Salus v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patrice Salus and Patrice E Salus
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00230
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Patrice E Salus. Commissioner of Social Security served on 06/29/2020. US Attorney General served on 06/29/2020. US Attorney served on 07/01/2020. Answer due 08/31/2020. (jat)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only.(cc: USMS) (mrm)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant at the addresses provided by Plaintiff on the USM-285 forms submitted with his Complaint, together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 6/22/2020. (cc: USMS)(mrm)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Patrice Salus. (Matejczyk, Joshua)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Patrice Salus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons - SSA, #3 Proposed Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney, #4 Proposed Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney General, #5 USM-285 - SSA, #6 USM-285 - U.S. Attorney, #7 USM-285 - U.S. Attorney General)(Matejczyk, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salus v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Salus
Represented By: Joshua M Matejczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice E Salus
Represented By: Joshua M Matejczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?