IMO 2019 Attorney Mass Suspension
In Re: Danuta B. Panich, Kenneth L. Sales, Scott J. Lennox, Bruce L. McSpadden, Jill R. Bodensteiner, Karen C. Turner, Failure to Comply With Continuing Legal Education Requirements, Nonpayment of Attorney Registration Fees, and/or Failure to Submit IOLTA Certification re Indiana Supreme Court Order of June 4, 2019, David Irmscher, Jo Ellen Platt, Carmen A. Fernandez, James A. Bax, Robert D. Kuzman, Jordan K. Baker, Susan Gunty, Stephen E. Elsner, Jonathan M. Davis, Michael J. Meyer, Philip T. King, Heather E. Rochet, Jon L. Praed, Julie A. Dominiack, Keirian A. Brown, Brian D. Scott, Benjamin Anderson, Raymond W. Campbell, Cherry Malichi, Dustin J. Aponte, Mary C Giles, Allen M. Reece, Charles A. Walton, Jr., Gregory G. Laux, Evan C. McMullen, Margaret Helen Wade Arter, Ronald J. Thoreson, Patrick B. Blankenship, Kerry M Hultquist, Ayoade P. Adewopo, Nathan E. Curtis, Michael C. Cook, Shannon M. Hayes, Marc A. Topoleski, Brian J. Stephenson, Larry W. Rogers, Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso, Michael G. Mangarelli, Michael Armey, Patricia A. Jones, Deneal M. Kushner, John J. Frese, Ann E. Rybolt, Stephanie J. Fairfield, Clinton A. Paul, Jr., Kevin B. Connor, James L. Liggins, Jr., Peter L. Brooks and Robert E. Reed
Case Number: 2:2019mc00090
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous Case
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 32 Mail Returned from Shannon Marie Hayes as Undeliverable - #26 Order Imposing Disciplinary Action. (rmf)
September 18, 2019 Filing 31 Mail Returned from Michael Armey as Undeliverable - Not Deliverable as Addressed - #26 Order Imposing Disciplinary Action. (nal)
September 18, 2019 Filing 30 Mail Returned from Charles A. Walton, Jr. as Undeliverable - Not Deliverable as Addressed - #26 Order Imposing Disciplinary Action. (nal)
September 16, 2019 Filing 29 Remark: Received Order back with note stating Ronald J Thoreson no longer works at Garan Lucow Miller Law Firm. (rmf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 Remark: Copy of Order to Show Cause #2 resent to Attorney Cherry Malichi at Stewart & Stewart, 931 S. Rangeline Rd., Carmel, IN 46032. (shk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 27 Mail Returned from Larry W Rogers as Not Deliverable, Unable to Forward - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER IMPOSING DISCIPLINARY ACTION: The following attorneys suspended by the Indiana Supreme Court on July 4, 2019, who have failed to respond to this Court's July 25, 2019, order with a showing of good cause why their reciprocal suspension here is not warranted, are suspended from the practice of law before the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana: Ayoade Opeyemi Adewopo; Suzanne Marie Alton de Eraso; Benjamin Alexander Anderson; Dustin Joshua Aponte; Michael Edward Armey; Margaret Helen Wade Arter; Jordan Keith Baker; James Anthony Bax; Patrick Blaine Blankenship; Jill Renee Bodensteiner; Peter Lawrence Brooks; Keirian Antares Brown; Raymond Willis Campbell; Kevin B. Connor; Michael Carl Cook; Nathan Edward Curtis; Jonathan Michael Davis; Julie Ann Dominiack; Stephen Edward Elsner; Stephanie Joanne Fairfield; Carmen Alida Fernandez; John Jerome Frese; Mary Colleen Giles; Susan Gunty; Shannon Marie Hayes; Kerry Michael Hultquist; David Park Irmscher; Patricia Ann Jones; Philip Theodore King; Deneal Michaels Kushner;Robert Daniel Kuzman; Gregory Gilbert Laux; Scott Joseph Lennox; James L. Liggins, Jr.; Cherry Malichi; Michael George Mangarelli; Evan Charles McMullen;Bruce Lynn McSpadden; Danuta Bembenista Panich; Clinton Allen Paul, Jr.; Jo Ellen Platt; Jon Linden Praed; Allen Michael Reece; Robert Earl Reed; Heather Elizabeth Rochet; Larry William Rogers; Kenneth Lawrence Sales; Brian Dean Scott; Brian Joseph Stephenson; Ronald Joseph Thoreson; Marc Anthony Topoleski; Karen Calhoun Turner; Charles A. Walton, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 09/10/2019. (cc: all listed attorneys)(rk)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER regarding attorney Ann Elizabeth Rybolt. This case is dismissed as to Respondent Ann Elizabeth Rybolt, only, with no disciplinary action taken. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 09/10/2019. (rk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 Mail Returned from Jonathan M Davis as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 Mail Returned from Jon L Praed as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (jat)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 Mail Returned from Jordan K Baker as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (rmf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 Mail Returned from Kenneth L Sales as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (jat)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 Mail Returned from Heather E. Rochet as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (nal)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned from Julie A Dominiack as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (jat)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 Mail Returned from Brian J. Stephenson as Attempted Not Known Unable to Forward re: #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned from Brian J Stephenson as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (rmf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 Mail Returned from Shannon Marie Hayes as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (rmf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Mail Returned from Scott J. Lennox as Undeliverable - Unable to Forward - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (nal)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned from Jon L. Praed as Return to Sender, Forwarding Time Expired re: #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. Mail resent to P.O. Box 100413, Arlington, VA 22210-3413. (shk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned from Ann Rybolt as Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed re: #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned from James A Bax as Return to Sender, Attempted Not Known re: #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned from Karen Calhoun Turner as Return to Sender, Insufficient Address re: #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned from Marc A Topoleski as Undeliverable - #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (rmf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned from Michael E Armey as Return to Sender, No Mail Receptacle re: #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned from Cherry Malichi as Undeliverable - No longer employed by OAG #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (rmf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned from Scott J. Lennox as Moved Left No Address Unable to Forward re: #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned from Charles A Walton, Jr as Return to Sender, No Such Number re: #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned from Stephanie J Fairfield as Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward re #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned from Robert E Reed as Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward re #2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (shk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned from Carmen A. Fernandez as Undeliverable - Forward Time Exp - #2 Order to Show Cause. Order resent to 631 River Dr, Porter, IN 46304-1420. (nal)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #1 Order from Indiana Supreme Court dated June 4, 2019, IMO Failure to Comply With Continuing Legal Education Requirements, Nonpayment of Attorney Registration Fees, and/or Failure to Submit IOLTA Certification, regarding each listed respondent-attorney. