Lewis v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Danielle Lewis
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00085
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2020 11:00 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 5/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/2/2020. (smb)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/2/2020. (smb)
March 3, 2020 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Declaration of Service of Notice to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk) by Thomas L. Davis by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Record: Appearance by Attorney in a Civil Case; Complaint; Summons; Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Appearance by Attorney in a Civil Case (Thomas L. Davis); Motion for Status Conference; Order Setting Initial Status Conference; Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Status Conference; Order Denying Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically; Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case (Kristanna Roper-Nikitaras); Case Management Order; Stipulation to Agree to Mediator; Order Stipulating to Mediator, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate MPC Investment LLC for Speedway LLC.. (Davis, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Davis on behalf of Speedway LLC (Davis, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4161105.) from Lake County Circuit Court, Cause No. 45C01-1903-CT-000313, filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Record: Appearance by Attorney in a Civil Case (Mark J. Schocke, David S. Gladish and Douglas K. Walker); Complaint; Summons; Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Appearance by Attorney in Ciivl Case (Thomas L. Davis); Motion for Status Conference; Order Setting Initial Status Conference; Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Status Conference; Order Denying Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically; Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case (Kristanna Roper-Nikitaras); Case Management Order; Stipulation to Agree to Mediator; Order Stipulating to Mediator, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Thomas L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Lewis
Represented By: Douglas K Walker
Represented By: David S Gladish
Represented By: Mark J Schocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?