Dominguez v. Menard Inc
Plaintiff: Hilda Dominguez
Defendant: Menard Inc dba Menards and Menard, Inc
Not Classified By Court: Galen A. Bradley
Case Number: 2:2019cv00331
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Fact Discovery deadline is 6/17/2020. Mediation to be completed and report filed by 9/28/2020. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 11/16/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 1/15/2021. Rule 26(a)(2) supplements due by 2/12/2021. Expert Discovery deadline is 3/5/2021. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/12/2020. No pdf attached. (sa)
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Extend Deadlines (Unopposed) by Defendant Menard, Inc. (Politakis, Angelo)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelo P Politakis on behalf of Menard, Inc (Politakis, Angelo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held 10/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty Burton Padove teleph. Dft appeared by atty Renee Mortimer in person. Parties' Joint Report at #11 is approved as modified. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 12/30/2019. Fact Discovery deadline is 2/17/2020. Expert Discovery deadline is 11/6/2020 Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 6/15/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 8/15/2020. R26(e) supplements due by 10/15/2020. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/18/2019. Mediator Selection Deadline is 1/10/2020. Mediation to be completed and report filed by 5/30/2020. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 11/14/2019. The summary judgment ddl per FRCP 56 shall not apply. All other dates/ddl to be set by the presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. (#FTR.) (smb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Mediator by Plaintiff Hilda Dominguez. (Padove, Burton) Modified on 10/28/2019 to show Galen Bradley as Mediator. (nal)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/CHANGE IN TIME OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 10/24/2019 is ORDERED RESET to 09:15 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Text entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/17/2019. (smb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mortimer, Renee)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Jury Demand by Menard, Inc.(Mortimer, Renee)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Mortimer, Renee)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2019 11:30 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/17/2019. (smb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/17/2019. (smb)
September 5, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. *NEW CASE* (jss)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Menard Inc dba Menards ; answer due by October 8, 2019. (Mortimer, Renee)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Menard Inc dba Menards. (Mortimer, Renee)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of Menard Inc dba Menards (Mortimer, Renee)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3995724.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D02-1906-CT-000597, filed by Menard Inc dba Menards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez v. Menard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard Inc dba Menards
Represented By: Renee J Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc
Represented By: Renee J Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Dominguez
Represented By: Burton A Padove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Galen A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?