Duis v. Franciscan Alliance Inc.
Plaintiff: TARYN N DUIS
Defendant: FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE INC. a/k/a FRANCISCAN HEALTH CROWN POINT, Franciscan Alliance Inc and Franciscan Health Crown Point
Case Number: 2:2020cv00078
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Franciscan Alliance Inc.(Roberson, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 09:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the call. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/13/2020. (tc)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Franciscan Alliance Inc. (Roberson, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 3/16/2020. (tc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Franciscan Alliance Inc ; answer due by April 20, 2020. (Adolay, Amy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J Adolay on behalf of Franciscan Alliance Inc (Adolay, Amy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M Roberson on behalf of Franciscan Alliance Inc (Roberson, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taryn N Duis. Franciscan Alliance Inc served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Fox, Ryan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Franciscan Alliance Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
February 26, 2020 **NEW CASE** Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (nae)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan C Fox on behalf of TARYN N DUIS (Fox, Ryan)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE INC. a/k/a FRANCISCAN HEALTH CROWN POINT( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4155814.), filed by TARYN N DUIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fox, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duis v. Franciscan Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARYN N DUIS
Represented By: Ryan C Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCISCAN ALLIANCE INC. a/k/a FRANCISCAN HEALTH CROWN POINT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Alliance Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth M Roberson
Represented By: Amy J Adolay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Health Crown Point
Represented By: Elizabeth M Roberson
Represented By: Amy J Adolay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?