Dobson v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Melinda Dobson
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00356
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Joint Stipulation for Transfer of Venue DE #14 and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/31/19. (nal)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Transfer of Venue by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Nemechek PHV, Kathleen)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathleen M Nemechek PHV for Ford Motor Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/21/2019. (ace)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Application for Attorney Kathleen M. Nemechek to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4039954(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/17/2019. (tc)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Tiffani Orange)(Wilson, Heather)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Wilson, Heather)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Wilson, Heather)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L Wilson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Wilson, Heather)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A Rulon on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Rulon, Jennifer)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melinda Dobson. Ford Motor Company served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zamudio, Daniel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
September 23, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie Rae DeHaan on behalf of Melinda Dobson (DeHaan, Christie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Zamudio on behalf of Melinda Dobson (Zamudio, Daniel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ford Motor Company( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4013996.), filed by Melinda Dobson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Zamudio, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobson v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Dobson
Represented By: Christie Rae DeHaan
Represented By: Daniel Zamudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?