Sundance Botanicals, LLC v. The Power of Elderberries, LLC
Plaintiff: Sundance Botanicals, LLC
Defendant: The Power of Elderberries, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00141
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Power of Elderberries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barrett, Jesse)
June 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Power of Elderberries, LLC. (Barrett, Jesse)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/25/2020. (tc)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2020 09:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/26/2020. (tc)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 5/5/2020. (tc)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by The Power of Elderberries, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Initial Extension of Time to Answer) (Barrett, Jesse)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Power of Elderberries, LLC. (Barrett, Jesse)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse M Barrett on behalf of The Power of Elderberries, LLC (Barrett, Jesse)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Elderberries, LLC on April 14, 2020, filed by Sundance Botanicals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Springer, Alice)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 AO 120 form sent to Patent and Trademark Office. (nae)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Sundance Botanicals, LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Springer, Alice)
April 8, 2020 Remark - Contacted Attorney Springer regarding AO-120 Form. (nal)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Power of Elderberries, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
April 8, 2020 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. NEW CASE. (nal)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sundance Botanicals, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sundance Botanicals, LLC for Sundance Botanicals, LLC.. (Springer, Alice)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice J Springer on behalf of Sundance Botanicals, LLC (Springer, Alice)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Power of Elderberries, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4193705.), filed by Sundance Botanicals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Springer, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundance Botanicals, LLC v. The Power of Elderberries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundance Botanicals, LLC
Represented By: Alice J Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Power of Elderberries, LLC
Represented By: Jesse M Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?