Benedek v Franciscan Alliance Inc
Plaintiff: Marsha Benedek
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance, Inc., a/k/a Franciscan Health Dyer, Franciscan Alliance, Inc. and Franciscan Health Dyer
Case Number: 2:2020cv00011
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2020 09:30 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/13/2020. (smb)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/13/2020. (smb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Franciscan Alliance, Inc..(Brandenburg, Carly)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia M Kwait on behalf of Franciscan Alliance, Inc. (Kwait, Julia)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Franciscan Alliance, Inc. NOTICE OF EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Brandenburg, Carly)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carly A Brandenburg on behalf of Franciscan Alliance, Inc. (Brandenburg, Carly)
January 10, 2020 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (rmf)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4112608.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D05-1912-CT-001252, filed by Franciscan Alliance, Inc., a/k/a Franciscan Health Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Brandenburg, Carly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benedek v Franciscan Alliance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance, Inc., a/k/a Franciscan Health Dyer
Represented By: Carly A Brandenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Carly A Brandenburg
Represented By: Julia M Kwait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Health Dyer
Represented By: Carly A Brandenburg
Represented By: Julia M Kwait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Benedek
Represented By: David W Masse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?