Barrett et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: TAMARA BARRETT and JON BARRETT
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00287
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cox, Dina)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRC: 26(f) due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/6/2019. (smb)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/20/2019. (smb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Cox, Dina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Neal Bowling on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Bowling, Joseph)
August 13, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (mlc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Cox, Dina)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Cox, Dina)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3974842.) from Porter County Superior Court, Cause No. 64D02-1907-CT-006325, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Record (Docket, Appearance, Summons, Complaint, Appearance, Notice of Initial Enlargement of Time, Motion to Change Judge, and Order on Motion to Change Judge))(Cox, Dina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA BARRETT
Represented By: C Anthony Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON BARRETT
Represented By: C Anthony Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Dina M Cox
Represented By: Joseph Neal Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?