Flores v. RK Trailer Repair, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Demetrio J Flores
Defendant: FCS Industries, Inc. and RK Trailer Repair, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00114
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by Demetrio J Flores. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Company Policy and Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Employee Acknowledgement, Indemnification and Hold Harmless Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Employment, Non-Compete, Confidentiality and Indemnification Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Charge of Discrimination 8-16-2018, #6 Exhibit E - Charge of Discrimination 12-31-2018, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Right to Sue (Issued on Request), #8 Exhibit G - Rules and Guidelines for the Administration of the Arbitration Proceeding)(Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Defendants FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Court GRANTS #19 Uncontested Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. The appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Wells Skaggs is hereby WITHDRAWN. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/14/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Order)(Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen)
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/10/2019, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Nathaniel Hubley. Dfts appeared by atty Maureen Rouse-Ayoub. Defendant to file motion to compel arbitration by 5/17/2019. Response to be filed by 6/14/2019. Reply to be filed by 7/3/2019. Discovery deadlines will be set after a ruling on the motion. (tc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen P Rouse-Ayoub on behalf of All Defendants (Rouse-Ayoub, Maureen)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Clerk is hereby directed to reassign this case from Judge Joseph S. Van Bokkelen to Chief Judge Theresa L. Springmann as the presider for all further proceedings. This order does not change the assignment of the Magistrate Judge or any previously scheduled deadlines, hearings or trial dates. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2019. (jss)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Court GRANTS #13 Motion to Appear Telephonically for Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2019 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) will be held telephonically for ALL PARTIES. Plaintiff to initiate the call. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/24/2019. Text entry only. (tc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Demetrio J Flores. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/14/2019. (tc)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2019 10:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/23/2019. (tc)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/23/2019. (tc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc..(Skaggs, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Wells Skaggs on behalf of FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc. (Skaggs, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetrio J Flores. RK Trailer Repair, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetrio J Flores. FCS Industries, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FCS Industries, Inc., RK Trailer Repair, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
March 25, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (New Case) (sct)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel M Reinking on behalf of Demetrio J Flores (Reinking, Nathaniel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Theisen on behalf of Demetrio J Flores (Theisen, John)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel O Hubley on behalf of Demetrio J Flores (Hubley, Nathaniel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3844121.), filed by Demetrio J Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Work Restriction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dr. Snyder release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Right to Sue, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons Summons FCS, #7 Proposed Summons Summons RK Trailer)(Hubley, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. RK Trailer Repair, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCS Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Maureen P Rouse-Ayoub
Represented By: Elizabeth Wells Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK Trailer Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Maureen P Rouse-Ayoub
Represented By: Elizabeth Wells Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrio J Flores
Represented By: Nathaniel O Hubley
Represented By: Nathaniel M Reinking
Represented By: John C Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?