Nickson v. United States Steel Corporation
Plaintiff: Eriek Z. Nickson
Defendant: United States Steel Corp. and United States Steel Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00492
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Court GRANTS #13 Joint Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:45 AM will be held telephonically for ALL PARTIES. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Kolar's Case Manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours prior to the conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/20/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by Eriek Z. Nickson re #9 Order,, Set Hearings, (Bodensteiner, Ivan) Modified on 2/20/2020 to reflect document is a motion (tc).
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bodensteiner, Ivan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States Steel Corporation.(Austgen, Terence)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/6/2020. (tc)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 10:45 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/14/2020. (tc)
January 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #7 Agreed Notice, United States Steel Corp answer due 2/21/2020. (nae)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eriek Z. Nickson. All Defendants. (Bodensteiner, Ivan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by United States Steel Corp. ; answer due by 2/21/2020. (Austgen, Terence)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/13/2020. (tc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Steel Corp.. (Austgen, Terence)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M Bezak on behalf of United States Steel Corp. (Bezak, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Terence M Austgen on behalf of United States Steel Corp. (Austgen, Terence)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Steel Corp.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
December 27, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States Steel Corp.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4101051.), filed by Eriek Z. Nickson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bodensteiner, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nickson v. United States Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eriek Z. Nickson
Represented By: Ivan E Bodensteiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth M Bezak
Represented By: Terence M Austgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?