AND RPJ TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS EXPRESS TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&D EXPRESS TRANSPORT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF GTS TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNS1 EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP TRANSPORTATION CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA FREIGHT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVIERA FINANCE AS ASSIGNEE OF KG LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK RED WHITE INC
Represented By: Tomasz Koziol PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL STATE ENTERPRISE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASCADE EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCE TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&B TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIUMPH BUSINESS CAPITAL AS ASSIGNEE OF JETSET EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSIST FINANCIAL SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF SULTAN TRANS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOGISTICIZE LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD FACTORS LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF OVERLOG INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IIK TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINANCIAL CARRIER SERVICES INC AS ASSIGNEE OF DUBAI TRUCK LINES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF DMAX LINE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMN TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VS EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM HOUSTON TRUCKLINES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIPLE M LOGISTICS INC
Represented By: David L LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDE STAR TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARTNERS FUNDING INC AS ASSIGNEE OF GOLD STAR CARRIERS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGX FREIGHT CARRIERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMB EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&E HAULING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVA LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG WAY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 800K LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF BLUE STONE EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR TOWERS TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR CAPITAL LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF HINES TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELEX LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAME TRANS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GULFSTREAM LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR CAPITAL LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MAD EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF ROYAL LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRITON LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUZZY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG FREIGHT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLDWIDE CARRIER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INK TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MB GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS FACTORING SERVICE LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF ULTRANS LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIGEON FREIGHT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AB LINES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTEX LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF YUGO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALLACE FACTORING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF R&B TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVIERA FINANCE AS ASSIGNEE OF MIK CARRIER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLO GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BANTLE TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX INC AS ASSIGNEE OF US ATLANTIC EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTRANS LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRADE WINDS TRANSIT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORSAGE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR TRUCK LINE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS FREIGHT FINANCE AS ASSIGNEE OF FENIX EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THUNDER FUNDING AS ASSIGNEE OF E&E NATIONWIDE TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELLY LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX FLEET ONE AS ASSIGNEE OF ALL IN ONE LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARTNERS FUNDING INC AS ASSIGNEE OF AZE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR Capital LLCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INK Tranportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Funding Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riviera Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Freight Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Factors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJM Financial Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEX Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS Factoring Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wex Fleet One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Houston Truck Lines LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Business Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Factoring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Transportation Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Consortium Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Towers Tranportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Carrier Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurst Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kot Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&R Carrier Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Succardes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X-Press Freight Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Miller & Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 Star Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Co
Represented By: Grace Winkler Cranley
Represented By: Michael Jay Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Winkler Cranley
Represented By: Michael Jay Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?