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-6.8(b), the Court gives each listed respondent-attorney thirty (30) days after service of this Order to Show Cause why the imposition of identical discipline by this Court would be unwarranted. The Clerk shall provide a copy of this Order to each respondent-attorney, in accordance with N.D. Ind. L. R. 83-6.12. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/25/2019. (cc each listed respondent-attorney via first class mail) (rk)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER dated 06/04/2019 from Indiana Supreme Court of SUSPENSION of Certain Attorneys for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements, Nonpayment of Attorney Registration Fees, and/or Failure to Submit IOLTA Certification. Signed by Loretta H. Rush, Chief Justice of Indiana. All Justices concur. (rk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMO 2019 Attorney Mass Suspension
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Danuta B. Panich
Represented By: Danuta B Panich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Kenneth L Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Scott J. Lennox
Represented By: Scott J Lennox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bruce L. McSpadden
Represented By: Bruce L McSpadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Jill R. Bodensteiner
Represented By: Jill R Bodensteiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Karen C. Turner
Represented By: Karen Calhoun Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Failure to Comply With Continuing Legal Education Requirements, Nonpayment of Attorney Registration Fees, and/or Failure to Submit IOLTA Certification re Indiana Supreme Court Order of June 4, 2019
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: David Irmscher
Represented By: David P Irmscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Jo Ellen Platt
Represented By: Jo E Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Carmen A. Fernandez
Represented By: Carmen A Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: James A. Bax
Represented By: James A Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Robert D. Kuzman
Represented By: Robert D Kuzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Jordan K. Baker
Represented By: Jordan K Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Susan Gunty
Represented By: Susan Gunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Stephen E. Elsner
Represented By: Stephen E Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Jonathan M. Davis
Represented By: Jonathan M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Michael J. Meyer
Represented By: Michael J Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Philip T. King
Represented By: Philip T King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Heather E. Rochet
Represented By: Heather E Rochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Jon L. Praed
Represented By: Jon L Praed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Julie A. Dominiack
Represented By: Julie A Dominiack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Keirian A. Brown
Represented By: Keirian A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Brian D. Scott
Represented By: Brian D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Benjamin Anderson
Represented By: Benjamin A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Raymond W. Campbell
Represented By: Raymond W Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Cherry Malichi
Represented By: Cherry Malichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Dustin J. Aponte
Represented By: Dustin Joshua Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Mary C Giles
Represented By: Mary Colleen Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Allen M. Reece
Represented By: Allen Michael Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Charles A. Walton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Gregory G. Laux
Represented By: Gregory Gilbert Laux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Evan C. McMullen
Represented By: Evan C McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Margaret Helen Wade Arter
Represented By: Margaret Helen Wade Arter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ronald J. Thoreson
Represented By: Ronald J Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Patrick B. Blankenship
Represented By: Patrick Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Kerry M Hultquist
Represented By: Kerry M Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ayoade P. Adewopo
Represented By: Ayoade O Adewopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Nathan E. Curtis
Represented By: Nathan E Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Michael C. Cook
Represented By: Michael C Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Shannon M. Hayes
Represented By: Shannon Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Marc A. Topoleski
Represented By: Marc A Topoleski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Brian J. Stephenson
Represented By: Brian J Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Larry W. Rogers
Represented By: Larry W Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Suzanne M. Alton de Eraso
Represented By: Suzanne M Alton de Eraso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Michael G. Mangarelli
Represented By: Michael G Mangarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Michael Armey
Represented By: Michael E Armey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Patricia A. Jones
Represented By: Patricia A Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Deneal M. Kushner
Represented By: Deneal M Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: John J. Frese
Represented By: Jerome Frese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ann E. Rybolt
Represented By: Ann Rybolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Stephanie J. Fairfield
Represented By: Stephanie J Fairfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Clinton A. Paul, Jr.
Represented By: Clinton A Paul, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Kevin B. Connor
Represented By: Kevin Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: James L. Liggins, Jr.
Represented By: James L Liggins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Peter L. Brooks
Represented By: Peter L Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Robert E. Reed
Represented By: Robert E Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?