Strezovski v. CR England Inc
Plaintiff: James Strezovski
Defendant: CR England Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00498
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2020 01:45 PM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 3/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/5/2020. (smb)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/5/2020. (smb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by CR England Inc.(Johnston, Haley)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court DENIES without prejudice the request in the Plaintiffs Complaint for a preliminary injunction. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to refile the request for a preliminary injunction or temporary restraining order in compliance with Northern District of Indiana Local Rule 65-1 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 1/2/2020. (shk)
December 30, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE (kjp)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley A Johnston on behalf of CR England Inc (Johnston, Haley)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk by CR England Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal (state court))(Riegner, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CR England Inc. (Riegner, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A Riegner on behalf of CR England Inc (Riegner, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4102038.) from Porter County Circuit Court, Cause No. 64D01-1911-PL-010670, filed by CR England Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record: Complaint, Summons, Appearance of C. Jorgensen; Appearance of E. Riegner and H. Johnston; Motion for Enlargement of Time; Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riegner, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strezovski v. CR England Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR England Inc
Represented By: Haley A Johnston
Represented By: Eric A Riegner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Strezovski
Represented By: Christian J Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?