Akbar v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LLP
Plaintiff: Habeeba Akbar
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LLP and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Not Classified By Court: Galen A Bradley
Case Number: 2:2020cv00144
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/22/2020, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Wanda Jones. Dft appeared by atty James Balog. The Report filed as DE #8 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 6/30/2020. All discovery to be completed by 8/3/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 5/4/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 7/6/2021. The last date to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltf is 2/1/2021; for Dft is 3/2/2021. Mediation to be completed by 4/1/2021. Galen Bradley appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 6/12/2020. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (tc)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Martinez, Brian)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 11:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1274 and enter access code 4620540# when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/24/2020. (tc)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/10/2020. (tc)
April 9, 2020 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE)(jld)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Martinez on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LLP (Martinez, Brian)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Balog on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LLP (Balog, James)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4194341.) from County of Lake, Cause No. 45D05-1912-CT-001321, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Balog, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akbar v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LLP
Represented By: Brian M Martinez
Represented By: James P Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Brian M Martinez
Represented By: James P Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Habeeba Akbar
Represented By: Wanda E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Galen A Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?