Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters et al v. Stallion Flooring LLC
Plaintiff: United Brotherhood of Carpenters Apprenticeship Training Fund of North America, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Trust Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Greg Hauswald, Douglas J McCarron, Todd Pancake, William Nix and Joe Coar
Defendant: STALLION FLOORING LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00310
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that this action is hereby STAYED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to MARK this action CLOSED for statistical purposes. The Court further ORDERS that the Court shall retain jurisdiction and that the case shall be restored to the trial docket upon motion of a party if circumstances change. This Order shall not prejudice the rights of the parties to this litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/8/2019. (rmc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by Stallion Flooring LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lori)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Stallion Flooring LLC answer due 10/22/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/30/2019. (cp)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Moss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moss, Thomas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T Berkowitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berkowitz, Paul)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Stallion Flooring LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lori)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori D Fisher on behalf of Stallion Flooring LLC (Fisher, Lori)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Pancake, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Douglas J McCarron, William Nix, Joe Coar, Greg Hauswald. Stallion Flooring LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Berkowitz, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to STALLION FLOORING LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
August 20, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STALLION FLOORING LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3982119.), filed by Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Trust Fund, United Brotherhood of Carpenters Apprenticeship Training Fund of North America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berkowitz, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters et al v. Stallion Flooring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Brotherhood of Carpenters Apprenticeship Training Fund of North America
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Hauswald
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas J McCarron
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Pancake
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Nix
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Coar
Represented By: Paul T Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas E Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STALLION FLOORING LLC
Represented By: Lori D Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?