Modern Vascular LLC v. Golewale et al
Plaintiff: Modern Vascular LLC
Defendant: Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale and Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00236
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 36 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2020 10:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties are to call in on the Court's AT&T conference line as referenced in the attached order. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/11/2020. (smb)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/11/2020. (smb)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jacqueline V Brousseau PHV for Modern Vascular LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/28/2020. (ace)
July 23, 2020 Filing 32 Application for Attorney Jacqueline V. Brousseau to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Modern Vascular LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4291405(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Alon Stein on behalf of Nazar Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC (Stein, Alon)
June 19, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:20-cv-00081. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (doc. #21 ) is granted. This case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 6/17/20. (EJA) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative Rule 12(b)(6) and 9(b)MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Affidavit (Declaration) of Nazar Golewale, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Nobility Management, California Secretary of State Filing 2019, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, Nobility Management, California Secretary of State Filing 2017, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, Letter to Nobilitymail.com)(Stein, Alon) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The parties' Stipulation #26 is granted. Defendant shall file his reply to the Motion to Dismiss #21 on or before April 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 3/30/2020. (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION re: #25 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative Rule 12(b)(6) and 9(b)MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Extending time to File Reply Brief to April 28, 2020 (First Stipulation as to Reply Brief) by Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. (Stein, Alon) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
March 21, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative Rule 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Modern Vascular LLC. (Anderson, Adam) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 24 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Stein, Alon). *Added MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on 3/23/2020 (REK). [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The #11 "Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading") is granted. Defendants shall have up to, and including, February 21, 2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/11/20. (GMP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for February 18, 2020 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 17 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 16 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT LRCiv 7.3(a) STATEMENT THAT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING WAS THE FIRST REQUEST re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. (Stein, Alon) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT Supplement to Appearance re: #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA by Defendants Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. (Stein, Alon) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Unknown Golewale, Nazar Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC, #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA filed by Unknown Golewale, Nazar Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confirmation E-mail)(Stein, Alon) *Modified to correct motion type on 2/7/2020 (REK). [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alon Stein appearing for Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. . (Stein, Alon) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Modern Vascular LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/18/2020 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Modern Vascular LLC. (Anderson, Adam) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Modern Vascular LLC. (Anderson, Adam) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nazar Golewale, Unknown Golewale, and Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17828860. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-81-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Modern Vascular LLC. (Anderson, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17828860 filed by Modern Vascular LLC. (Anderson, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modern Vascular LLC v. Golewale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nazar Golewale
Represented By: Alon Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Golewale
Represented By: Alon Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Vascular and Vein Center LLC
Represented By: Alon Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modern Vascular LLC
Represented By: Adam Christian Anderson
Represented By: Jacqueline V Brousseau PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?