United States of America v. Heirs and Devisees of Barbara C. Mezydlo, Deceased, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF BARBARA C. MEZYDLO, DECEASED; and KENNETH MEZYDLO, Kenneth Mezydlo and Heirs and Devisees of
Case Number: 2:2019cv00381
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Service by Publication. The Court ORDERS that Defendants Heirs and Devisees of Barbara Mezydlo, Deceased are hereby directed to appear, plead, answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint herein, on or before 28 days from the last date of publication, or be in default thereof, and this court will thereafter proceed in adjudication of this suit. The court further ORDERS that this Order be published in a newspaper of general circulation in Porter County, Indiana, once a week for six (6) consecutive weeks, beginning no later than 28 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/20/19. (ksp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed obo United States of America. Kenneth Mezydlo served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (shk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #1 Document with Added Remarks) (rmf).
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Mezydlo. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
October 8, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF BARBARA C. MEZYDLO, DECEASED; and KENNETH MEZYDLO, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Heirs and Devisees of Barbara C. Mezydlo, Deceased, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF BARBARA C. MEZYDLO, DECEASED; and KENNETH MEZYDLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Mezydlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Devisees of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?