Abyssinian Outreach Ministries v. Lake County Treasurer/Auditor
Plaintiff: Abyssinian Outreach Ministries
Defendant: Lake County Treasurer/Auditor
Case Number: 2:2019cv00334
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Ostojic on behalf of Lake County Treasurer/Auditor (Ostojic, Ronald)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy H Wyllie on behalf of Lake County Treasurer/Auditor (Wyllie, Randy)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Abyssinian Outreach Ministries has up to and including 11/26/2019 to obtain an attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/29/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jat)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to Lake County Treasurer/Auditor. (rmf)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lake County Treasurer/Auditor. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Mailed to pro se party via Certified Mail, receipt # 7018 1830 0001 3190 5555) (jat)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 2019294. (jat)
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Filing fee to be paid by 10/17/2019. (ksp)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Abyssinian Outreach Ministries is GRANTED until October 17, 2019, to pay the $400 filing fee. If the fee is not paid by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice for non-payment of the filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/11/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Abyssinian Outreach Ministries. (shk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copy of summons form and 1 copy of USM-285 form against Lake County Treasurer/Auditor, filed by Abyssinian Outreach Ministries. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Request for Injuction, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 USM 285, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Attachments) (shk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abyssinian Outreach Ministries v. Lake County Treasurer/Auditor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Treasurer/Auditor
Represented By: Randy H Wyllie
Represented By: Ronald Ostojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abyssinian Outreach Ministries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?