Williams v. American Multi-Cinema, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LEROY WILLIAMS
Defendant: AMC SHOWPLACE THEATRES, INC. and American Multi-Cinema, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Galen A Bradley
Case Number: 2:2020cv00140
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/14/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by atty Joseph Bombagetti. Dfts appeared by atty Jessica Meek. The Report filed as DE #11 is ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 6/25/2020. All discovery to be completed by 6/7/2020. Fact discovery to be completed by 2/15/2021. Court sets depositions limits to a maximum of 6 hours but may be extended by stipulation as addressed on the record. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 3/1/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/1/2021. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 6/7/2021. The last date any party may seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings is 6/15/2020. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 3 day bench trial by November 2021. Mediation to be completed by 3/15/2021. Galen Bradley appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. All other agreements of the parties concerning discovery are adopted. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 6/4/2020. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. Court will consider the current national health crisis in relation to any motions to extend deadlines; parties are encouraged to advance litigation to extent possible. (Recorded via ATT Host - Kolar.) (tc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Meek, Jessica)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/14/2020. (tc)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2020 11:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/23/2020. (tc)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/8/2020. (tc)
April 7, 2020 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. NEW CASE. (jat)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by AMC SHOWPLACE THEATRES, INC., American Multi-Cinema, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party and State Court Clerk)(Laurin, Jessica)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Hinshaw on behalf of AMC SHOWPLACE THEATRES, INC., American Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Hinshaw, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ohmart Laurin on behalf of AMC SHOWPLACE THEATRES, INC., American Multi-Cinema, Inc. (Laurin, Jessica)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMC SHOWPLACE THEATRES, INC., American Multi-Cinema, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AMC Entertainment Holdings, Inc. for AMC SHOWPLACE THEATRES, INC., American Multi-Cinema, Inc... (Laurin, Jessica)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4192455.) from Lake County Circuit Court, Cause No. 45C01-1908-CT-000870, filed by AMC SHOWPLACE THEATRES, INC., American Multi-Cinema, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record (Docket, Complaint, Summons, Appearance, Certificate of Issuance, Appearnance of James M. Hinshaw and Jessica Laurin Meek, CCS Entry Form, Notice of Automatic Extension of Time, Order Setting Initial Status Conference, CCS Entry Form, AMC's Answer to Complaint, Case Management Order, CCS Entry Form, Notice of Change of Law Firm Name, Order Granting Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer), #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C- Civil Cover Sheet)(Laurin, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. American Multi-Cinema, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEROY WILLIAMS
Represented By: Joseph G Bombagetti, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMC SHOWPLACE THEATRES, INC.
Represented By: Jessica Ohmart Laurin
Represented By: James M Hinshaw
Represented By: Jessica Laurin Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Multi-Cinema, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ohmart Laurin
Represented By: James M Hinshaw
Represented By: Jessica Laurin Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Galen A Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?