Palmer v Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY A PALMER
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00110
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 7-3, the claimant/plaintiff is directed to file his/her opening brief by the deadline set out below. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Briefs under this rule are subject to the page limitations in Local Rule 7-1(e). The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 8/9/2019. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 9/20/2019. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/28/2019. (rs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD TIMOTHY PALMER by Commissioner of Social Security. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo R Montenegro on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Montenegro, Leo)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals Service obo Timothy A. Palmer. U.S. Attorney General Served on 4/29/19. (rmf)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals Service obo Timothy A. Palmer. Office of the Regional Counsel served on 4/29/19. (rmf)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals Service obo Timothy A. Palmer. U.S. Attorney served on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (rmf)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (mlc)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service are DIRECTED to effect service of process on the Defendant. (cc: USMS) Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 4/18/19. (mlc)
March 21, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann added. (NEW CASE; IFP MOTION PENDING) (lns)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff TIMOTHY A PALMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USM 285, #2 Proposed Summons SUMMONSES)(Schultis, Angelica)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by TIMOTHY A PALMER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Proposed Summons SUMMONSES, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Schultis, Angelica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Leo R Montenegro
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY A PALMER
Represented By: Angelica Catherine Schultis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?