Integrity Insurance Company et al v. Handler et al
Plaintiff: Time Transport, Inc. and Integrity Insurance Company
Defendant: David Handler and Contract Freighters Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00058
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Contract Freighters Inc.(Carpenter, Jennifer)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Carpenter on behalf of Contract Freighters Inc (Carpenter, Jennifer)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Handler. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons filed by Integrity Insurance Company, Time Transport, Inc.. (George, Warren)
February 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #9 Contract Freighters Inc answer due April 3, 2020. (nae)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. Approved by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/28/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Contract Freighters Inc ; answer due by April 3, 2020. (Hearn, Edward)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W Hearn on behalf of Contract Freighters Inc (Hearn, Edward)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Time Transport, Inc.. (George, Warren)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Integrity Insurance Company. (George, Warren)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Integrity Insurance Company, Time Transport, Inc.. Contract Freighters Inc served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (George, Warren)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Handler. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Integrity Insurance Company, Time Transport, Inc.. (George, Warren)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Contract Freighters Inc, David Handler. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
February 10, 2020 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE. (jat)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Contract Freighters Inc, David Handler( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4140642.), filed by Integrity Insurance Company, Time Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(George, Warren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrity Insurance Company et al v. Handler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Time Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Warren S George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrity Insurance Company
Represented By: Warren S George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contract Freighters Inc
Represented By: Edward W Hearn
Represented By: Jennifer M Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?