International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO v. Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO and Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO
Defendant: Graycor Industrial Constructors, Inc. an Illinois corporation and Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00156
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held 8/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty Charles Kiser in person. Dft appeared by atty Michael Furlong teleph. All dates/ddl in joint report filed at #12 through close of discovery are approved as modified. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 12/20/2019 by Pla, and 1/10/2020 be defense. Fact Discovery deadline is 2/1/2020. No Expert Discovery anticipated. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 8/9/2019. The summary judgment ddl per FRCP 56 shall not apply. All other dates/ddl to be set by the presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 8/22/2019. (#FTR.) (smb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Furlong, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT - ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc.(Furlong, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2019 09:45 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/21/2019. (smb)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/21/2019. (smb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc identifying Corporate Parent Graycor, Inc. for Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc.. (Furlong, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Answer due 6/27/2019 pursuant to #6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer. (sct) Modified on 5/30/2019 (sct). Modified on 5/30/2019 (rs).
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc ; answer due by June 27, 2019. (Furlong, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael V Furlong on behalf of Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc (Furlong, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO. Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Kiser, Charles)
May 7, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann added. Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen no longer assigned to case as per chambers. (sct)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
May 2, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R Kiser on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO (Kiser, Charles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Graycor Industrial Constructors, Inc. an Illinois corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3880118.), filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Kiser, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO v. Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Charles R Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 150 International Union of Operating Engineers AFL-CIO
Represented By: Charles R Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graycor Industrial Constructors, Inc. an Illinois corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graycor Industrial Constructors Inc
Represented By: Michael V Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?