United States America v. Ventura et al
Plaintiff: United States America and United States of America
Defendant: Eric Lewis, London 11 LLC, Damien Ventura, Silver Sanders and Mich-Alta Management
Case Number: 2:2020cv00145
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America re #3 Memorandum in Support, #2 MOTION Access Orders Notice that Motion for Orders in Aid of Access is Ripe for Decision (Abend - AUSA, Katherine)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 04/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Publication)(Abend - AUSA, Katherine)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States America and ORDERING that the United States is permitted to effect service on Defendants by publishing a summons containing the information required under Indiana Rule of Trial Procedure 4.13(B) in a newspaper of general circulation in Lake County, Indiana, three times, with the first publication occurring promptly after entry of this order and each two succeeding publications at least seven and not more than fourteen days afterthe prior publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/10/2020. (lhc)
April 9, 2020 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE, MOTIONS PENDING) (rmc)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Abend - AUSA, Katherine)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION Access Orders filed by United States America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration and Exhibits A.1-A.15, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A.16-A.18, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A.19-A.24, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A.25 (UAO Part 1 of 2), #6 Exhibit Exhibit A.25 (UAO Part 2 of 2))(Abend - AUSA, Katherine)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Access Orders by Plaintiff United States America. (Abend - AUSA, Katherine)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abend - AUSA, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States America v. Ventura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: London 11 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mich-Alta Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States America
Represented By: Katherine A Abend - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Katherine A Abend - AUSA
Represented By: Wayne T Ault - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?