Krask v. Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Krask
Defendant: Steel Grip Inc, Milliken & Company, Roe Corporations 1-10, Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Westex, Inc., Cintas Corporate Services Inc, Nissin Trading Co., Ltd., Steel Grip, Inc and Kuraray Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00087
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 24 Defendants' ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Milliken & Company, Westex, Inc..(Potter, John)
April 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Potter on behalf of Westex, Inc. (Potter, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Steel Grip, Inc.(Ackerman, Joseph)
April 21, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Cintas Corporate Services Inc.(Frost, Thel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Westex, Inc.. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
April 10, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Kuraray Co., Ltd., Nissin Trading Co., Ltd., Westex, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Paul Krask. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court, finding justice so requires and noting Defendants do not object, GRANTS #16 Motion for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is ordered to file his Amended Complaint upon receipt of this order. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/8/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Paul Krask. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Mendoza, Roberto (Alex))
April 1, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milliken & Company identifying Corporate Parent Milliken & Company for Milliken & Company.. (Potter, John)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: The Court STRIKES Plaintiff's #12 Amended Complaint for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. Because more than 21 days have passed since (1) Defendants Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. and Milliken & Company filed their Answers and (2) Defendant Steel Grip, Inc. was served, per Defendant Steel Grip, Inc.'s statement regarding its original time to answer in [DE 8] Notice for Automatic Initial Extension of Time, Plaintiff cannot amend his pleading as a matter of course. Per Rule 15(a)(2), Plaintiff may amend his pleading only with the opposing party's written consent or leave of Court. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/27/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 VOID per chambers - Summons Issued as to Kuraray Co., LTD, Nissin Trading Co., LTD, Westex Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc) Modified on 3/30/2020 to void.
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 STRICKEN RE 14 MINUTE ORDER: AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Paul Krask. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Mendoza, Roberto (Alex)) Modified on 3/27/2020 (tc).
March 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G Owens on behalf of Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. (Owens, Kevin)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT (Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement) regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Milliken & Company. (Potter, John)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D Ackerman on behalf of Steel Grip, Inc (Ackerman, Joseph)
March 12, 2020 Set Deadlines: Answer due date for defendant Steel Grip Inc set 4/10/2020 per #8 Agreed Notice. (jld)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Steel Grip, Inc ; answer due by April 10, 2020. (Cockrum, Scott)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: Jurisdictional Statement that properly alleges the citizenship of Plaintiff to be filed by 3/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 03/10/2020. (jat)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/10/2020. (tc)
March 6, 2020 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Potter on behalf of Milliken & Company (Potter, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4167398.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D01-2001-CT-000100, filed by Milliken & Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Consent to Remove, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- State Documents)(Potter, John)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed in State Court DE #3 by Milliken & Company.(mrm) Modified on 3/9/2020 to add link (mrm).
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed in State Court DE #3 by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc..(mrm) Modified on 3/9/2020 to add link (mrm).
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D01-2001-CT-000100 with Jury Demand against Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., Milliken & Company, Roe Corporations 1-10, Steel Grip Inc, filed by Paul Krask.(mrm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krask v. Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Krask
Represented By: Roberto (Alex) Alejandro Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Grip Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milliken & Company
Represented By: John W Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westex, Inc.
Represented By: John W Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporate Services Inc
Represented By: Kevin G Owens
Represented By: Thel Matthew Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissin Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Grip, Inc
Represented By: Scott B Cockrum
Represented By: Joseph D Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuraray Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?