Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the et al v. Actin Inc et al
Plaintiff: Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the and No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the
Defendant: Actin Contracting Limited Liability Company, Actin Inc and Actin
Case Number: 2:2019cv00183
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Actin Inc and Actin Contracting LLC filed by No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 2-A)(Massa, Teresa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Actin Inc and Actin Contracting LLC by Plaintiffs No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the. (Massa, Teresa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Actin Inc.* regarding #10 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default, filed by No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the (ksp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the as to Actin, Inc.. (Massa, Teresa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Actin Contracting LLC* regarding #8 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default, filed by No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the (mlc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the as to Actin Contracting LLC. (Massa, Teresa)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the. Actin Inc served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Massa, Teresa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actin Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the. (Massa, Teresa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the, No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the, Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the. Actin Contracting Limited Liability Company served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Massa, Teresa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Actin Contracting Limited Liability Company, Actin Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lns)
May 16, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (lns)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa A Massa on behalf of Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union No 142 Pension Fund (Massa, Teresa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actin Contracting Limited Liability Company, Actin Inc( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3893292.), filed by Trustees of the Teamsters Union No 142 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Teamsters Union Local No 142 Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Massa, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the et al v. Actin Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actin Contracting Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No 142 Teamsters Union Training and Apprenticeship Trust Fund Trustees of the
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No 142 Teamsters Union Annuity Fund Trustees of the
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No 142 Teamsters Union Pension Fund Trustees of the
Represented By: Teresa A Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?