Zermeno v Easterbrook
Plaintiff: Eric Zermeno
Defendant: Steve Easterbrook
Case Number: 2:2019cv00312
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Remark: Copy of Order and Judgment given to Plaintiff at CSO desk. (shk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy could not be mailed to pro se plaintiff as he did not leave a forwarding address; courtesy copy in clerk's office for plaintiff to pick up) (jat)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court DENIES the in forma pauperis motion #2 , DISMISSES the case as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and CAUTIONS Eric Zermeno that, if he files another frivolous lawsuit, he may be fined, sanctioned, or restricted. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 08/23/2019. (Copy could not be mailed to pro se plaintiff as he did not leave a forwarding address; courtesy copy in clerk's office for plaintiff to pick up) (jat)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eric Zermeno. (jat)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Steve Easterbrook, filed by Eric Zermeno. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM-285) (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zermeno v Easterbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Zermeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Easterbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?