Berger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian Joseph Berger
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00119
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY OPENING BRIEF by Brian Joseph Berger. (Schultis, Angelica)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill S Reeder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Reeder, Jill)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 7-3, the claimant/plaintiff is directed to file his/her opening brief by the deadline set out below. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Briefs under this rule are subject to the page limitations in Local Rule 7-1(e). The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 7/10/2019. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 8/21/2019. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 9/4/2019. Text entry order by Judge William C Lee on 5/29/2019. (lns)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD BRIAN BERGER by Commissioner of Social Security. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service US Attorney Served on 3/25/19, answer due 5/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Schultis, Angelica)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (sct)
March 26, 2019 Judge William C Lee added. (New Case) (sct)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3845804.), filed by Brian Joseph Berger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Proposed Summons PROPOSED SUMMONSES)(Schultis, Angelica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Joseph Berger
Represented By: Angelica Catherine Schultis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jill S Reeder
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?