DeNardo v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Scott DeNardo
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00066
Filed: February 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information ; Unavailability; and Probate Court Filing (De Nardo, Scott)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott DeNardo. United States of America served on 2/25/2018, answer due 4/26/2018. (De Nardo, Scott)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (sct) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Corrected Summons) (sct).
February 19, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
February 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against United States of America( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3811686.), filed by Scott DeNardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons re AG Barr, #3 Proposed Summons Summons re USA Kirsch)(De Nardo, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeNardo v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott DeNardo
Represented By: Scott M De Nardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?