Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. Estate of Bryan Ashley Curry et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Estate of Bryan Ashley Curry and Kimberly Curry, Bryan Ashley Curry and Kimberly Curry
Case Number: 2:2020cv00220
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Kimberly Curry waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Duffy, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 No Proposed Summons received yet. Sent email to Attorney Michael J Duffy to advise. (mrm)
June 5, 2020 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Duffy on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Duffy, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Estate of Bryan Ashley Curry and Kimberly Curry( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4244323.), filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duffy, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. Estate of Bryan Ashley Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Bryan Ashley Curry and Kimberly Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Ashley Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?