Montgomery, Jr. v. SMS Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michael Montgomery, Jr.
Defendant: Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc., SMS Group, Inc. f/k/a Pro-Eco, Aeromet Industries Inc, SMS Group Inc, Altra Industrial Motion Corporation, Automation International Inc, Chicago Steel (IN) LLC, Esmark Steel Group LLC, Midwest Dynamic Automation Inc, Chicago Steel Inc, Lex Central and Steen Machinery Services Inc
Petitioner: Property & Casualty Insurance Company of the Hartford
Case Number: 2:2019cv00054
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Property & Casualty Insurance Company of the Hartford. Party Property & Casualty Insurance Company of the Hartford terminated. Attorney John M DeCastro terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/4/19. (kjp)
April 3, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying as moot #17 Emergency Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery, for Identification of Any Additional Parties, and for Premises Inspection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/1/2019. (rmc)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Court GRANTS #56 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Altra Industrial Motion Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by 4/17/2019. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/29/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #22 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Altra Industrial Motion Corporation. (Baker, Alexander)
March 29, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J Baker on behalf of Altra Industrial Motion Corporation (Baker, Alexander)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Court GRANTS #53 First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant Automation International, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by 4/29/2019. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/29/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 53 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #22 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Automation International Inc. (Zehe, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R Zehe on behalf of Automation International Inc (Zehe, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Court GRANTS #49 Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Aeromet Industries Inc to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint by 4/26/2019. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/29/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aeromet Industries Inc. (Wenzl, Peter)
March 29, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Aeromet Industries Inc. (Wenzl, Peter)
March 29, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G Wenzl on behalf of Aeromet Industries Inc (Wenzl, Peter)
March 27, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support of #46 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by SMS Group Inc. (Bullaro, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant SMS Group Inc. (Bullaro, John)
March 22, 2019 Filing 45 STATUS REPORT To The Court by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. Steen Machinery Services Inc served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. Lex Central served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. Esmark Steel Group LLC served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. Chicago Steel (IN) LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. Chicago Steel Inc served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. Automation International Inc served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. Altra Industrial Motion Corporation served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. Aeromet Industries Inc served on 3/9/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2019 Filing 36 BRIEF in Support of #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc.. (Cox, Dina)
March 20, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc.. (Cox, Dina)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff DIRECTED to file a status report by 3/22/2019 regarding the pending #17 Emergency Motion to Compel Expedited Discovery, for Identification of Any Additional Parties, and for Premises Inspection. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/11/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER, granting #16 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/11/19. (kjp)
March 7, 2019 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Aeromet Industries Inc, Altra Industrial Motion Corporation, Automation International Inc, Chicago Steel (IN) LLC, Chicago Steel Inc, Esmark Steel Group LLC, Lex Central, Midwest Dynamic Automation Inc, Steen Machinery Services Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 6, 2019 Filing 31 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 28 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 27 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 26 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 24 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 23 Proposed Summons filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc., SMS Group Inc, filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons)(Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Michael Montgomery, Jr. of filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (Wrage, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc.. (Cox, Dina)
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc.. (Cox, Dina)
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE Local Rule 37.1 Certification. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery, for Identification of Any Additional Parties, and for Premises Inspection by Plaintiff Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Wrage, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Protective Order)(Wrage, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Court GRANTS #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant SMS Group Inc to answer or otherwise respond by 3/5/2019. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/13/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant SMS Group Inc. (Bullaro, John)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by SMS Group Inc for Jury Request/Demand (Bullaro, John)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Bullaro, Jr on behalf of SMS Group Inc (Bullaro, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Property & Casualty Insurance Company of the Hartford. (DeCastro, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Michael Montgomery, Jr.. (Wrage, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew D Jacobson PHV for Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/7/2019. (mtr)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/7/2019. (tc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Attorney Matthew D. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andritz Herr Voss Stamco Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3802423 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Iowa, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
February 6, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE and MOTION PENDING (kjp)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Celia M Pauli on behalf of Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc. (Pauli, Celia)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3800846.) from Lake County Superior Court 6, Cause No. 45D10-1812-CT-000947, filed by Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B- Removal Consent)(Cox, Dina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery, Jr. v. SMS Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andritz Herr-Voss Stamco, Inc.
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: Celia M Pauli
Represented By: Matthew D Jacobson PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Group, Inc. f/k/a Pro-Eco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeromet Industries Inc
Represented By: Peter G Wenzl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Group Inc
Represented By: John J Bullaro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altra Industrial Motion Corporation
Represented By: Alexander J Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automation International Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey R Zehe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Steel (IN) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esmark Steel Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Dynamic Automation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Steel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lex Central
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steen Machinery Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Montgomery, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Wrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Property & Casualty Insurance Company of the Hartford
Represented By: John M DeCastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?