Jones v. Choice DNA Laboratories LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marsha Jones
Defendant: Choice DNA Laboratories LLC and Lawrence Reese
Case Number: 2:2019cv00047
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Marsha Jones.(Weldy, Ronald)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend and ORDERS the plaintiff to file her amended complaint, currently on the docket as an attachment to the instant motion, on or before April 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/29/19. (kjp)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Choice DNA Laboratories LLC, Lawrence Reese. (Shupp, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Marsha Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Amended Complaint)(Weldy, Ronald)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) filed by Marsha Jones. (Weldy, Ronald)
March 13, 2019 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Waiver of Service Deadline terminated. Waiver of Service has been filed on behalf of all defendants. (tlr)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) filed by Lawrence Reese, Choice DNA Laboratories LLC. (Shupp, Andrew)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) by Defendants Choice DNA Laboratories LLC, Lawrence Reese. (Shupp, Andrew)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/13/2019. (tc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawrence Reese, Choice DNA Laboratories LLC. All Defendants. (Shupp, Andrew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T Shupp on behalf of All Defendants (Shupp, Andrew)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Choice DNA Laboratories, LLC and Lawrence Reese. Waiver of Service due by 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Order) (mlc)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. DEFERS payment of the filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case; and (4) DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the Clerk and the United States MarshalsService to issue and serve process on Choice DNA Laboratories, LLC c/o Lawrence Reese as Registered Agent at 6111 Harrison Street, Suite 125, Merrillville, IN, 46410, and on Lawrence Reese at 6111 Harrison Street, Suite 125, Merrillville, IN, 46410. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 2/7/19. (mlc)
January 29, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added (NEW CASE - IFP MOTION PENDING). (ksc)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 2 copies of summons forms and by Plaintiff MARSHA JONES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Forma Pauperis)(Weldy, Ronald)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Weldy on behalf of MARSHA JONES (Weldy, Ronald)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by MARSHA JONES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Weldy, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Choice DNA Laboratories LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Jones
Represented By: Ronald E Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice DNA Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Andrew T Shupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Reese
Represented By: Andrew T Shupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?