Norman v. Express Employment
Plaintiff: Lasandra Norman
Defendant: Express Employment
Case Number: 2:2019cv00372
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS/SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 11/14/2019, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared in person pro se. Dft appeared by atty John Drake. Pltf advised of requirement to file complaint with EEOC. Pltf states she does not have a right to sue letter. Court advises the case is premature and this court does not have jurisdiction. Pltf requests additional time to obtain a right to sue letter. Dft requests to proceed with a settlement conference. Settlement conference conducted. Settlement negotiations resulted in a settlement. Settlement terms memorialized of record and include confidentiality clause. Dismissal Papers due by 12/16/2019. The #9 Motion for Emergency hearing is terminated. cc: Norman (Tape #FTR GOLD.) (tc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 EMERGENCY MOTION for filed by Express Employment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order from 7th Circuit Court of Appeals)(Drake, John)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: In Person Status Conference set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Approved by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/8/2019. Text entry order. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(tc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for EMERGENCY hearing due to being retaliated against for filing suit by Plaintiff Lasandra Norman. (rmf)
November 5, 2019 ***Waiver of Service Deadline terminated. (nal)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/5/2019. cc: Norman (tc)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Express Employment. Express Employment waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Drake, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Employment. (Drake, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Drake on behalf of Express Employment (Drake, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Express Employment. (Copy mailed to defendant). Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint). (nal)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee, ORDERS the Plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery that is received in this case and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the Clerk of Court and the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/9/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lasandra Norman. (jat)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copy of summons form and 1 copy of USM-285 form against Express Employment, filed by Lasandra Norman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285) (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Express Employment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Employment
Represented By: John A Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasandra Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?