United States of America v. Heirs and Devisees of Dorothy A Fidnarik, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF DORTHY A. FIDNARIK, DECEASED; and TIFFANY DERR-DIAZ, Heirs and Devisees of Dorothy A Fidnarik and Tiffany Derr-Diaz
Case Number: 2:2019cv00380
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion for Service by Publication #5 and ORDERS that Defendants Tiffany Derr-Diaz and Heirs and Devisees of Dorothy A. Fidnarik, deceased, are hereby directed to appear, plead, answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint herein, on or before 28 days from the last date of publication, or be in default thereof, and this Court will thereafter proceed in the adjudication of this suit. The Court further ORDERS that this Order be published in a newspaper of general circulation in Porter County, Indiana, once a week for six (6) consecutive weeks, beginning no laterthan 28 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/28/2019. (shk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR - REFILED AS DE #5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) Modified on 10/25/2019 (shk).
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Tiffany Derr-Diaz. (rmf)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tiffany Derr-Diaz. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
October 8, 2019 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (jat)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 IN REM COMPLAINT against HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF DORTHY A. FIDNARIK, DECEASED; and TIFFANY DERR-DIAZ, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) Modified dkt text on 10/9/2019 (kjp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Heirs and Devisees of Dorothy A Fidnarik, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF DORTHY A. FIDNARIK, DECEASED; and TIFFANY DERR-DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Devisees of Dorothy A Fidnarik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Derr-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?