Weaver v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Cheryl Weaver
Defendant: Speedway LLC and Speedway Gas Station
Case Number: 2:2019cv00041
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (smb)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2019 11:30 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/18/2019. (smb)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/5/2019. (smb)
January 28, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (nae)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Declaration of Service of Notice to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk) by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Record: Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; First Amended Complaint; Order dated December 27, 2018; CCS Entry Form dated November 26, 2018; Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case (Thomas L. Davis); Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Summons; Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate MPC Investment LLC for Speedway LLC.. (Davis, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Davis on behalf of Speedway LLC (Davis, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3792800.) from Lake County Superior Court, Cause No. 45D04-1807-CT-372, filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit : State Court Record: Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; First Amended Complaint; Order dated December 27, 2018; CCS Entry Form dated November 26, 2018; Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case (Thomas L. Davis); Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Summons; Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Thomas L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway Gas Station
Represented By: Thomas L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Weaver
Represented By: Robert A Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?