Gilman Jr v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Glenn W Gilman Jr
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00315
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Glenn W Gilman Jr. US Attorney served on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (shk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (Copy to USM). (nal)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court WAIVES payment of the filing fee and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 8/23/19. (Copy to USM). (nal)
August 21, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady added. NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING. (nal)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Glenn W Gilman Jr. (Schultz, Barry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A Schultz on behalf of Glenn W Gilman Jr (Schultz, Barry)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Glenn W Gilman Jr. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 USM forms)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilman Jr v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn W Gilman Jr
Represented By: Barry A Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?