Graczyk v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ruthann Graczyk
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00252
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruthann Graczyk. US Attorney General served on 7/13/2020 (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 7/27/2020 to correct agency served (lns).
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruthann Graczyk. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/13/2020 (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 7/27/2020 to correct agency served (lns).
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruthann Graczyk. US Attorney served on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 7/27/2020 to correct agency served (lns).
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (jat)
July 8, 2020 Judge William C Lee added. NEW CASE. (jat)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A Schultz on behalf of Ruthann Graczyk (Schultz, Barry)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4273727.), filed by Ruthann Graczyk. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graczyk v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthann Graczyk
Represented By: Barry A Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?